Civil Court Case Information - Case History
« Return to search results
Case Information | |||
---|---|---|---|
Case Number: | CV2003-004880 | Judge: | Moskowitz, Frank |
File Date: | 3/13/2003 | Location: | Downtown |
Case Type: | Civil |
Party Information | |||
---|---|---|---|
Party Name | Relationship | Sex | Attorney |
Paul J Phillips | Plaintiff | Male | Mia Alexia |
Mayo Clinic Arizona | Defendant | Barry Halpern | |
Mayo Clinic Scottsdale | Defendant | Barry Halpern | |
Mayo Foundation | Defendant | Robert Feinberg | |
Mayo Clinic Hospital | Defendant | Barry Halpern | |
Mayo Clinics In Our Care | Defendant | Robert Feinberg | |
Mayo Regional Practices Arizona | Defendant | Barry Halpern | |
Mayo Foundation For Medical Education And Research | Defendant | Robert Feinberg | |
Mayo Health Plan Arizona | Defendant | Barry Halpern | |
Mayo Management Services Inc | Defendant | Robert Feinberg | |
Mayo Healthcare Network | Defendant | Robert Feinberg | |
Maricopa County Creditor | In The Matter Of (IMO) | Pro Per |
Case Documents | |||
---|---|---|---|
Filing Date | Description | Docket Date | Filing Party |
10/4/2007 | DEW - Disposition Of Exhibit Worksheet | 10/9/2007 | |
8/3/2007 | LED - 2.8 (d) Letter | 8/9/2007 | |
12/20/2006 | ODI - Order Of Dismissal | 12/22/2006 | |
NOTE: WITH PREJUDICE | |||
11/20/2006 | 078 - ME: Case On Dismissal Calendar | 11/20/2006 | |
11/17/2006 | SFD - Stipulation For Dismissal | 11/28/2006 | |
NOTE: WITH PREJUDICE | |||
11/17/2006 | NOS - Notice Of Settlement | 11/28/2006 | |
11/2/2006 | ORD - Order | 11/8/2006 | |
NOTE: AUTHORIZING ADDITIONAL TIME FOR FILING OF NOTICE OF ACCEPTANCE OF REMITTITUR | |||
10/30/2006 | STP - Stipulation | 11/6/2006 | |
NOTE: FOR ADDITIONAL TIME FOR FILING OF NOTICE OF ACCEPTANCE OF REMITTITUR | |||
10/23/2006 | 025 - ME: Case Status Minute Entry | 10/23/2006 | |
10/23/2006 | ORD - Order | 10/30/2006 | |
NOTE: MINUTE ENTRY NOTICE AND / | |||
10/19/2006 | 019 - ME: Ruling | 10/19/2006 | |
10/16/2006 | 005 - ME: Hearing | 10/16/2006 | |
10/16/2006 | 088 - ME: Case Transferred | 10/16/2006 | |
10/13/2006 | NOF - Notice Of Filing | 10/20/2006 | |
NOTE: SUPPLEMENTAL EXHIBIT REGARDING OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS' MOTION FOR REMITERATUR | |||
10/10/2006 | RES - Response | 10/11/2006 | |
NOTE: TO DEFENDANTS MOTION FOR RELIEF FROM JUDGMENT ON THE COURTS COMPARATIVE FAULT RULING PURSUANT TO RULES 60C1 AND C6 AND ALTERNATIVELY MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION PURSUANT TO RULES 7/12 AND 59 | |||
10/10/2006 | REL - Reply | 10/11/2006 | |
NOTE: ERRATA TO DEFENDANTS/ IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANTS RENEWED MOTION FOR JUDGMENT AS A MATTER OF LAW OR ALTERNATIVELY MOTION FOR NEW TRIAL OR ALTERNATIVELY FOR REMITTITUR | |||
10/10/2006 | OBJ - Objection/Opposition. | 10/11/2006 | |
NOTE: 1. TO PLAINTIFFS STATEMENT OF COSTS AND 2 OBJECTION TO FORM OF JUDGMENT | |||
10/5/2006 | 019 - ME: Ruling | 10/5/2006 | |
10/5/2006 | MOT - Motion | 10/10/2006 | |
NOTE: DEFENDANTS' FOR CLARIFICATION REGARDING JUDGMENT AND RELIEF FROM JDUGMETN IN REGARD TO UNSERVED OR NON-EXISTENT PARTIES PURSUANT TO RULE 60 | |||
10/2/2006 | REL - Reply | 10/3/2006 | |
NOTE: IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANTS RENEWED MOTION FOR JUDGMENT AS A MATTER OF LAW OR ALTERNATIVELY MOTION FOR NEW TRIAL OR ALTERNATIVELY FOR REMITTITUR | |||
9/27/2006 | MOT - Motion | 9/29/2006 | |
NOTE: FOR RELIEF FROM JUDGMENT ON THE COURT'S COMPARATIVE FAULT RULING PURSUANT TO RULES 60(C)(1) AND (C)(6) ALTERNATIVELY, MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION PURSUANT TO RULES 7.1 AND 59 | |||
9/21/2006 | 025 - ME: Case Status Minute Entry | 9/21/2006 | |
9/20/2006 | 019 - ME: Ruling | 9/20/2006 | |
9/19/2006 | SJU - Satisfaction Of Judgment | 9/19/2006 | |
9/18/2006 | RES - Response | 9/21/2006 | |
NOTE: PLAINTIFF'S IN OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS' RENEWED MOTION FOR JUDGMENT AS A MATTER OF LAW OR ALTERNATIVELY MOTION FOR NEW TRIAL OR ALTERNATIVELY FOR REMITTUTUR | |||
9/15/2006 | MOT - Motion | 9/20/2006 | |
NOTE: DEFENDANT'S EXPEDITED FOR STAY OF EXECUTION OF JUDGMENT | |||
9/15/2006 | 023 - ME: Order Entered By Court | 9/15/2006 | |
9/15/2006 | 023 - ME: Order Entered By Court | 9/15/2006 | |
9/15/2006 | 019 - ME: Ruling | 9/15/2006 | |
9/13/2006 | JUD - Judgment | 9/19/2006 | |
NOTE: Notice of filing and entry provided to the parties | |||
