Civil Court Case Information - Case History
« Return to search results
Case Information | |||
---|---|---|---|
Case Number: | CV2003-016623 | Judge: | Coffey, Rodrick |
File Date: | 9/2/2003 | Location: | Southeast |
Case Type: | Civil |
Party Information | |||
---|---|---|---|
Party Name | Relationship | Sex | Attorney |
Kay McLean | Plaintiff | Female | Carrie Wilcox |
Uri Marcus | Plaintiff | Unknown | Pro Per |
Tom Mercer | Defendant | Male | G Delozier |
Sherri Wyner | Defendant | Female | G Delozier |
Steve Wyner | Defendant | Male | Pro Per |
Lin Pyles | Defendant | Female | G Delozier |
Vicki S Wolfe | Third Party Defendant | Female | Pro Per |
John R Wolfe | Third Party Defendant | Male | Pro Per |
B V R Automotive Electronics | Third Party Defendant | Pro Per | |
Nehemiah Restoration Fund | Third Party Defendant | Pro Per | |
Sharon Marcus | Third Party Defendant | Female | Pro Per |
Nehemiah Covenant Corporation | Third Party Plaintiff | G Delozier | |
Janice Mercer | Defendant | Female | G Delozier |
James Pyles | Defendant | Male | G Delozier |
Maricopa County Creditor | In The Matter Of (IMO) | Pro Per | |
Tzeriach Hasadeh | Defendant | Unknown | Pro Per |
Ma'Aleh Adumim | Defendant | Unknown | Pro Per |
John Pyles | Defendant | Male | Pro Per |
Carrie M Wilcox | Defendant | Female | Pro Per |
Gregory A Larson | Defendant | Male | Pro Per |
Wells Fargo Bank N A | Garnishee Defendant | Pro Per | |
Bank Of America N A | Garnishee Defendant | Pro Per |
Case Documents | |||
---|---|---|---|
Filing Date | Description | Docket Date | Filing Party |
7/28/2011 | DEW - Disposition Of Exhibit Worksheet | 8/3/2011 | |
5/26/2011 | LED - 2.8 (d) Letter | 5/26/2011 | |
10/11/2010 | 023 - ME: Order Entered By Court | 10/11/2010 | |
9/20/2010 | OBJ - Objection/Opposition. | 9/22/2010 | |
NOTE: TO MOTION FOR ORDER REQUIRING JUDGMENT DEBTOR TO APPEAR | |||
9/13/2010 | MJA - Mot/Ord Req Jud/Dbtr To Appear | 9/16/2010 | Defendant(5) |
8/9/2010 | ANG - Answer Of Garnishee | 8/17/2010 | Garnishee Defendant(23) |
7/30/2010 | WGS - Writ Of Garnishment and Summons | 8/5/2010 | Defendant(5) |
7/30/2010 | AFS - Affidavit Of Service | 8/9/2010 | |
7/28/2010 | AWG - Application For Writ Of Garnishment | 8/3/2010 | Defendant(5) |
11/2/2009 | UPI - Updated Information Address and/or Name | 12/11/2009 | Plaintiff(2) |
10/5/2009 | ANG - Answer Of Garnishee | 10/19/2009 | Garnishee Defendant(22) |
9/28/2009 | AFS - Affidavit Of Service | 10/5/2009 | |
9/21/2009 | AWG - Application For Writ Of Garnishment | 9/23/2009 | |
7/28/2009 | OFS - Order for Substitution of Counsel | 8/14/2009 | |
NOTE: FOR DEFENDANT STEVE WYNER ONLY AS HIS OWN ATTORNEY | |||
6/11/2009 | NRD - Notice Of Release Of Deposit | 6/19/2009 | |
NOTE: $500.00 PAID TO WILCOX LEGAL GROUP | |||
6/11/2009 | STP - Stipulation | 6/23/2009 | |
NOTE: TO SUBSTITUTE COUNSEL FOR DEFENDANT SETEVE WYNER ONLY AS HIS OWN ATTORNEY | |||
6/10/2009 | 019 - ME: Ruling | 6/10/2009 | |
5/15/2009 | CAN - Credit Memo Appearance Fee Paid | 5/21/2009 | Defendant(21) |
5/15/2009 | MOT - Motion | 5/28/2009 | |
NOTE: FOR RELIEF FROM JUDGMENT AGAINST ATTORNEY GREGORY LARSON | |||
5/12/2009 | 019 - ME: Ruling | 5/12/2009 | |
