« Return to search results
Case Information
Case Number:
CV2003-070673
Judge:
Easterday, Jason
File Date:
11/14/2003
Location:
Northwest
Case Type:
Civil
Party Information
Party Name
Relationship
Sex
Attorney
Party Name
Pauline C Hemphill
Relationship
Plaintiff
Sex
Female
Attorney
Pro Per
Party Name
Melvin A Cool
Relationship
Defendant
Sex
Male
Attorney
Pro Per
Case Documents
Filing Date
Description
Docket Date
Filing Party
Filing Date
11/19/2003
Description
AFS - Affidavit Of Service
Docket Date
11/20/2003
Filing Party
NOTE:
MELVIN COOL SERVED 11/18/2003
Filing Date
11/14/2003
Description
IPH - Injunction Prohibit Harassment
Docket Date
11/24/2003
Filing Party
Filing Date
11/14/2003
Description
PIH - Petition For Injunction Of Harassment
Docket Date
11/17/2003
Filing Party
Plaintiff(1)
Case Calendar
There are no calendar events on file
Judgments
Date
(F)or / (A)gainst
Amount
Frequency
Type
Status
No records found.