9/8/2006 | MOT - Motion | 9/13/2006 | |
NOTE: FOR IN-PERSON ORAL ARGUMENT | |||
9/7/2006 | 020 - ME: Matter Under Advisement | 9/7/2006 | |
8/30/2006 | MCO - Motion To Continue | 9/1/2006 | |
NOTE: COURT'S ORAL ARGUMENT HEARING REGARDING POST-TRIAL MATTERS | |||
8/30/2006 | MOT - Motion | 9/1/2006 | |
NOTE: DEFENDANTS' RENEWED FOR JUDGMENT AS A MATTER OF LAW OR ALTERNATIVELY MOTION FOR NEW TRIAL OR ALTERNATIVELY FOR REMITTITUR | |||
8/18/2006 | 094 - ME: Oral Argument Set | 8/18/2006 | |
8/15/2006 | RES - Response | 8/17/2006 | |
NOTE: MAYO CLINIC'S/ TO PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR JUDGMENT AFTER TRIAL AS TO THE AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSE OF COMPARATIVE NEGLIGENCE | |||
8/10/2006 | ORD - Order | 8/14/2006 | |
NOTE: DENYING MAYO CLINIC TO EXCEED THE PAGE LIMIT FOR THEIR MOTION FOR RENEWED JUDGMENT AS A MATTER OF LAW MOTION FOR NEW TRIAL OR ALTERNATIVELY REMITTITUR | |||
8/8/2006 | OBJ - Objection/Opposition. | 8/11/2006 | |
NOTE: TO MOTION FOR ENTRY OF JUDGMENT AND OBJECTIONS TO PLAINTIFFS PROPOSED JUDGMENT | |||
8/8/2006 | OBJ - Objection/Opposition. | 8/11/2006 | |
NOTE: TO PLAINTIFFS STATEMENT OF COSTS | |||
8/4/2006 | MOT - Motion | 8/9/2006 | |
NOTE: EXPEDITED/ TO EXCEED PAGE LIMIT FOR RENEWED MOTION FOR JUDGMENT AS A MATTER OF LAW, OR ALTERNATIVELY, MOTION FOR NEW TRIAL, OR ALTERNATIVELY, FOR REMITTITUR | |||
8/2/2006 | SOC - Statement Of Costs | 8/9/2006 | |
8/2/2006 | NOT - Notice | 8/9/2006 | |
NOTE: OF SUBMISSION OF ALTERNATE FORM OF JUDGMENT | |||
8/2/2006 | MOT - Motion | 8/9/2006 | |
NOTE: RENEWAL OF MOTION FOR JUDGMENT AGAINST TRIAL AS TO THE AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSE OF COMPARATIVE NEGLIGENCE | |||
7/28/2006 | MOT - Motion | 8/2/2006 | |
NOTE: FOR STAY PROCEEDINGS ON JUDGMENT | |||
7/26/2006 | 012 - ME: Trial | 7/26/2006 | |
7/25/2006 | MOT - Motion | 8/2/2006 | |
NOTE: FOR RULE 68D REMEDIES CONCERNING DEFENDANTS REJECTION OF PLAINTIFFS OFFER OF JUDGMENT AND SUBSEQUENT VERDICT AT TRIAL | |||
7/25/2006 | RES - Response | 7/31/2006 | |
NOTE: TO DEFENDANTS MOTION TO STAY PROCEEDINGS ON JUDGMENT | |||
7/21/2006 | 012 - ME: Trial | 7/21/2006 | |
7/21/2006 | 012 - ME: Trial | 7/21/2006 | |
7/20/2006 | 085 - ME: Conference | 7/20/2006 | |
7/20/2006 | 012 - ME: Trial | 7/20/2006 | |
7/20/2006 | REQ - Request | 7/24/2006 | |
NOTE: PLAINTIFFS SUPPLEMENTAL/ FOR MODIFIED JURY INSTRUCTION | |||
7/20/2006 | REQ - Request | 7/24/2006 | |
NOTE: SUPPLEMENTAL JURY INSTRUCTIONS AND FORM OF SPECIAL VERDICT | |||
7/20/2006 | JNO - Jury Note | 7/26/2006 | |
7/20/2006 | JNO - Jury Note | 7/26/2006 | |
7/20/2006 | JNO - Jury Note | 7/26/2006 | |
7/20/2006 | JNO - Jury Note | 7/26/2006 | |
7/20/2006 | VER - Verdict | 7/26/2006 | |
NOTE: UNSIGNED | |||
7/20/2006 | VER - Verdict | 7/26/2006 | |
NOTE: SIGNED | |||
7/20/2006 | WSH - Worksheet | 7/26/2006 | |
NOTE: TRIAL - HEARING | |||
7/20/2006 | JJF - Judgment For Jury Fees | 8/2/2006 | |
NOTE: Notice of filing and entry provided to the parties | |||
7/20/2006 | EXW - Exhibits Work Sheet | 8/18/2006 | |
7/19/2006 | JIN - Jury Instructions | 7/26/2006 | |
NOTE: FINAL | |||
7/19/2006 | JNO - Jury Note | 7/26/2006 | |
7/19/2006 | JQU - Jury Question | 7/26/2006 | |
7/19/2006 | MEM - Memorandum | 7/24/2006 | |
NOTE: SUPPLEMENTAL/ OF LAW REGARDING SCOPE OF PLAINTIFFS REBUTTAL | |||
7/19/2006 | MOT - Motion | 7/26/2006 | |
NOTE: TO ORDER DEFENDANTS TO REFRAIN FROM IMPROPER ARGUMENT | |||
7/18/2006 | RES - Response | 7/21/2006 | |
NOTE: TO PLAINTIFFS JULY 17, 2006 TRIAL MEMORANDUM AND SUBMISSION OF TRANSCRIPT TESTIMONY | |||
7/18/2006 | RES - Response | 7/21/2006 | |
NOTE: TO PLAINTIFFS SUPPLEMENTAL REQUESTED JURY INSTRUCTIONS AND FORM OF SPECIAL VERDICT | |||
7/18/2006 | OBJ - Objection/Opposition. | 7/21/2006 | |
NOTE: DEFENDANT MAYO CLINIC ARIZONAS/ TO PLAINTIFFS SUPPLEMENTAL REQUEST FOR MODIFIED JURY INSTRUCTION | |||
7/18/2006 | 012 - ME: Trial | 7/18/2006 | |
7/17/2006 | NOT - Notice | 7/19/2006 | |
NOTE: SUBMISSON OF TRANSCRIPT TESTIMONY NECESSARY FOR REVIEW BY THE COURT FOR ADJUDICATION OF PLAINTIFFS ANTICIPATED CHALLENGES TO EXPERT TESTIMONY ON BASIS OF FOUNDATION AND NON-DISCLOSURE AND TRIAL MEMORANDUM | |||
7/17/2006 | NOT - Notice | 7/19/2006 | |
NOTE: OF SUBMISSION OF ADDITIONAL TRIAL EXHIBIT #192 | |||
7/17/2006 | MOT - Motion | 7/19/2006 | |
NOTE: FOR JUDGMENT AS A MATTER OF LAW | |||
7/17/2006 | MOT - Motion | 7/19/2006 | |