2/12/2009 | 002 - ME: Hearing Vacated | 2/12/2009 | |
1/13/2009 | AFS - Affidavit Of Service | 1/21/2009 | |
12/30/2008 | CME - Credit Memo | 1/9/2009 | |
12/12/2008 | MJA - Mot/Ord Req Jud/Dbtr To Appear | 12/19/2008 | |
12/10/2008 | JUD - Judgment | 12/19/2008 | |
NOTE: Notice of filing and entry provided to the parties | |||
12/5/2008 | MOT - Motion | 12/11/2008 | |
NOTE: FOR JUDGMENT PURSUANT TO MANDATE | |||
11/28/2008 | ALT - Appeals Letter Of Transmittal | 11/28/2008 | |
11/28/2008 | MAN - Order Of Mandate | 11/28/2008 | |
NOTE: AFFIRMED | |||
11/26/2008 | TSP - Transcript of Proceedings | 12/9/2008 | |
NOTE: 5/2/06 AMY C FULLER RPR CR | |||
11/26/2008 | TSP - Transcript of Proceedings | 12/9/2008 | |
NOTE: 5/17/06 ROCHELLE L DOBBINS RPR | |||
11/26/2008 | TSP - Transcript of Proceedings | 12/30/2008 | |
NOTE: BY LYNN D CRONIN MAY 4 2006 | |||
11/26/2008 | TSP - Transcript of Proceedings | 12/30/2008 | |
NOTE: BY LYNN D CRONIN MAY 8 2006 | |||
11/26/2008 | TSP - Transcript of Proceedings | 12/30/2008 | |
NOTE: BY MARMIE GUIMONT MAY 9 2006 | |||
11/26/2008 | TSP - Transcript of Proceedings | 12/30/2008 | |
NOTE: BY ROCHELLE L DOBBINS MAY 10 2006 | |||
11/26/2008 | TSP - Transcript of Proceedings | 12/30/2008 | |
NOTE: ROCHELLE L DOBBINS MAY 16 2006 | |||
11/26/2008 | TSP - Transcript of Proceedings | 12/30/2008 | |
NOTE: BY LYNN D CRONIN MAY 3 2006 | |||
11/26/2008 | TSP - Transcript of Proceedings | 12/30/2008 | |
NOTE: MONICA S HILL MAY 8 2006 | |||
10/27/2008 | 039 - ME: Judgment Debtor Exam | 10/27/2008 | |
9/22/2008 | AFS - Affidavit Of Service | 9/25/2008 | |
9/9/2008 | ORD - Order | 9/17/2008 | |
NOTE: REQUIRING JUDGMENT DEBTOR TO APPEAR | |||
9/3/2008 | MJA - Mot/Ord Req Jud/Dbtr To Appear | 9/8/2008 | |
7/24/2008 | OCC - Order Continuing on Inactive/Dismissal Calendar | 7/31/2008 | |
7/22/2008 | SFC - Stipulation For Continuance | 7/25/2008 | |
NOTE: ON INACTIVE CALENDAR | |||
4/9/2008 | OCC - Order Continuing on Inactive/Dismissal Calendar | 4/16/2008 | |
3/31/2008 | STP - Stipulation | 4/2/2008 | |
NOTE: TO CONTINUE ON INACTIVE CALENDAR | |||
12/26/2007 | REC - Receipt | 12/28/2007 | |
NOTE: COURT OF APPEALS | |||
12/21/2007 | OCC - Order Continuing on Inactive/Dismissal Calendar | 12/28/2007 | |
12/14/2007 | LET - Letter | 12/17/2007 | |
NOTE: CERTIFICATION LETTER | |||
12/12/2007 | CAO - Court Of Appeals Order | 12/12/2007 | |
NOTE: AMENDED/ SHALL TRANSMIT THE RECORD ON APPEAL ON OR BEFORE DECEMBER 26,2007 | |||
12/10/2007 | MCC - Mot/Cont On Inactive Calendar | 12/11/2007 | |
12/3/2007 | CAO - Court Of Appeals Order | 12/4/2007 | |
NOTE: SHALL TRANSMIT THE RECORD ON APPEAL ON OR BEFORE DECEMBER 17, 2007 | |||
9/21/2007 | 084 - ME: Case Continued Inactive Calendar | 9/21/2007 | |
9/20/2007 | ORD - Order | 9/28/2007 | |
NOTE: TO VACATE STATUS CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR SEPTEMBER 21, 2007 | |||
4/27/2007 | 022 - ME: Order Signed | 4/27/2007 | |
4/25/2007 | ORD - Order | 4/27/2007 | |
NOTE: GRANTING THE PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO TRANSFER ORIGINAL TRANSCRIPTS | |||
3/6/2007 | MTT - Motion To Transfer | 3/12/2007 | |
NOTE: ORIGINAL TRANSCRIPTS | |||
