« Return to search results
Case Information
Case Number:
CV2004-011050
Judge:
Easterday, Jason
File Date:
6/9/2004
Location:
Downtown
Case Type:
Civil
Party Information
Party Name
Relationship
Sex
Attorney
Party Name
U S A A Casualty Insurance Company
Relationship
Plaintiff
Sex
Attorney
Marc Gladner
Party Name
Keri B Hemphill
Relationship
Defendant
Sex
Female
Attorney
Pro Per
Case Documents
Filing Date
Description
Docket Date
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/10/2011
Description
SJU - Satisfaction Of Judgment
Docket Date
6/15/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
AND RELEASE OF LIEN
Filing Date
6/9/2009
Description
ARJ - Affidavit: Renewal Of Judgment
Docket Date
6/16/2009
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/16/2004
Description
DFJ - Default Judgment
Docket Date
8/24/2004
Filing Party
NOTE:
Copy mailed/provided to non-defl. parties on date of filing
Filing Date
8/10/2004
Description
MAJ - Mot/Aff Entry Def Jud W/O Hear
Docket Date
8/13/2004
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/10/2004
Description
STA - Statement
Docket Date
7/19/2005
Filing Party
NOTE:
REFLECTING COMPUTATION OF PRINCIPAL
Filing Date
7/12/2004
Description
ADE - Application For Default
Docket Date
7/14/2004
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/12/2004
Description
AFD - Affidavit On Default
Docket Date
7/14/2004
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/21/2004
Description
SUM - Summons
Docket Date
6/25/2004
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/18/2004
Description
AFS - Affidavit Of Service
Docket Date
6/22/2004
Filing Party
NOTE:
KERRI B HEMPHILL SERVED 06/16/04
Filing Date
6/9/2004
Description
COM - Complaint
Docket Date
6/11/2004
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/9/2004
Description
CCS - Cerificate Arbitration - Subject To
Docket Date
6/11/2004
Filing Party
Case Calendar
There are no calendar events on file
Judgments
Date
(F)or / (A)gainst
Amount
Frequency
Type
Status
Date
8/16/2004
(F)or / (A)gainst
F:  U S A A Casualty Insurance Company
A: Keri B Hemphill
Amount
$4,579.69
Frequency
One Time
Type
Affidavit of Renewal of Judgment
Status
Satisfied
Date
8/16/2004
(F)or / (A)gainst
F:  U S A A Casualty Insurance Company
A: Keri B Hemphill
Amount
$280.00
Frequency
One Time
Type
Costs
Status
Satisfied
Date
8/16/2004
(F)or / (A)gainst
F:  U S A A Casualty Insurance Company
A: Keri B Hemphill
Amount
$7,549.69
Frequency
One Time
Type
Principal
Status
Satisfied