NOTE: FOR ORDER PRECLUDING COMMENT ON EXTRANEOUS MATTERS NOT RECEIVED INTO EVIDENCE;AND SUPPLEMENTAL PROPOSED JURY INSTRUCTIONS | |||
7/13/2006 | 022 - ME: Order Signed | 7/13/2006 | |
7/12/2006 | 012 - ME: Trial | 7/12/2006 | |
7/12/2006 | OBJ - Objection/Opposition. | 7/17/2006 | |
NOTE: & MOTION TO QUASH PLAS SUBPOENA TO DEFENSE EXPERT DR DUGEL | |||
7/12/2006 | MOT - Motion | 7/17/2006 | |
NOTE: TO PRECLUDE DEFS FROM OFFERING EVIDENCE OF TIME OF ALTERATION OF EXHIBIT 2 MEDICAL RECORD FOR REASON OF NON DISCLOSURE & LACK OF FOUNDATION | |||
7/12/2006 | MOT - Motion | 7/17/2006 | |
NOTE: TO STRIKE & OR DEEM WAIVED DEFS UNTIMELY OBJECTIONS TO PLAS DEPOSITION TESTIMONY SET FORTH BY PAGE & LINE REFERENCE IN THE JOINT PRETRIAL STATEMENT FILED BY THE PARTIES ON 8-17-05 | |||
7/12/2006 | RES - Response | 7/17/2006 | |
NOTE: TO DEFS OBJECTION & MOTION TO QUASH PLAS SUBPOENA TO DEFENSE EXPERT DR DUGEL | |||
7/12/2006 | OBJ - Objection/Opposition. | 7/17/2006 | |
NOTE: TO DEFS DESIGNATION OF DEPOSITION TESTIMONY NON DISCLOSURE & UNFAIR SUPRISE | |||
7/7/2006 | OBJ - Objection/Opposition. | 7/13/2006 | |
NOTE: TO PLAS PAGE LINE DESIGNATIONS | |||
7/5/2006 | LET - Letter | 7/26/2006 | |
7/5/2006 | JQU - Jury Question | 7/26/2006 | |
7/5/2006 | JQU - Jury Question | 7/26/2006 | |
7/3/2006 | 012 - ME: Trial | 7/3/2006 | |
7/3/2006 | 012 - ME: Trial | 7/3/2006 | |
6/30/2006 | 012 - ME: Trial | 6/30/2006 | |
6/28/2006 | 012 - ME: Trial | 6/28/2006 | |
6/28/2006 | JQU - Jury Question | 7/26/2006 | |
6/27/2006 | JQU - Jury Question | 7/26/2006 | |
6/27/2006 | JQU - Jury Question | 7/26/2006 | |
6/26/2006 | JIN - Jury Instructions | 7/26/2006 | |
6/26/2006 | JUL - Jury List - Restricted if Filed after 1/1/2008 | 7/26/2006 | |
6/26/2006 | OBJ - Objection/Opposition. | 6/30/2006 | |
NOTE: PLAINTIFF'S TO DEFENDANT'S EXHIBITS | |||
6/26/2006 | DPR - Deposition Report | 8/8/2006 | |
NOTE: OF DEBBI JASKOWSKI BY TERI L HOSKINS ON 07/08/04 | |||
6/26/2006 | DPR - Deposition Report | 8/8/2006 | |
NOTE: VIDEOCONFERENCE/ OF SUZANNE M DODSON BY CAROLINE L MILLER ON 12/23/06 | |||
6/26/2006 | DPR - Deposition Report | 8/8/2006 | |
NOTE: VIDEOTAPED/ OF DAVID REDFORD LILJENQUIST MD BY JENNIFER PANCRATZ ON 07/27/04 | |||
6/26/2006 | DPR - Deposition Report | 8/8/2006 | |
NOTE: OF DR JOHN CREASMAN BY BRENDA J BROWN ON 03/12/04 | |||
6/26/2006 | DPR - Deposition Report | 8/8/2006 | |
NOTE: OF PRAVIN U DUGEL MD BY CAROLE A WHIPPLE ON 09/15/04 | |||
6/26/2006 | DPR - Deposition Report | 8/8/2006 | |
NOTE: OF DAVID W HANSON MD BY RACHELLE K YOUNG ON 03/26/04 | |||
6/26/2006 | DPR - Deposition Report | 8/8/2006 | |
NOTE: OF JENNIFER LANG BY TERI L HOSKINS ON 07/14/04 | |||
6/26/2006 | DPR - Deposition Report | 8/8/2006 | |
NOTE: OF PAUL J HUGHES BY JANE M DOYLE ON 02/18/04 | |||
6/26/2006 | DPR - Deposition Report | 8/8/2006 | |
NOTE: OF THOMAS MCPHEE MD BY CAROLE A WHIPPLE ON 04/21/04 | |||
6/26/2006 | DPR - Deposition Report | 8/8/2006 | |
NOTE: CONTINUED TELEPHONIC/ OF CHERI CHANDLER BY RACHELLE K YOUNG ON 07/06/04 VOLUME II | |||
6/26/2006 | TSP - Transcript of Proceedings | 8/8/2006 | |
NOTE: BY DENISE S COUVARAS ON 06/17/06 | |||
6/26/2006 | TSP - Transcript of Proceedings | 8/8/2006 | |
NOTE: BY DENISE S COUVARAS ON 06/16/04 | |||
6/26/2006 | DPR - Deposition Report | 8/8/2006 | |
NOTE: OF JOHN STROM BY JENNIFER PANCRATZ ON 07/22/04 | |||
6/26/2006 | DPR - Deposition Report | 8/8/2006 | |
NOTE: VIDEOTAPED/ OF JOHN CUSTER BY TERI L HOSKINS ON 07/06/04 | |||
6/26/2006 | DPR - Deposition Report | 8/8/2006 | |
NOTE: OF JUDY DECHANT BY GEORGE B FINN III ON 12/20/04 | |||
6/26/2006 | DPR - Deposition Report | 8/8/2006 | |
NOTE: OF JULIE ABRAHAM BY TERI L HOSKINS ON 07/14/04 | |||
6/26/2006 | DPR - Deposition Report | 8/8/2006 | |
NOTE: OF CHERI CHANDLER BY CAROLE A WHIPPLE ON 06/25/04 | |||
6/26/2006 | DPR - Deposition Report | 8/8/2006 | |
NOTE: OF ROBERTA HUGHES BY SOMMER E GREENE ON 06/24/04 | |||
6/23/2006 | 021 - ME: Nunc Pro Tunc Order | 6/23/2006 | |
6/23/2006 | RES - Response | 6/28/2006 | |
NOTE: PLAINTIFFS TO DEFENDANTS' MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION OF DENIAL OF DEFENDANTS' MOTION IN LIMINE NO 12 | |||
6/23/2006 | MIL - Motion In Limine | 6/28/2006 | |
6/23/2006 | NOF - Notice Of Filing | 6/28/2006 | |
NOTE: PLAINTIFFS' OF EXHIBITS RELEVANT TO COURTS' ADJUDICATION OF PENDING MOTIONS OF THE PLAINTIFF | |||
6/23/2006 | MFR - Motion For Reconsideration | 6/28/2006 | |