3/6/2007 | MOT - Motion | 3/9/2007 | |
NOTE: TO EXPEDITE | |||
2/2/2007 | 078 - ME: Case On Dismissal Calendar | 2/2/2007 | |
12/11/2006 | CAR - Court Of Appeals Receipt | 12/11/2006 | |
12/6/2006 | 028 - ME: Status Conference Set | 12/6/2006 | |
11/20/2006 | REQ - Request | 11/28/2006 | |
NOTE: FOR A STATUS CONFERENCE | |||
10/30/2006 | NAP - Notice Of Appeal | 10/31/2006 | |
10/30/2006 | NDC - Notice Of Deposit With Court | 10/31/2006 | |
10/30/2006 | NOF - Notice Of Filing | 11/3/2006 | |
NOTE: / TRANSCRIPTS | |||
10/30/2006 | NOT - Notice | 11/3/2006 | |
NOTE: OF PAYMENT OF BOND | |||
10/30/2006 | STA - Statement | 11/6/2006 | |
NOTE: APPELLANTS / | |||
10/3/2006 | JUD - Judgment | 10/6/2006 | |
NOTE: Notice of filing and entry provided to the parties | |||
10/3/2006 | TSP - Transcript of Proceedings | 10/12/2006 | |
9/18/2006 | REL - Reply | 9/21/2006 | |
NOTE: TO PLAINTIFFS' OBJECTION TO AMENDED FORM OF JUDGMENT | |||
9/12/2006 | OBJ - Objection/Opposition. | 9/14/2006 | |
NOTE: PLAINTIFFS' TO AMENDED FORM OF JUDGMENT | |||
9/5/2006 | AFF - Affidavit | 9/6/2006 | |
NOTE: AMENDED/ IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR AWARD OF ATTORNEY'S FEES AND REASONABLE EXPENSES | |||
9/5/2006 | NOT - Notice | 9/6/2006 | |
NOTE: AMENDED/ OF LODGING FORM OF JUDGMENT | |||
9/5/2006 | SOC - Statement Of Costs | 9/6/2006 | |
NOTE: AMENDED/ AND NOTICE OF TAXATION OF COSTS | |||
8/24/2006 | 019 - ME: Ruling | 8/24/2006 | |
8/16/2006 | 020 - ME: Matter Under Advisement | 8/16/2006 | |
7/20/2006 | 094 - ME: Oral Argument Set | 7/20/2006 | |
7/14/2006 | REL - Reply | 7/19/2006 | |
NOTE: TO PLAINTIFFS RESPONSE TO MOTION FOR AWARD OF ATTORNEYS FEES AND REASONABLE EXPENSES | |||
7/5/2006 | SJU - Satisfaction Of Judgment | 7/6/2006 | |
NOTE: FOR JURY FEES | |||
6/23/2006 | MOT - Motion | 6/28/2006 | |
NOTE: FOR AWARD OF ATTORNEYS FEES AND REASONABLE EXPENSES | |||
6/23/2006 | ASR - Affidavit in Support of Attorney Fees | 6/28/2006 | |
6/23/2006 | NOT - Notice | 6/28/2006 | |
NOTE: OF LODGING FORM OF JUDGMENT | |||
6/23/2006 | SOC - Statement Of Costs | 12/11/2007 | |
NOTE: AND NOTICE OF TAXATION OF COSTS | |||
5/19/2006 | 012 - ME: Trial | 5/19/2006 | |
5/18/2006 | 012 - ME: Trial | 5/18/2006 | |
5/18/2006 | 012 - ME: Trial | 5/18/2006 | |
5/17/2006 | JJF - Judgment For Jury Fees | 6/5/2006 | |
NOTE: Notice of filing and entry provided to the parties | |||
5/17/2006 | WSH - Worksheet | 5/22/2006 | |
NOTE: TRIAL / | |||
5/17/2006 | EXW - Exhibits Work Sheet | 6/1/2006 | |
5/16/2006 | JQU - Jury Question | 5/22/2006 | |
5/16/2006 | JQU - Jury Question | 5/22/2006 | |
5/12/2006 | 012 - ME: Trial | 5/12/2006 | |
5/12/2006 | 012 - ME: Trial | 5/12/2006 | |
5/11/2006 | JQU - Jury Question | 5/22/2006 | |
5/10/2006 | 012 - ME: Trial | 5/10/2006 | |
5/9/2006 | JQU - Jury Question | 5/22/2006 | |
5/8/2006 | DPR - Deposition Report | 6/2/2006 | |
NOTE: OF URI MARCUS 3/30/04 PATRICIA A STEWART #50110 | |||
5/8/2006 | 012 - ME: Trial | 5/8/2006 | |
5/5/2006 | 012 - ME: Trial | 5/5/2006 | |
5/4/2006 | DPR - Deposition Report | 6/2/2006 | |
NOTE: OF BENITA CARSWELL 11/3/05 STEPHANIE WINTERS | |||
5/4/2006 | DPR - Deposition Report | 6/2/2006 | |
