« Return to search results
Case Information
Case Number:
CV2004-007672
Judge:
Easterday, Jason
File Date:
4/19/2004
Location:
Downtown
Case Type:
Civil
Party Information
Party Name
Relationship
Sex
Attorney
Party Name
Bank One N A
Relationship
Plaintiff
Sex
Attorney
Barry Bursey
Party Name
Antoinette L Hemphill
Relationship
Defendant
Sex
Female
Attorney
Pro Per
Party Name
Kforce Inc
Relationship
Garnishee Defendant
Sex
Attorney
Pro Per
Case Documents
Filing Date
Description
Docket Date
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/25/2009
Description
RQW - Rel/Quash Writ Of Garnishment
Docket Date
8/28/2009
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/17/2009
Description
ANG - Answer Of Garnishee
Docket Date
9/2/2009
Filing Party
Garnishee Defendant(3)
Filing Date
8/11/2009
Description
AFS - Affidavit Of Service
Docket Date
8/19/2009
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/11/2009
Description
WGS - Writ Of Garnishment and Summons
Docket Date
8/17/2009
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/3/2009
Description
AWG - Application For Writ Of Garnishment
Docket Date
8/10/2009
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/10/2009
Description
ARJ - Affidavit: Renewal Of Judgment
Docket Date
7/16/2009
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/18/2004
Description
DFJ - Default Judgment
Docket Date
10/27/2004
Filing Party
NOTE:
Copy mailed/provided to non-defl. parties on date of filing
Filing Date
9/30/2004
Description
ASR - Affidavit in Support of Attorney Fees
Docket Date
10/12/2004
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/30/2004
Description
SOC - Statement Of Costs
Docket Date
10/12/2004
Filing Party
NOTE:
VERIFIED
Filing Date
9/30/2004
Description
MOT - Motion
Docket Date
10/15/2004
Filing Party
NOTE:
FOR JUDGMENT
Filing Date
9/30/2004
Description
MOT - Motion
Docket Date
10/15/2004
Filing Party
NOTE:
FOR AWARD OF ATTORNEYS' FEES AND COSTS
Filing Date
9/22/2004
Description
311 - ME: 150 Day Minute Entry
Docket Date
9/22/2004
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/8/2004
Description
ADE - Application For Default
Docket Date
9/10/2004
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/27/2004
Description
OXS - Order To Extend Time For Service
Docket Date
9/2/2004
Filing Party
NOTE:
UNTIL 10/25/04
Filing Date
8/18/2004
Description
MXS - Motion To Extend Time For Service
Docket Date
8/26/2004
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/11/2004
Description
AFS - Affidavit Of Service
Docket Date
8/16/2004
Filing Party
NOTE:
ANTOINETTE L HEMPHILL SERVED 08/08/04
Filing Date
8/11/2004
Description
SUM - Summons
Docket Date
8/18/2004
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/28/2004
Description
322 - ME: Notice Of Intent To Dismiss
Docket Date
7/28/2004
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/21/2004
Description
AAS - Affidavit Of Attempted Service
Docket Date
5/25/2004
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/20/2004
Description
CCS - Cerificate Arbitration - Subject To
Docket Date
4/22/2004
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/20/2004
Description
COM - Complaint
Docket Date
4/22/2004
Filing Party
Case Calendar
There are no calendar events on file
Judgments
Date
(F)or / (A)gainst
Amount
Frequency
Type
Status
Date
10/18/2004
(F)or / (A)gainst
F:
Bank One N A
A: Antoinette L Hemphill
A: Antoinette L Hemphill
Amount
$29,015.66
Frequency
One Time
Type
Affidavit of Renewal of Judgment
Status
Modified
Date
10/18/2004
(F)or / (A)gainst
F:
Bank One N A
A: Antoinette L Hemphill
A: Antoinette L Hemphill
Amount
$800.00
Frequency
One Time
Type
Attorney Fee
Status
Modified
Date
10/18/2004
(F)or / (A)gainst
F:
Bank One N A
A: Antoinette L Hemphill
A: Antoinette L Hemphill
Amount
$322.20
Frequency
One Time
Type
Costs
Status
Modified
Date
10/18/2004
(F)or / (A)gainst
F:
Bank One N A
A: Antoinette L Hemphill
A: Antoinette L Hemphill
Amount
$13,234.99
Frequency
One Time
Type
Principal
Status
Modified