« Return to search results
Case Information
Case Number:
CV2004-015752
Judge:
Moskowitz, Frank
File Date:
8/16/2004
Location:
Downtown
Case Type:
Civil
Party Information
Party Name
Relationship
Sex
Attorney
Party Name
Hogan Manufacturing L L C
Relationship
Plaintiff
Sex
Attorney
Jon Hultgren
Party Name
S M A Billet L L C
Relationship
Defendant
Sex
Attorney
K Morrill
Case Documents
Filing Date
Description
Docket Date
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/27/2006
Description
047 - ME: Judgment Of Dismissal
Docket Date
9/27/2006
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/21/2006
Description
314 - ME: Bankruptcy
Docket Date
3/21/2006
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/9/2006
Description
NOB - Notice Of Filing Bankruptcy
Docket Date
3/15/2006
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/28/2006
Description
026 - ME: Pretrial Conference Set
Docket Date
2/28/2006
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/7/2006
Description
CCE - Controverting Certificate
Docket Date
2/13/2006
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/24/2006
Description
MSE - Motion To Set & Cert/Readiness
Docket Date
2/2/2006
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/6/2006
Description
MOT - Motion
Docket Date
1/10/2006
Filing Party
NOTE:
TO REINSTATE CASE
Filing Date
1/6/2006
Description
021 - ME: Nunc Pro Tunc Order
Docket Date
1/19/2006
Filing Party
Filing Date
12/27/2005
Description
JDI - Judgment Of Dismissal
Docket Date
12/29/2005
Filing Party
NOTE:
WITHOUT PREJUDICE
Filing Date
8/15/2005
Description
002 - ME: Hearing Vacated
Docket Date
8/15/2005
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/8/2005
Description
NOT - Notice
Docket Date
8/12/2005
Filing Party
NOTE:
WITHDRAWING PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT
Filing Date
8/8/2005
Description
094 - ME: Oral Argument Set
Docket Date
8/8/2005
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/3/2005
Description
047 - ME: Judgment Of Dismissal
Docket Date
8/3/2005
Filing Party
NOTE:
No document corresponds to this docket event.
Filing Date
7/18/2005
Description
RES - Response
Docket Date
7/22/2005
Filing Party
NOTE:
TO MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT
Filing Date
7/18/2005
Description
SOF - Statement Of Facts
Docket Date
7/25/2005
Filing Party
NOTE:
RULE 56C 2/IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT
Filing Date
6/24/2005
Description
MSJ - Motion For Summary Judgment
Docket Date
7/5/2005
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/24/2005
Description
SOF - Statement Of Facts
Docket Date
7/5/2005
Filing Party
NOTE:
IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT
Filing Date
2/21/2005
Description
073 - ME: Motion Withdrawn
Docket Date
2/21/2005
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/19/2005
Description
311 - ME: 150 Day Minute Entry
Docket Date
1/19/2005
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/9/2004
Description
CCN - Cert Arbitration - Not Subject
Docket Date
9/14/2004
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/9/2004
Description
ANS - Answer
Docket Date
9/13/2004
Filing Party
NOTE:
PAID
Filing Date
8/20/2004
Description
SUM - Summons
Docket Date
8/26/2004
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/20/2004
Description
AFS - Affidavit Of Service
Docket Date
8/24/2004
Filing Party
NOTE:
SMA BILLET LLC SERVED 8-17-04
Filing Date
8/16/2004
Description
COM - Complaint
Docket Date
8/19/2004
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/16/2004
Description
CCN - Cert Arbitration - Not Subject
Docket Date
8/19/2004
Filing Party
Case Calendar
Date
Time
Event
Date
2/18/2005
Time
9:00
Event
Oral Argument
Date
9/21/2005
Time
10:30
Event
Oral Argument
Date
3/20/2006
Time
9:15
Event
Pre-Trial Conference
Judgments
Date
(F)or / (A)gainst
Amount
Frequency
Type
Status
No records found.