NOTE: OF JANET MEYER 11/3/05 STEPHANIE WINTERS | |||
5/4/2006 | DPR - Deposition Report | 6/2/2006 | |
NOTE: OF STEVEN WYNER 3/28/05 SABRE D DETERDING | |||
5/4/2006 | DPR - Deposition Report | 6/2/2006 | |
NOTE: OF STEVE BERKOWITZ 11/2/05 STEPHANIE WINTERS | |||
5/4/2006 | DPR - Deposition Report | 6/2/2006 | |
NOTE: OF SHERRI WYNER 3/29/05 JUDI A WARMUTH | |||
5/4/2006 | DPR - Deposition Report | 6/2/2006 | |
NOTE: OF TOM MERCER 8/10/05 DORREN C BORGMANN | |||
5/4/2006 | DPR - Deposition Report | 6/2/2006 | |
NOTE: OF DAVID COOK 11/3/05 STEPHANIE WINTERS | |||
5/4/2006 | DPR - Deposition Report | 6/2/2006 | |
NOTE: OF LIN PYLES 3/29/05 JUDI A WARMUTH | |||
5/3/2006 | 012 - ME: Trial | 5/3/2006 | |
5/2/2006 | NOT - Notice | 5/4/2006 | |
NOTE: DEFENDANTS' OF ERRATA TO JOINT PRETRIAL STATEMENT | |||
5/2/2006 | JIN - Jury Instructions | 5/22/2006 | |
NOTE: PRELIMINARY | |||
5/2/2006 | JUL - Jury List - Restricted if Filed after 1/1/2008 | 5/22/2006 | |
4/26/2006 | OBJ - Objection/Opposition. | 5/3/2006 | |
NOTE: TO NOTICE OF PLAINTIFFS' INABILITY TO GIVE SECURITY | |||
4/20/2006 | NOT - Notice | 4/26/2006 | |
NOTE: PURSUANT TO RULE 67(E) ARCP OF PLAINTIFFS' INABILITY TO GIVE SECURITY | |||
4/17/2006 | 019 - ME: Ruling | 4/17/2006 | |
4/11/2006 | RES - Response | 4/13/2006 | |
NOTE: PLAINTIFFS/COUNTERDEFENDANTS' TO MOTION FOR INCREASE IN COST BOND AND REQUEST FOR EXPEDITED HEARING | |||
4/11/2006 | 019 - ME: Ruling | 4/11/2006 | |
4/8/2006 | REQ - Request | 4/11/2006 | |
NOTE: ADDENDUM TO/ FOR EXPEDITED TRIAL MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE | |||
4/7/2006 | REQ - Request | 4/11/2006 | |
NOTE: FOR EXPEDITED TRIAL MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE | |||
4/7/2006 | MOT - Motion | 4/11/2006 | |
NOTE: FOR INCREASE IN COST BOND AND REQUEST FOR EXPEDITED HEARING | |||
4/7/2006 | OBJ - Objection/Opposition. | 4/11/2006 | |
NOTE: TO PLAINTIFFS REQUEST FOR MARVIN S KRAMER TO ATTEND TRIAL OR ALTERNATIVELY MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION RE MOTION FOR PRO HAC VICE ADMISSION OF MARVIN S KRAMER | |||
4/7/2006 | RES - Response | 4/11/2006 | |
NOTE: TO PLAINTIFFS REQUEST TO ADD WITNESS FOR TRIAL AND COUNTERMOTION OF DEFENDANTS TO ADD REBUTTAL WITNESSES AND NOTICE OF CALLING PREVIOUSLY DISCLOSED WITNESS AND REQUEST FOR EXPEDITED HEARING | |||
4/5/2006 | REQ - Request | 4/7/2006 | |
NOTE: PLAINTIFFS/COUNTERDEFENDANTS' FOR MARVIN S KRAMER TO ATTEND TRIAL OR ALTERNATIVELY MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION RE MOTION FOR PRO HAC VICE ADMISSION OF MARVIN S KRAMER | |||
3/24/2006 | 019 - ME: Ruling | 3/24/2006 | |
3/13/2006 | MFR - Motion For Reconsideration | 3/17/2006 | |
NOTE: DEFENDANTS' S' A PART OF MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT | |||
3/10/2006 | 019 - ME: Ruling | 3/10/2006 | |
3/8/2006 | REL - Reply | 3/9/2006 | |
NOTE: TO RESPONSE TO OBJECTION TO MOTION FOR PRO HAC VICE ADMISSION OF MARVIN S KRAMER | |||
3/2/2006 | RES - Response | 3/9/2006 | |
NOTE: PLAINTIFFS/COUNTERDEFENDANTS' TO DEFENDANTS' OBJECTIN TO MOTION FOR PRO HAC VICE ADMISSION OF MARVIN S KRAMER | |||
2/14/2006 | OBJ - Objection/Opposition. | 2/15/2006 | |
