« Return to search results
Case Information
Case Number:
CV2003-021131
Judge:
Blanchard, John
File Date:
11/6/2003
Location:
Downtown
Case Type:
Civil
Party Information
Party Name
Relationship
Sex
Attorney
Party Name
Beaudry Motor Company
Relationship
Plaintiff
Sex
Attorney
Edwin Fleming
Party Name
Beaudry R V Company
Relationship
Plaintiff
Sex
Attorney
Edwin Fleming
Party Name
Beaudry R V San Marcos Inc
Relationship
Plaintiff
Sex
Attorney
Edwin Fleming
Party Name
Robert M Beaudry
Relationship
Plaintiff
Sex
Male
Attorney
Edwin Fleming
Party Name
Barbara Beaudry
Relationship
Plaintiff
Sex
Female
Attorney
Edwin Fleming
Party Name
Davis Keller & Wiggins L L C
Relationship
Defendant
Sex
Attorney
ROBERT GRASSO
Party Name
Ronald A Davis
Relationship
Defendant
Sex
Male
Attorney
ROBERT GRASSO
Case Documents
Filing Date
Description
Docket Date
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/21/2005
Description
042 - ME: Case Dismissed - Full
Docket Date
6/21/2005
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/2/2005
Description
078 - ME: Case On Dismissal Calendar
Docket Date
5/2/2005
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/29/2005
Description
NOS - Notice Of Settlement
Docket Date
5/5/2005
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/28/2005
Description
NOS - Notice Of Settlement
Docket Date
5/2/2005
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/14/2005
Description
084 - ME: Case Continued Inactive Calendar
Docket Date
2/14/2005
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/7/2005
Description
REQ - Request
Docket Date
2/8/2005
Filing Party
NOTE:
FOR TELEPHONIC APPEARNCE AT FEBRUARY 10 2005 STATUS CONFERENCE
Filing Date
2/7/2005
Description
ORD - Order
Docket Date
2/14/2005
Filing Party
NOTE:
CONCERNING STATUS CONFRENCE SET FOR FEBRUEARY 10 2005
Filing Date
2/2/2005
Description
REP - Report
Docket Date
2/7/2005
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATUS
Filing Date
1/7/2005
Description
ORD - Order
Docket Date
1/12/2005
Filing Party
NOTE:
CONCERNING PRETRIAL DEADLINES
Filing Date
1/4/2005
Description
STP - Stipulation
Docket Date
1/6/2005
Filing Party
NOTE:
JOINT MOTION CONCERNING PRETRIAL DEADLINES
Filing Date
12/13/2004
Description
ORD - Order
Docket Date
12/20/2004
Filing Party
NOTE:
CONCERNING PRETRIAL DEADLINES
Filing Date
12/9/2004
Description
STP - Stipulation
Docket Date
12/13/2004
Filing Party
NOTE:
AND JOINT MOTION CONCERNING PRETRIAL DEADLINES
Filing Date
9/23/2004
Description
078 - ME: Case On Dismissal Calendar
Docket Date
9/23/2004
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/20/2004
Description
NNF - Not Of Non-Parties At Fault
Docket Date
9/22/2004
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/13/2004
Description
MCO - Motion To Continue
Docket Date
9/17/2004
Filing Party
NOTE:
THE GENERAL DEADLINE FOR DESIGNATION OF NON-PARTIES AT FAULT
Filing Date
8/26/2004
Description
MEM - Memorandum
Docket Date
8/31/2004
Filing Party
NOTE:
JOINT PRETRIAL
Filing Date
8/4/2004
Description
026 - ME: Pretrial Conference Set
Docket Date
8/4/2004
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/4/2004
Description
CCE - Controverting Certificate
Docket Date
8/10/2004
Filing Party
NOTE:
REGARDING PLAINTIFFS MOTION TO SET
Filing Date
7/30/2004
Description
023 - ME: Order Entered By Court
Docket Date
7/30/2004
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/29/2004
Description
MSE - Motion To Set & Cert/Readiness
Docket Date
8/4/2004
Filing Party
NOTE:
OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE MOTION FOR EXPEDITED HEARING ON MOTION FOR PRETRIAL CONFERENCE FILED ON JUNE 28,2004
Filing Date
7/19/2004
Description
NOT - Notice
Docket Date
7/20/2004
Filing Party
NOTE:
OF NEW FIRM NAME
Filing Date
6/28/2004
Description
MOT - Motion
Docket Date
7/1/2004
Filing Party
NOTE:
FOR PRETRIAL CONFERENCE PURSUANT TO RULE 16(B) ARIZONA RULES OF CIVIL PROCEDURE
Filing Date
6/3/2004
Description
ANS - Answer
Docket Date
6/4/2004
Filing Party
NOTE:
TO COUNTERCLAIM
Filing Date
4/23/2004
Description
ANS - Answer
Docket Date
4/30/2004
Filing Party
NOTE:
AND COUNTERCLAIM
Filing Date
4/23/2004
Description
NJT - Not Demand For Jury Trial
Docket Date
4/27/2004
Filing Party
NOTE:
DEFENDANTS' RULE 38
Filing Date
4/23/2004
Description
CCN - Cert Arbitration - Not Subject
Docket Date
4/27/2004
Filing Party
NOTE:
DEFENDANTS'
Filing Date
4/14/2004
Description
311 - ME: 150 Day Minute Entry
Docket Date
4/14/2004
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/2/2004
Description
SUM - Summons
Docket Date
4/8/2004
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/2/2004
Description
AFS - Affidavit Of Service
Docket Date
3/9/2004
Filing Party
NOTE:
DAVIS KELLER & WIGGINS LLC SERVED 02/20/04
Filing Date
2/11/2004
Description
322 - ME: Notice Of Intent To Dismiss
Docket Date
2/11/2004
Filing Party
Filing Date
11/6/2003
Description
COM - Complaint
Docket Date
11/10/2003
Filing Party
Filing Date
11/6/2003
Description
CER - Certificate
Docket Date
11/10/2003
Filing Party
NOTE:
PURSUANT TO ARS 12-2602
Filing Date
11/6/2003
Description
CCN - Cert Arbitration - Not Subject
Docket Date
11/10/2003
Filing Party
Case Calendar
Date
Time
Event
Date
9/21/2004
Time
9:00
Event
Pre-Trial Conference
Date
2/10/2005
Time
8:45
Event
Pre-Trial Conference
Date
5/23/2005
Time
8:45
Event
Pre-Trial Conference
Judgments
Date
(F)or / (A)gainst
Amount
Frequency
Type
Status
No records found.