« Return to search results Civil Court Case Information - Case History
Case Information
Case Number: CV2004-014766 Judge: Mandell, Michael
File Date: 8/6/2004 Location: Downtown
Case Type: Civil  
Party Information
Party Name Relationship Sex Attorney
U S Collections West Inc   Plaintiff    Alan Zimmerman 
Patti Padgett   Defendant  Female  Pro Per 
Case Documents
Filing Date Description Docket Date Filing Party
10/25/2004  DFJ - Default Judgment  11/4/2004   
NOTE: Copy mailed/provided to non-defl. parties on date of filing 
10/13/2004  ASR - Affidavit in Support of Attorney Fees  10/15/2004   
10/13/2004  SOC - Statement Of Costs  10/15/2004   
NOTE: AND NOTICE OF TAXATION OF COSTS 
10/13/2004  AFF - Affidavit  10/15/2004   
NOTE: IN SUPPORT OF JUDGMENT BY DEFAULT WITHOUT HEARING 
10/13/2004  MAJ - Mot/Aff Entry Def Jud W/O Hear  10/15/2004   
NOTE: AND AFFIDAVIT 
9/17/2004  AAD - Application And Affidavit Of Default  9/20/2004   
9/17/2004  NOT - Notice  9/20/2004   
NOTE: OF INTENT TO SEEK ENTRY OF DEFAULT AND JUDGMENT BY DEFAULT 
9/10/2004  SUM - Summons  9/15/2004   
9/10/2004  AFS - Affidavit Of Service  9/16/2004   
NOTE: PATTI PAGETT SERVED 8/26/04 
8/6/2004  COM - Complaint  8/9/2004   
8/6/2004  CCS - Cerificate Arbitration - Subject To  8/9/2004   
Case Calendar
There are no calendar events on file
Judgments
Date (F)or / (A)gainst Amount Frequency Type Status
10/25/2004  F:U S Collections West Inc  $742.50  One Time  Attorney Fee   
  A: Patti Padgett         
10/25/2004  F:U S Collections West Inc  $245.00  One Time  Costs   
  A: Patti Padgett         
10/25/2004  F:U S Collections West Inc  $634.76  One Time  Interest   
  A: Patti Padgett         
10/25/2004  F:U S Collections West Inc  $12,579.98  One Time  Principal   
  A: Patti Padgett         
click here for Law Library Resource Center