NOTE: TO MOTION FOR PRO HAC VICE ADMISSION OF MARVIN S KRAMER | |||
2/14/2006 | ORD - Order | 2/22/2006 | |
NOTE: VACATING THE ADMISSION OF MARVIN S KRAMER PRO HAC VICE AND ALLOWING OBJECTION BY DEFENANTS | |||
2/1/2006 | PHO - Pro Hac Vice Order | 2/7/2006 | |
NOTE: MARVIN S KRAMER | |||
1/19/2006 | 019 - ME: Ruling | 1/19/2006 | |
1/19/2006 | MOT - Motion | 1/25/2006 | |
NOTE: AND CONSENT OF LOCAL COUNSEL FOR PRO HAC VICE ADMISSION OF MARVIN S KRAMER | |||
12/13/2005 | 064 - ME: Trial Continued/Reset | 12/13/2005 | |
12/5/2005 | 089 - ME: Trial Setting | 12/5/2005 | |
10/26/2005 | REL - Reply | 11/1/2005 | |
NOTE: TO PLAINTIFFS RESPONSE TO DEFENDANTS COUNTERCLAIMANTS MOTION IN LIMINE | |||
10/25/2005 | ORD - Order | 11/9/2005 | |
NOTE: PERMITTING DEPOSITIONS PRIOR TO TRIAL | |||
10/21/2005 | RES - Response | 10/24/2005 | |
NOTE: TO DEFENDANTS MOTION IN LIMINE | |||
10/20/2005 | MOT - Motion | 10/26/2005 | |
NOTE: FOR ORDER PERMITTING DEPOSITIONS PRIOR TO TRIAL AND REQUEST TO EXPEDITE | |||
10/19/2005 | REL - Reply | 10/25/2005 | |
NOTE: TO PLAINTIFFS RESPONSE TO DEFENDANTS MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT REGARDING DEFAMATION AND FALSE LIGHT INVASION OF PRIVACY | |||
10/18/2005 | 081 - ME: Trial Vacated | 10/18/2005 | |
10/12/2005 | REQ - Request | 10/20/2005 | |
NOTE: PROPOSED VOIR DIRE QUESTIONS | |||
10/12/2005 | REQ - Request | 10/20/2005 | |
NOTE: PROPOSED VOIR DIRE QUESTIONS | |||
10/12/2005 | REQ - Request | 10/20/2005 | |
NOTE: PROPOSED JURY INSTRUCTIONS | |||
10/12/2005 | REQ - Request | 10/20/2005 | |
NOTE: JURY INSTRUCTIONS | |||
10/12/2005 | MOT - Motion | 10/19/2005 | |
NOTE: TO VACATE A PORTION OF THE MINUTE ENTRY OF 10/06/2005 | |||
10/12/2005 | STA - Statement | 10/20/2005 | |
NOTE: JOINT PRETRIAL | |||
10/11/2005 | RES - Response | 10/14/2005 | |
NOTE: TO DEFENDANTS MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT REGARDING DEFAMATION AND FALSE LIGHT INVASION OF PRIVACY | |||
10/11/2005 | SOF - Statement Of Facts | 12/11/2007 | |
NOTE: PLAINTIFFS/COUNTERDEFENDANTS' STATEMENT OF FACTS IN SUPPORT OF RESPONSE TO DEFENDANTS' MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT REGARDING DEFAMATION AND FALSE LIGHT INVASION OF PROVACY | |||
10/7/2005 | ORD - Order | 10/17/2005 | |
NOTE: RESCHEDULING PRETRIAL CONFERENCE | |||
10/7/2005 | 019 - ME: Ruling | 10/7/2005 | |
10/5/2005 | SFC - Stipulation For Continuance | 10/12/2005 | |
NOTE: PRETRIAL CONFERENCE | |||
9/29/2005 | RES - Response | 10/6/2005 | |
NOTE: DEFENDANTS' TO PLAINTIFFS/COUNTERDEFENDANTS' MOTION TO STRIKE DEFENDANTS' SUPPLEMENT STATEMENT OF FACTS IN REPLY TO PLAINTIFFS' STATEMENT OF FACTS IN SUPPORT OF RESPONSE TO MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT | |||
9/29/2005 | RES - Response | 10/6/2005 | |
NOTE: DEFENDANTS' TO PLAINTIFFS' MOTION IN LIMINE | |||
9/29/2005 | MOT - Motion | 10/5/2005 | |
NOTE: DEFENDANTS' FOR ORAL ARGUMENT ON MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT | |||
9/21/2005 | MIL - Motion In Limine | 9/27/2005 | |
9/21/2005 | SOF - Statement Of Facts | 9/27/2005 | |
NOTE: SEPARATE/IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT REGARDING DEFAMATION AND FALSE LIGHT INVASION OF PRIVACY | |||