NOTE: OF GRANT OF SUMMARY JUDGMENT AS TO PLAINTIFFS' CLAIM FOR PUNITIVE DAMAGES | |||
6/23/2006 | NOT - Notice | 6/28/2006 | |
NOTE: OF INVOCATION OR RULE EXCLUDING WITNESSES | |||
6/23/2006 | MOT - Motion | 6/28/2006 | |
NOTE: EXPEDITED TO REQUIRE TESTIMONY OF FORMER COUNSEL AS MATERIAL FACT WITNESS | |||
6/23/2006 | MOT - Motion | 6/28/2006 | |
NOTE: EXPEDITED TO REQUIRE DEFENDANTS TO PROVIDE FULL DISCLOSURE CONCERNING MATERIAL WITNESS PAULA ASH OR THE NAME AND IDENTITY OF SAID PERSON USING AN ALIAS | |||
6/22/2006 | RES - Response | 6/28/2006 | |
NOTE: DEFENDANTS' TO PLAINTIFF'S EXPEDITED MOTION TO REQUIRE TESTIMONY OF DEFENSE COUNSEL | |||
6/22/2006 | RES - Response | 6/28/2006 | |
NOTE: DEFENDANTS' TO EXPEDITED MOTION TO REQUIRE DEFENDANTS TO PROVIDE FULL DISCLOSURE CONCERNING MATERIAL WITNESS PAULA ASH | |||
6/20/2006 | 027 - ME: Pretrial Conference | 6/20/2006 | |
6/20/2006 | MOT - Motion | 6/22/2006 | |
NOTE: EXPEDITED TO REQUIRE DEFENDANTS TO PROVIDE FULL DISCLOSURE CONCERNING MATERIAL WITNESS PAULA ASH OR THE NAME AND IDENTITY OF SAID PERSON USING AN ALIAS | |||
6/20/2006 | MOT - Motion | 6/22/2006 | |
NOTE: EXPEDITED TO REQUIRE TESTIMONY OF FORMER COUNSEL AS MATERIAL FACT WITNESS | |||
6/19/2006 | AFS - Affidavit Of Service | 6/21/2006 | |
NOTE: OF PLAINTIFF'S CIVIL TRIAL SUBPOENA | |||
6/19/2006 | AFS - Affidavit Of Service | 6/21/2006 | |
NOTE: OF PLAINTIFF'S CIVIL TRIAL SUBPOENA | |||
6/19/2006 | AFS - Affidavit Of Service | 6/21/2006 | |
NOTE: OF PLAINTIFF'S CIVIL TRIAL SUBPOENA | |||
6/16/2006 | MFR - Motion For Reconsideration | 6/19/2006 | |
NOTE: DENIAL OF MOTION IN LIMINE NO 2 REGARDING PRECLUDING CRITICISMS AGAINST MAYO CLINIC EMPLOYERS | |||
6/16/2006 | 083 - ME: Conference Reset/Cont | 6/16/2006 | |
6/15/2006 | OBJ - Objection/Opposition. | 6/19/2006 | |
NOTE: TO PLAINTIFFS TRIAL EXHIBITS | |||
6/15/2006 | DPR - Deposition Report | 8/8/2006 | |
NOTE: OF ANTHONY DEBEUS MD BY DOREEN M LOBOCK ON 01/27/04 | |||
6/15/2006 | DPR - Deposition Report | 8/8/2006 | |
NOTE: OF PAUL J PHILLIPS BY JANE M DOYLE ON 01/26/04 | |||
6/15/2006 | DPR - Deposition Report | 8/8/2006 | |
NOTE: OF J SHEPARD BRYAN III MD BY JANE M DOYLE ON 03/29/04 | |||
6/15/2006 | DPR - Deposition Report | 8/8/2006 | |
NOTE: OF LUWANNA T PHILLIPS BY MICHAELA H DAVIS ON 12/03/04 | |||
6/15/2006 | DPR - Deposition Report | 8/8/2006 | |
NOTE: OF JOHN MAGGIANO MD BY DARA C SCHULER ON 06/12/04 | |||
6/15/2006 | DPR - Deposition Report | 8/8/2006 | |
NOTE: OF RICHARD G CARRIKER MD BY JANE M DOYLE ON 01/30/04 | |||
6/13/2006 | NOT - Notice | 6/16/2006 | |
NOTE: TIME ESTIMATES FOR TRIAL | |||
6/13/2006 | MOT - Motion | 6/16/2006 | |
NOTE: TO REINSTATE PRETRIAL MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE OF IN THE ALTERNATIVE CONTINUE THE PRE-TRIAL MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE | |||
6/9/2006 | MCO - Motion To Continue | 6/12/2006 | |
NOTE: PLAINTIFF'S THE PRETRIAL MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SET FOR JUNE 14 2006 AT 8:45 AM | |||
5/30/2006 | RES - Response | 6/1/2006 | |
NOTE: IN OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS MOTION IN LIMINE NO 12 RE DR MAGGIANO'S OPINIONS AND REQUEST FOR CONSIDERATION OF JUDGMENT AS A MATTER OF LAW | |||
5/30/2006 | AFS - Affidavit Of Service | 5/31/2006 | |
NOTE: OF PLAINTIFF'S CIVIL TRIAL SUBPONEA | |||
5/30/2006 | AFS - Affidavit Of Service | 5/31/2006 | |
NOTE: OF PLAINTIFF'S CIVIL TRIAL SUBPOENA | |||
5/30/2006 | AFS - Affidavit Of Service | 5/31/2006 | |
NOTE: OF PLAINTIFF'S CIVIL TRIAL SUBPOENA | |||
5/30/2006 | AFS - Affidavit Of Service | 5/31/2006 | |
NOTE: OF PLAINTIFF'S CIVIL TRIAL SUBPOENA | |||
5/30/2006 | AFS - Affidavit Of Service | 5/31/2006 | |
NOTE: OF PLAINTIFF'S CIVIL TRIAL SUBPOENA | |||
5/29/2006 | 085 - ME: Conference | 5/29/2006 | |
5/17/2006 | MIL - Motion In Limine | 5/19/2006 | |
NOTE: DEFENDANT MAYO CLINIC ARIZONA'S NO 12 RE DR MAGGIANO'S OPINIONS AND REQUEST FOR CONSIDERATION OF JUDGMENT AS A MATTER OF LAW IF GRANTED | |||
5/16/2006 | 085 - ME: Conference | 5/16/2006 | |
3/24/2006 | 083 - ME: Conference Reset/Cont | 3/24/2006 | |
2/23/2006 | NOT - Notice | 2/24/2006 | |
NOTE: OF TRIAL CONFLICT | |||
12/7/2005 | ORD - Order | 12/21/2005 | |
NOTE: STRIKING PLAINTIFF'S OFFER OF PROOF AND AMENDED DISCLOSURE STATEMENT ATTACHED THERETO | |||
11/29/2005 | NOT - Notice | 12/6/2005 | |
NOTE: OFFER OF JUDGMENT TO DEFENDANTS | |||
