« Return to search results
Case Information
Case Number:
CV2003-091705
Judge:
Thompson, Peter
File Date:
6/27/2003
Location:
Southeast
Case Type:
Civil
Party Information
Party Name
Relationship
Sex
Attorney
Party Name
Wilmer G Elbers
Relationship
Plaintiff
Sex
Male
Attorney
Hyung Choi
Party Name
Betty B Elbers
Relationship
Plaintiff
Sex
Female
Attorney
Hyung Choi
Party Name
Beaudry R V Company
Relationship
Defendant
Sex
Attorney
Michael Murphy
Party Name
Beaudry Motor Company
Relationship
Defendant
Sex
Attorney
Michael Murphy
Case Documents
Filing Date
Description
Docket Date
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/12/2004
Description
ODI - Order Of Dismissal
Docket Date
5/19/2004
Filing Party
NOTE:
WITH PREJUDICE
Filing Date
5/12/2004
Description
STD - Stipulation To/For Dismissal
Docket Date
5/24/2004
Filing Party
NOTE:
WITH PREJUDICE
Filing Date
12/3/2003
Description
311 - ME: 150 Day Minute Entry
Docket Date
12/3/2003
Filing Party
Filing Date
11/17/2003
Description
NSD - Notice of Service Re: 26.1 Disclosure
Docket Date
4/6/2004
Filing Party
NOTE:
BEAUDRY'S FIRST SUPPLEMENTAL
Filing Date
11/4/2003
Description
NOT - Notice
Docket Date
1/29/2004
Filing Party
NOTE:
OF SERVICE OF DEFENDANT'S INITIAL DISCLOSURE STATEMENT
Filing Date
9/11/2003
Description
AFS - Affidavit Of Service
Docket Date
9/16/2003
Filing Party
NOTE:
BEAUDRY RV COMPANY SERVED 8/2/8/03
Filing Date
9/11/2003
Description
SOC - Statement Of Costs
Docket Date
10/23/2003
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/8/2003
Description
CCN - Cert Arbitration - Not Subject
Docket Date
12/31/2003
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/8/2003
Description
ANS - Answer
Docket Date
9/23/2003
Filing Party
NOTE:
PAID
Filing Date
8/20/2003
Description
SUM - Summons
Docket Date
1/21/2004
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/18/2003
Description
AFS - Affidavit Of Service
Docket Date
9/3/2003
Filing Party
NOTE:
BEAUDRY MOTOR COMPANY SERVED 8-12-2003
Filing Date
8/14/2003
Description
AFS - Affidavit Of Service
Docket Date
9/3/2003
Filing Party
NOTE:
BEAUDRY RV COMPANY & BEAUDRY MOTOR COMPANY SERVED 8-12-2003
Filing Date
6/27/2003
Description
COM - Complaint
Docket Date
7/1/2003
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/27/2003
Description
CCN - Cert Arbitration - Not Subject
Docket Date
7/1/2003
Filing Party
Case Calendar
There are no calendar events on file
Judgments
Date
(F)or / (A)gainst
Amount
Frequency
Type
Status
No records found.