9/21/2005 | MIL - Motion In Limine | 9/27/2005 | |
9/21/2005 | MSJ - Motion For Summary Judgment | 9/27/2005 | |
NOTE: REGARDING DEFAMATION AND FALSE LIGHT INVASION OF PRIVACY AND MEMORANDUM OF POINT AND AUTHORTIES | |||
9/20/2005 | MOT - Motion | 9/26/2005 | |
NOTE: TO STRIKE DEFENDANTS SUPPLEMENTAL STATEMENT OF FACTS IN REPLY TO PLAINTIFFS STATEMENT OF FACTS IN SUPPORT OF RESPONSE TO MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT | |||
9/15/2005 | ANS - Answer | 9/20/2005 | |
NOTE: TO SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT/ PAID | |||
9/15/2005 | ORD - Order | 1/26/2006 | |
NOTE: DISCOVERY SHALL END ON AND ALL DISCOVERY RESPONSES SHALL BE DUE ON 9-9-2005 | |||
9/9/2005 | SOF - Statement Of Facts | 9/16/2005 | |
NOTE: SUPPLEMENTAL/ IN REPLY TO PLAINTIFFS STATEMENT OF FACTS IN SUPPORT OF RESPONSE TO MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT | |||
9/9/2005 | REL - Reply | 9/15/2005 | |
NOTE: TO PLAINTIFFS - COUNTERDEFENDANTS RESPONSE TO MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT AND MEMORANDUM OF POINT AND AUTHORITIES | |||
9/7/2005 | STP - Stipulation | 10/13/2005 | |
NOTE: TO EXTEND DISCOVERY | |||
9/1/2005 | AMC - Amended Complaint | 9/8/2005 | |
NOTE: SECOND/ | |||
8/29/2005 | SOF - Statement Of Facts | 9/1/2005 | |
NOTE: PLAINTIFF'S/COUNTERDEFENDANTS' IN SUPPORT OF RESPONSE TO MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT | |||
8/29/2005 | RES - Response | 9/1/2005 | |
NOTE: PLAINTIFFS/COUNTERDEFENDANTS' TO MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT | |||
7/15/2005 | ORD - Order | 7/22/2005 | |
NOTE: PERMITTING WITHDRAWAL AS ATTORNEY OF RECORD IN FAVOR OF WILCOX & WILCOX PC | |||
7/14/2005 | ORD - Order | 7/25/2005 | |
NOTE: TO COMPEL PRODUCTIN OF DOCUMENTS | |||
7/14/2005 | ORD - Order | 7/25/2005 | |
NOTE: PROTECTIVE | |||
7/13/2005 | MOT - Motion | 7/20/2005 | |
NOTE: TO WITHDRAW AS COUNSEL IN FAVOR OF WILCOX & WILCOX PC | |||
7/8/2005 | STP - Stipulation | 7/14/2005 | |
NOTE: REGARDING MOTION TO COMPEL ENTRY OF PROTECTIVE ORDER ANF FILING OF AMENDED COMPLAINT | |||
6/27/2005 | RES - Response | 7/5/2005 | |
NOTE: TO AMENDED COUNTERCLAIM | |||
6/16/2005 | MTC - Motion To Compel | 6/22/2005 | |
NOTE: PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS AND FOR ENTRY OF PROTECTIVE ORDER | |||
5/31/2005 | AMC - Amended Complaint | 5/31/2005 | |
NOTE: COUNTERCLAIM | |||
5/19/2005 | 053 - ME: Case Consolidation | 5/19/2005 | |
NOTE: CV2003-016751 CONSOLIDATED UNDER CV2003-016623 FOR ALL FURTHER PROCEEDINGS | |||
5/11/2005 | 019 - ME: Ruling | 5/11/2005 | |
5/10/2005 | MEM - Memorandum | 12/11/2007 | |
NOTE: JOINT RULE 16[B] SCHEDULING CONFERENCE MEMORANDUM | |||
4/12/2005 | ORD - Order | 4/19/2005 | |
NOTE: RE FILING DEADLINES FOR MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT | |||
3/9/2005 | 084 - ME: Case Continued Inactive Calendar | 3/9/2005 | |
3/2/2005 | ORD - Order | 3/16/2005 | |
NOTE: TO CONTINUE STATUS CONFERENCE | |||
2/23/2005 | MCO - Motion To Continue | 3/3/2005 | |
NOTE: JOINT STATUS CONFERENCE | |||
2/16/2005 | MSJ - Motion For Summary Judgment | 2/23/2005 | |
NOTE: DEFENDANTS' AND MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES | |||