11/3/2005 | MOT - Motion | 11/8/2005 | |
NOTE: TO STRIKE PLAINTIFF'S OFFER OF PROOF IN OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS' MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT RELEVANT TO OCTOBER 20 2005 HEARING AND ATTACHED UNTIMELY AMENDED DISCLOSURE STATEMENT | |||
10/24/2005 | 089 - ME: Trial Setting | 10/24/2005 | |
10/20/2005 | NOT - Notice | 10/26/2005 | |
NOTE: OFFER OF PROOF IN OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT RELEVANT TO OCTOBER 20,2005 HEARING | |||
8/30/2005 | 094 - ME: Oral Argument Set | 8/30/2005 | |
8/26/2005 | REL - Reply | 8/30/2005 | |
NOTE: DEFENDANT MAYO CLINIC ARIZONA'S IN SUPPORT OF ITS MOTION TO STRIKE AFFIDAVIT OF DR JOHN M MAGGIANO | |||
8/22/2005 | 028 - ME: Status Conference Set | 8/22/2005 | |
8/17/2005 | STA - Statement | 8/22/2005 | |
NOTE: JOINT PRETRIAL | |||
8/16/2005 | RES - Response | 8/19/2005 | |
NOTE: TO DEFENDANTS MOTION TO STRIKE AFFIDAVIT OF DR JOHN M MAGGIANO | |||
8/15/2005 | RES - Response | 8/19/2005 | |
NOTE: TO DEFENDANTS MOTION TO STRIKE AFFIDAVIT OF DR JOHN M MAGGIANO | |||
8/4/2005 | REL - Reply | 8/11/2005 | |
NOTE: PLAINTIFF PAUL PHILLIPS' IN SUPPORT OF HIS MOTION TO STRIKE DEFENDANT'S UNTIMELY MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT | |||
7/25/2005 | RES - Response | 7/29/2005 | |
NOTE: TO PLAINTIFFS MOTION TO STRIKE DEFENDANTS UNTIMELY MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT | |||
7/15/2005 | 019 - ME: Ruling | 7/15/2005 | |
7/13/2005 | RES - Response | 7/20/2005 | |
NOTE: IN OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT (WITHOUT WAIVER OF PLAINTIFFS MOTION TO STRIKE UNTIMELY MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT) | |||
7/13/2005 | MOT - Motion | 7/20/2005 | |
NOTE: TO STRIKE DEFENDANTS UNTIMELY MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT | |||
7/13/2005 | SOF - Statement Of Facts | 7/20/2005 | |
7/8/2005 | MCC - Mot/Cont On Inactive Calendar | 7/18/2005 | |
NOTE: PLAINTIFF'S | |||
6/28/2005 | MSJ - Motion For Summary Judgment | 7/13/2005 | |
NOTE: DEFENDANT MAYO CLINIC ARIZONA'S RE CAUSATION | |||
6/28/2005 | SOF - Statement Of Facts | 7/13/2005 | |
NOTE: DEFENDANT MAYO CLINIC ARIZONA'S IN SUPPORT OF ITS MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT RE CAUSATION | |||
6/21/2005 | RES - Response | 6/23/2005 | |
NOTE: TO DEFENDANTS MOTION FOR SANCTIONS, ATTORNEYS FEES AND TAXABLE COSTS (ORAL ARGUMENT REQUESTED) | |||
6/20/2005 | RES - Response | 6/24/2005 | |
NOTE: TO PLAINTIFFS EXPEDITED MOTION TO RESTORE CASE TO ACTIVE CALENDAR UPON ANNOUNCEMENT OF READINESS FOR TRIAL; REQUEST FOR SETTING OF TRIAL; MOTION TO PERMIT CASE TO PROCEED IN ABSENCE OF JOINT PRETRIAL STATEMENT AND OR UPON PLAINTIFFS PROPOSED PRETRIAL STATEMENT; MOTION FOR FINAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE AND FOR DISPOSITION OF PRETRIAL MOTIONS | |||
6/1/2005 | MOT - Motion | 6/7/2005 | |
NOTE: PLAINTIFF'S EXPEDITED TO RESTORE CASE TO ACTIVE CALENDER UPON ANNOUNCEMENT OF READINESS FOR TRIAL | |||
6/1/2005 | MSE - Motion To Set & Cert/Readiness | 6/13/2005 | |
NOTE: PLAINTIFF'S | |||
5/31/2005 | MOT - Motion | 6/7/2005 | |
NOTE: FOR TAXABLE COSTS | |||
5/9/2005 | 078 - ME: Case On Dismissal Calendar | 5/9/2005 | |
3/24/2005 | 081 - ME: Trial Vacated | 3/24/2005 | |
3/23/2005 | STA - Statement | 3/28/2005 | |
NOTE: JOINT PRETRIAL/ SUBMISSION | |||
3/18/2005 | RES - Response | 3/24/2005 | |
NOTE: TO PLAITNIFF'S MOTIONS IN LIMINE | |||
2/14/2005 | REL - Reply | 2/18/2005 | |
NOTE: IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT | |||
2/14/2005 | REL - Reply | 2/18/2005 | |
NOTE: IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR SUMMARY DISPOSITION RE MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT RE PUNITIVE DAMAGES | |||
2/14/2005 | REL - Reply | 2/18/2005 | |
NOTE: IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO STRIKE PLAINTIFF'S JOINT PRETRIAL STATEMENT | |||
2/8/2005 | 023 - ME: Order Entered By Court | 2/8/2005 | |
1/31/2005 | SOF - Statement Of Facts | 2/7/2005 | |
NOTE: PLAINTIFF'S SUBMITTTED IN OPPOSITION TO MAYO DEFENDANTS' MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT | |||
1/31/2005 | RES - Response | 2/4/2005 | |
NOTE: IN OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS MOTION FOR PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT | |||
1/31/2005 | RES - Response | 2/4/2005 | |
NOTE: IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION FOR SUMMARY DISPOSITION REGARDING MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT REGARDING PUNITIVE DAMAGES | |||
1/31/2005 | RES - Response | 2/4/2005 | |
NOTE: TO DEFENDANTS MOTION TO STRIKE PLAINTIFFS JOINT PRETRIAL STATEMENT | |||
1/31/2005 | NOT - Notice | 2/4/2005 | |
NOTE: OF WITHDRAWAL OF PLAINTIFFS JOINT PRETRIAL STATEMENT | |||
1/12/2005 | 019 - ME: Ruling | 1/12/2005 | |
1/10/2005 | MOT - Motion | 1/18/2005 | |
NOTE: FOR SUMMARY DISPOSITION REGARDING MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT REGARDING PUNITIVE DAMAGES | |||
1/10/2005 | MOT - Motion | 1/18/2005 | |
NOTE: TO STRIKE PLAINTIFFS JOINT PRETRIAL STATEMENT | |||
12/2/2004 | OBJ - Objection/Opposition. | 12/8/2004 | |
NOTE: PLAINTIFF'S TO FIRST DISCOVERY ORDER OF SPECIAL MASTER | |||
11/23/2004 | RES - Response | 12/1/2004 | |
NOTE: TO MOTION TO COMPEL DEFENDANTS' RESPONSES TO PLAINTIFF'S DISCOVERY | |||
11/22/2004 | ORD - Order | 12/2/2004 | |
NOTE: FIRST DISCOVERY OF SPECIAL MASTER | |||
11/16/2004 | MTC - Motion To Compel | 11/23/2004 | |
NOTE: RESPONSES TO PLAINTIFFS UNIFORM INTERROGATORIES MOTION FOR HEARING UPON OBJECTIONS TO PLAINTIFFS UNIFORM INTERROGATORIES MOTION FOR SANCTIONS | |||
11/16/2004 | MTC - Motion To Compel | 11/23/2004 | |
NOTE: PLAINTIFF'S/DEFENDANTS' RESPONSE TO PLAINTIFF'S DISCOVERY | |||
11/16/2004 | CER - Certificate | 11/24/2004 | |
NOTE: OF COUNSEL PURSUAN TO RULE 26(G) | |||
11/16/2004 | REL - Reply | 11/24/2004 | |
NOTE: PLAINTIFF'S CONCERNING PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO COMPEL EXPERT FILE OF DR CRAIG SUITER AS REQUIRED IN ACCORDANCE WITH SUBPOENA | |||
11/16/2004 | REL - Reply | 11/24/2004 | |
NOTE: PLAINTIFF'S TO DEFENDANTS RESPONSE TO PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO COMPEL COMPLETE AND SECOND SET OF MEDICAL RECORDS EXCHANGED BY DEFENDANTS PURSUANT TO RULE 26.2(A) | |||
11/16/2004 | REL - Reply | 11/24/2004 | |
NOTE: PLAINTIFF'S CONCERNING PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO COMPEL EXPERT FILE OF DR CRAIG SUITER AS REQUIRED IN ACCORDANCE WITH SUBPOENA | |||
11/15/2004 | RES - Response | 11/23/2004 | |
NOTE: TO PLAINTIFFS MOTION TO COMPEL COMPLETE AND 2ND SET OF MEDICAL RECORDS EXCHANGED BY DEFENDANTS | |||
11/8/2004 | REL - Reply | 11/18/2004 | |
NOTE: PLAINTIFF'S TO DEFENDANTS' RESPONSE TO PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO COMPEL DATE FOR EXAMINATION OF PLAINTIFF'S ORIGINAL MEDICAL RECORDS AND FILES | |||
11/8/2004 | RES - Response | 11/19/2004 | |
NOTE: TO PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO COMPEL EXPERT FILE OF DR CRAIG SUITER | |||
11/4/2004 | 064 - ME: Trial Continued/Reset | 11/4/2004 | |
11/3/2004 | REP - Report | 11/16/2004 | |
NOTE: DISCOVERY | |||
10/29/2004 | CER - Certificate | 11/4/2004 | |
NOTE: OF COUNSEL IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFFS MOTION TO COMPEL COMPLETE AND 2ND SET OF MEDICAL RECORDS | |||
10/29/2004 | MTC - Motion To Compel | 11/4/2004 | |
NOTE: COMPLETE AND 2ND SET OF MEDICAL RECORDS EXCHANGED BY DEFENDANTS | |||
10/27/2004 | RES - Response | 11/4/2004 | |
NOTE: TO PALINTIFF'S MOTION TO COMPEL DEATE FOR EXAMINATION OF PLAINTIFF'S ORIGINAL MEDICAL RECORDS AND FILES | |||
10/21/2004 | RES - Response | 10/27/2004 | |
NOTE: PLAINTIFF'S TO DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO LIMINE NO 8 RE HANDWRITING EXPERT | |||
10/20/2004 | NOT - Notice | 11/5/2004 | |
NOTE: RULE 26(G) COMPLAINCE PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO COMPEL EXPERT FILE OF DR CRAIG SUITER AS REQUIRED IN ACCORDANCE WITH SUBPOENA SERVED | |||
10/20/2004 | MTC - Motion To Compel | 10/27/2004 | |
NOTE: EXPERT FILE OF DR CRAIG SUITER AS REQUIRED IN ACCORDANCE WITH SUBPOENA SERVED | |||
10/20/2004 | RES - Response | 10/28/2004 | |
NOTE: TO DEFENDANTS MOTION IN LIMINE NO 1 RE PAUL HUGHES TRAFFIC VIOLATIONS | |||
10/20/2004 | RES - Response | 10/28/2004 | |
NOTE: TO DEFENDANTS MOTION IN LIMINE NO 2 RE PRECLUDING CRITICISMS AGAINST ANY MAYO CLINIC EMPLOYEES | |||
10/20/2004 | RES - Response | 10/28/2004 | |
NOTE: TO DEFENDANTS MOTION IN LIMINE NO 9 RE BUILDING AND CODING | |||
10/20/2004 | RES - Response | 10/28/2004 | |
NOTE: TO DEFENDANTS MOTION IN LIMINE NO 10 TO PRECLUDE REFERENCE TO UNSUBSTANTIATED ALLEGATIONS | |||
10/20/2004 | RES - Response | 10/28/2004 | |
NOTE: DEFENDANTS MOTION IN LIMINE NO 7 RE SPECULATION OF DR MCPHEE | |||
10/20/2004 | RES - Response | 10/28/2004 | |