2/16/2005 | SOF - Statement Of Facts | 2/24/2005 | |
NOTE: DEFENDANTS' SEPARATE IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT | |||
2/11/2005 | 070 - ME: Settlement Conference Set | 2/11/2005 | |
2/9/2005 | OBJ - Objection/Opposition. | 2/14/2005 | |
NOTE: TO EXTEND DISLCOSURE AND ADR DEADLINES | |||
2/9/2005 | ORD - Order | 2/24/2005 | |
NOTE: EXTENDING DISCLOSURE AND ADR DEADLINES | |||
1/31/2005 | MOT - Motion | 2/4/2005 | |
NOTE: TO EXTEND DISCLSURE AND ADR DEADLINES | |||
12/7/2004 | 070 - ME: Settlement Conference Set | 12/7/2004 | |
10/19/2004 | 084 - ME: Case Continued Inactive Calendar | 10/19/2004 | |
10/12/2004 | STA - Statement | 10/19/2004 | |
NOTE: DEFENDANTS' UNILATERAL PRETRIAL | |||
10/8/2004 | STA - Statement | 10/12/2004 | |
NOTE: UNILATERAL PRETRIAL/ | |||
7/15/2004 | ORD - Order | 7/23/2004 | |
NOTE: GRANTING PLAINTIFFS' MOTION TO CONTINUE ON THE INACTIVE CALENDAR | |||
7/7/2004 | 028 - ME: Status Conference Set | 7/7/2004 | |
6/30/2004 | MCC - Mot/Cont On Inactive Calendar | 7/8/2004 | |
NOTE: AND DEFENDANT/COUNTERCLAIMANT'S CONTROVERTING CERTIFICATE TO DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO SET AND CERTIFICATE OF READINESS | |||
6/21/2004 | MSE - Motion To Set & Cert/Readiness | 6/30/2004 | |
5/19/2004 | RES - Response | 5/26/2004 | |
NOTE: TO COUNTERCLAIM | |||
4/29/2004 | NDC - Notice Of Deposit With Court | 5/3/2004 | |
NOTE: $2000.00 COURT ORDERED BOND | |||
4/29/2004 | NOT - Notice | 5/3/2004 | |
NOTE: OF POSTING BONDS | |||
4/28/2004 | AFS - Affidavit Of Service | 5/5/2004 | |
NOTE: JOHN R WOLFE SERVED 4-22-04 | |||
4/28/2004 | AFS - Affidavit Of Service | 5/5/2004 | |
NOTE: VICKI S WOLFE SERVED 4-22-04 | |||
4/28/2004 | SUM - Summons | 5/6/2004 | |
NOTE: THIRD PARTY | |||
4/19/2004 | COM - Complaint | 4/28/2004 | |
NOTE: THIRD PARTY | |||
4/19/2004 | ANS - Answer | 5/5/2004 | |
NOTE: AND COUNTERCLAIM | |||
4/1/2004 | 019 - ME: Ruling | 4/1/2004 | |
3/29/2004 | ORD - Order | 4/7/2004 | |
NOTE: GRANTING DEFENDANTS MOTION FOR THE PLAINTIFFS TO POST BOND | |||
2/17/2004 | REL - Reply | 3/5/2004 | |
NOTE: TO PLAINTIFFS RESPONSE TO DEFENDANTS MOTION FOR PLAINTIFFS TO POST BOND | |||
2/10/2004 | RES - Response | 4/14/2004 | |
NOTE: TO DEFENDANTS MOTION FOR PLAINTIFFS TO POST BOND | |||
2/4/2004 | 311 - ME: 150 Day Minute Entry | 2/4/2004 | |
2/2/2004 | ORD - Order | 4/8/2004 | |
NOTE: FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO FILE REPLY TO RESPONSE TO MOTION TO DISMISS DERIVATIVE ACTION | |||
1/30/2004 | REL - Reply | 4/14/2004 | |
NOTE: TO RESPONSE TO MOTION TO DISMISS DERIVATIVE ACTION OR ALTERNATIVELY STRIKE IN PART AND STAY PENDING OUTCOME OF PLAINTIFFS DIRECT ACTION | |||
1/28/2004 | MOT - Motion | 4/14/2004 | |
NOTE: TO EXPEDITE | |||
1/28/2004 | MOT - Motion | 4/14/2004 | |
NOTE: FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO FILE REPLY TO RESPONSE TO MOTION TO DISMISS DERIVATIVE ACTION | |||
1/23/2004 | MOT - Motion | 4/14/2004 | |
NOTE: FOR PLAINTIFFS TO POST BOND | |||
1/22/2004 | ORD - Order | 4/14/2004 | |
NOTE: TO EXCEED PAGE LIMIT | |||
1/22/2004 | ORD - Order | 4/14/2004 | |
NOTE: TO EXPEDITE | |||
1/15/2004 | MOT - Motion | 4/12/2004 | |