NOTE: TO DEFENDANTS MOTION IN LIMINE NO 6 RE DR SUITER | |||
10/20/2004 | RES - Response | 10/28/2004 | |
NOTE: TO DEFENDANTS MOTION IN LIMINE NO 5 RE FINANCIAL STATUS OF THE DEPARTMENT OF OPTHAMOLOGY | |||
10/20/2004 | RES - Response | 10/28/2004 | |
NOTE: TO DEFENDANTS MOTION IN LIMINE NO 4 RE OPINIONS OF SUBSEQUENT TREATING PHYSICIANS | |||
10/20/2004 | RES - Response | 10/28/2004 | |
NOTE: TO DEFENDANTS MOTION IN LIMINE NO 3 TO PRECLUDE ALL NON QUALIFIED WITNESSES FROM SPECULATING AS TO STANDARD OF CARE OR CAUSATION ISSUES | |||
10/20/2004 | RES - Response | 10/28/2004 | |
NOTE: TO DEFENDANTS MOTION IN LIMINE NO 11 RE SIZE OF LAW FIRM | |||
10/7/2004 | MTC - Motion To Compel | 10/20/2004 | |
NOTE: PLAINTIFF'S DATE FOR EXAMINATION OF PLAINTIFF'S ORIGINAL MEDICAL RECORDS AND FILES | |||
10/7/2004 | CER - Certificate | 10/18/2004 | |
NOTE: OF COUNSEL IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFFS MOTION TO COMPEL DATE FOR EXAMINATION OF PLAINTIFFS ORIGINAL MEDICAL RECORDS AND FILES | |||
10/6/2004 | 081 - ME: Trial Vacated | 10/6/2004 | |
10/5/2004 | REQ - Request | 10/12/2004 | |
NOTE: SUGGESTED VOIR DIRE QUESTION | |||
10/5/2004 | STA - Statement | 10/12/2004 | |
NOTE: PRETRIAL/ | |||
10/5/2004 | REQ - Request | 10/12/2004 | |
NOTE: PROPOSED VOIR DIRE | |||
10/5/2004 | REQ - Request | 10/12/2004 | |
NOTE: PROPOSED JURY INSTRUCTIONS | |||
10/5/2004 | MIL - Motion In Limine | 10/12/2004 | |
NOTE: NUMBER 11 REGARDING SIZE OF LAW FIRM | |||
10/5/2004 | MIL - Motion In Limine | 10/12/2004 | |
NOTE: NUMBER 10 TO PRECLUDE REFERENCE TO USUBSTANTIATED ALLEGATIONS | |||
10/5/2004 | MIL - Motion In Limine | 10/12/2004 | |
NOTE: NUMBER 9 REGARDING BILLING AND CODING | |||
10/5/2004 | MIL - Motion In Limine | 10/12/2004 | |
NOTE: NUMBER 8 REGARDING HANDWRITING EXPERT | |||
10/5/2004 | MIL - Motion In Limine | 10/12/2004 | |
NOTE: NUMBER 7 REGARDING SPECULATION OF DR MCPHEE | |||
10/5/2004 | MIL - Motion In Limine | 10/12/2004 | |
NOTE: NUMBER 6 REGARDING DR SUITER | |||
10/5/2004 | MIL - Motion In Limine | 10/12/2004 | |
NOTE: NUMBER 5 REGARDING FINANCIAL STATUS FO THE DEPARTMENT OF OPTHAMOLOGY | |||
10/5/2004 | MIL - Motion In Limine | 10/12/2004 | |
NOTE: NUMBER 4 REGARDING OPINIONS OF SUBSEQUENT TREATING PHYSICIANS | |||
10/5/2004 | MIL - Motion In Limine | 10/12/2004 | |
NOTE: NUMBER 3 TO PRECLUDE ALL NON QUALIFIED WITNESSES FROM SPECULATING AS TO STANDARD OF CARE OF CAUSATION ISSUES | |||
10/5/2004 | MIL - Motion In Limine | 10/12/2004 | |
NOTE: NO 2 RE PRECLUDING CRITICISMS AGAINST ANY MAYO CLINIC EMPLOYEES | |||
10/5/2004 | MIL - Motion In Limine | 10/12/2004 | |
NOTE: NO 1 RE PAUL HUGHES TRAFFIC VIOLATIONS | |||
10/4/2004 | REQ - Request | 10/8/2004 | |
NOTE: JURY INSTRUCTIONS AND PROPOSED VERDICT FORM | |||
10/4/2004 | MIL - Motion In Limine | 10/8/2004 | |
10/1/2004 | RES - Response | 10/12/2004 | |
NOTE: TO PLAITNIFFS EXPEDITED MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF SCHEDULING ORDER DEADLINES AND RESPONSE TO PLAITNIFFS MOTION FOR CONTINUANCE OF PRE TRIAL CONFERENCE AND TRIAL | |||
9/30/2004 | 023 - ME: Order Entered By Court | 9/30/2004 | |
9/29/2004 | MOT - Motion | 10/1/2004 | |
NOTE: EXPEDITED/ FOR EXTENSION OF SCHEDULING ORDER DEADLINES MOTION FOR CONTINUANCE OF PRETRIAL CONFERENCE AND TRIAL | |||
9/29/2004 | REQ - Request | 10/7/2004 | |
NOTE: EXPEDITED PLAINTIFF'S FOR EXPEDITED HEARING ON PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO EXTEND SCHEDULING ORDRE DEADLINES | |||
9/16/2004 | NOT - Notice | 9/22/2004 | |
NOTE: PROPOSED DISCOVERY SPECIAL MASTERS | |||
9/2/2004 | RES - Response | 9/8/2004 | |
NOTE: DEFENDANTS' TO MOTION FOR ADDITIONAL TIME FOR WITNESS JOHN MAGGIANO MD TO READ AND SIGN DEPOSITION | |||
9/2/2004 | 023 - ME: Order Entered By Court | 9/2/2004 | |
9/1/2004 | 023 - ME: Order Entered By Court | 9/1/2004 | |
8/27/2004 | NOT - Notice | 9/1/2004 | |
NOTE: PLAINTIFF'S FIRST AMENDED OF SERVICE OF DEPOSITION | |||
8/26/2004 | MOT - Motion | 8/31/2004 | |
NOTE: FOR ADDITIONAL TIME FOR WITNESS JOHN MAGGIANO MD TO READ AND SIGN DEPOSITION | |||
8/24/2004 | REL - Reply | 8/27/2004 | |
NOTE: IN SUPPORT OF ITS SECOND MOTION FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER AND RESPONSE TO PLAINTIFFS MOTION TO STRIKE | |||
8/23/2004 | RES - Response | 8/26/2004 | |
NOTE: PLAINTIFF'S TO DEFENDANTS' THIRD MOTION FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER | |||
8/20/2004 | MOT - Motion | 8/26/2004 | |