NOTE: TO EXCEED PAGE LIMIT | |||
1/15/2004 | MOT - Motion | 4/12/2004 | |
NOTE: TO EXPEDITE | |||
1/15/2004 | RES - Response | 4/14/2004 | |
NOTE: TO MOTION TO DISMISS DERIVATIVE ACTION OR ALTERNATIVELY STRIKE IN PART AND STAY PENDING OUTCOME OF PLAINTIFFS DIRECT ACTION | |||
12/31/2003 | ANS - Answer | 1/12/2004 | |
NOTE: MOTION TO DISMISS DERIVITIVE ACTION OR ALTERNATIVELY STRIKE IN PART AND STAY PENDING OUTCOME OF PLAINTIFFS DIRECT ACTION/ PAID | |||
12/17/2003 | AAD - Application And Affidavit Of Default | 12/22/2003 | |
12/17/2003 | AAD - Application And Affidavit Of Default | 12/22/2003 | |
12/17/2003 | AAD - Application And Affidavit Of Default | 12/22/2003 | |
12/10/2003 | 322 - ME: Notice Of Intent To Dismiss | 12/10/2003 | |
12/3/2003 | NOF - Notice Of Filing | 4/1/2004 | |
NOTE: VERIFICATION | |||
9/24/2003 | AMC - Amended Complaint | 9/29/2003 | |
NOTE: FIRST | |||
9/2/2003 | COM - Complaint | 9/5/2003 | |
9/2/2003 | CCN - Cert Arbitration - Not Subject | 9/5/2003 |
Case Calendar | ||
---|---|---|
Date | Time | Event |
10/13/2004 | 9:15 | Pre-Trial Conference |
3/2/2005 | 9:15 | Pre-Trial Conference |
4/19/2005 | 9:00 | Civil Settlement Conference |
5/12/2005 | 9:15 | Pre-Trial Conference |
5/26/2005 | 9:00 | Civil Settlement Conference |
8/11/2005 | 9:00 | Civil Settlement Conference |
10/7/2005 | 10:00 | Pre-Trial Conference |
10/14/2005 | 14:00 | Pre-Trial Conference |
11/1/2005 | 9:30 | Trial |
12/1/2005 | 9:15 | Status Conference |
12/9/2005 | 14:00 | Oral Argument |
4/11/2006 | 9:30 | Trial |
5/2/2006 | 9:30 | Trial |
5/3/2006 | 9:30 | Trial |
5/4/2006 | 9:30 | Trial |
5/8/2006 | 9:30 | Trial |
5/9/2006 | 9:30 | Trial |
5/10/2006 | 9:30 | Trial |
5/11/2006 | 9:30 | Trial |
5/15/2006 | 9:30 | Trial |
5/16/2006 | 9:30 | Trial |
5/17/2006 | 9:30 | Trial |
8/14/2006 | 9:15 | Status Conference |
8/14/2006 | 9:15 | Oral Argument |
1/31/2007 | 9:00 | Status Conference |
9/21/2007 | 10:00 | Status Conference |
10/22/2008 | 9:00 | Judgment Debtor Exam |
2/11/2009 | 9:00 | Judgment Debtor Exam |
Judgments | |||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Date | (F)or / (A)gainst | Amount | Frequency | Type | Status |
12/10/2008 | F:Tom Mercer | $14,222.57 | One Time | Principal | |
F:Sherri Wyner | |||||
F:Steve Wyner | |||||
F:Lin Pyles | |||||
F:Janice Mercer | |||||
F:John Pyles | |||||
A: Carrie M Wilcox | |||||
A: Gregory A Larson | |||||
12/10/2008 | F:Tom Mercer | $82.01 | One Time | Costs | |
F:Sherri Wyner | |||||
F:Steve Wyner | |||||
F:Lin Pyles | |||||
F:Janice Mercer | |||||
F:John Pyles | |||||
A: Kay McLean | |||||
A: Uri Marcus | |||||
A: Nehemiah Covenant Corporation | |||||
10/3/2006 | F:Tom Mercer | $80,235.68 | One Time | Attorney Fee | |
F:Sherri Wyner | |||||
F:Steve Wyner | |||||
F:Lin Pyles | |||||
A: Kay McLean | |||||
A: Uri Marcus | |||||
10/3/2006 | F:Tom Mercer | $7,202.00 | One Time | Costs | |
F:Sherri Wyner | |||||
F:Steve Wyner | |||||
F:Lin Pyles | |||||
A: Kay McLean | |||||
A: Uri Marcus | |||||
5/17/2006 | F:Maricopa County Creditor | $1,754.46 | One Time | Judgment for Jury Fees | Satisfied |
A: Kay McLean | |||||
A: Uri Marcus | |||||
A: Tzeriach Hasadeh | |||||
A: Ma'Aleh Adumim |