NOTE: DEFENDANT'S THIRD FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER | |||
8/19/2004 | NOT - Notice | 8/31/2004 | |
NOTE: OF SERVICE OF DISCOVERY TO DEFENDANTS | |||
8/19/2004 | NSD - Notice of Service Re: 26.1 Disclosure | 8/31/2004 | |
NOTE: PLAINTIFF'S EIGHTH SUPPLEMENTAL | |||
8/19/2004 | NOT - Notice | 8/31/2004 | |
NOTE: PLAINTIFF'S OF COMPLIANCE WITH COURT'S MINUTE ENTRY OF AUGUST 3 2004 | |||
8/13/2004 | NSD - Notice of Service Re: 26.1 Disclosure | 8/19/2004 | |
NOTE: PLAINTIFF'S SEVENTH SUPPLEMENTAL | |||
8/12/2004 | RES - Response | 8/18/2004 | |
NOTE: PLAINTIFF'S TO DEFENDANTS' SECOND MOTION FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO STRIKE | |||
8/12/2004 | NSD - Notice of Service Re: 26.1 Disclosure | 7/19/2005 | |
NOTE: PLAINTIFF'S SIXTH SUPPLEMENTAL | |||
8/5/2004 | 019 - ME: Ruling | 8/5/2004 | |
8/3/2004 | NOT - Notice | 8/5/2004 | |
NOTE: OF SERVICE OF DEPOSITION | |||
8/3/2004 | 005 - ME: Hearing | 8/3/2004 | |
7/29/2004 | MOT - Motion | 8/4/2004 | |
NOTE: SECOND/ FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER | |||
7/26/2004 | REL - Reply | 7/28/2004 | |
NOTE: IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANTS NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF EXPERT WITNESS CRAIG SUITER MD AND PETITION TO DESIGNATE ANOTHER STANDARD OF CARE EXPERT WITNESS | |||
7/19/2004 | ORD - Order | 7/22/2004 | |
NOTE: DENYING PLAINTIFFS MOTION TO EXCEED THE PAGE LIMITATION | |||
7/15/2004 | RES - Response | 7/23/2004 | |
NOTE: AND OBJECTION TO DEFENDANTS NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF EXPERT WITNESS DR CRAIG SUITER AND PETITION TO DESIGNATE ANOTHER STANDARD OF CARE EXPERT WITNESS | |||
7/15/2004 | 019 - ME: Ruling | 7/15/2004 | |
7/13/2004 | ORD - Order | 7/19/2004 | |
NOTE: RESOLVING DEFENDANTS EXPEDITED MOTION FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER | |||
7/12/2004 | 023 - ME: Order Entered By Court | 7/12/2004 | |
7/7/2004 | CER - Certificate | 7/13/2004 | |
NOTE: PLAINTIFFS/ OF ATTEMPTED RESOLUTION | |||
7/7/2004 | RQH - Request For Hearing | 7/13/2004 | |
NOTE: EXPEDITED, ON PLAINTIFFS MOTION TO COMPEL DISCLOSURES; MOTION TO COMPEL RESPONSES TO UNIFORM INTERROGATORIES; HEARING UPON OBJECTIONS TO PLAINTIFFS UNIFORM INTERROGATORIES AND MOTION FOR SANCTIONS | |||
7/7/2004 | MOT - Motion | 7/14/2004 | |
NOTE: FOR LEAVE TO EXCEED PAGE LIMIT REGARDING PLAINTIFFS COMPEL DISCLOSURES; MOTION TO COMPEL RESPONSES TO UNIFORM INTERROGATORIES; HEARING UPON OBJECTIONS TO PLAINTIFFS UNIFORM INTERROGATORIES AND MOTION FOR SANCTIONS | |||
7/7/2004 | MTC - Motion To Compel | 7/15/2004 | |
NOTE: MANDATORY DISCLOSURES; MOTION TO COMPEL RESPONSES TO PLAINTIFFS UNIFORM INTERROGATORIES; MOTION FOR HEARING UPON OBJECTIONS TO PLAINTIFFS UNIFORM INTERROGATORIES; AND MOTION FOR SANCTIONS | |||
7/6/2004 | REL - Reply | 7/12/2004 | |
NOTE: TO MAYO DEFENDANTS RESPONSE TO PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE AMENDED COMPLAINT AND PLAINTIFFS ALTERNATIVE MOTION TO PERMIT FURTHER AMENDMENT TO COMPLAINT TO CONFORM TO COURT RULINGS | |||
7/1/2004 | NOT - Notice | 7/8/2004 | |
NOTE: OF WITHDRAWAL OF EXPERT WITNESS CRAIG SUITER MD AND PETITION TO DESIGNATE ANOTHER STANDARD OF CARE EXPERT WITNESS | |||
7/1/2004 | MOT - Motion | 7/8/2004 | |
NOTE: FOR EXPEDITED HEARING RE NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF EXPERT WITNESS CRAIG SUITER MD AND PETITION TO DESIGNATE ANOTHER STANDARD OF CARE EXPERT | |||
6/28/2004 | REL - Reply | 7/1/2004 | |
NOTE: IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO STRIKE TESTIMONY OF EXPERT AND RESPONSE TO ALTERNATIVE MOTION TO DEFER ADJUDICATION OF MOTION TO STRIKE | |||
6/28/2004 | REL - Reply | 7/1/2004 | |
NOTE: IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO STRIKE TESTIMONY OF EXPERTS AND RESPONSE TO ALTERNATIVE MOTION TO DEFER ADJUDICATION OF MOTION TO STRIKE | |||
6/25/2004 | NOT - Notice | 7/7/2004 | |
NOTE: OF SERVICE OF DEPOSITION | |||
6/24/2004 | 023 - ME: Order Entered By Court | 6/24/2004 | |
6/21/2004 | 005 - ME: Hearing | 6/21/2004 | |
6/21/2004 | RES - Response | 8/10/2011 | |
NOTE: TO MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE AMENDED COMPLAINT | |||
6/18/2004 | 004 - ME: Hearing Continued | 6/18/2004 | |
6/16/2004 | 005 - ME: Hearing | 6/16/2004 | |
6/16/2004 | RES - Response | 6/23/2004 | |
NOTE: IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO STRIKE AND ALTERNATIVE MOTION TO DEFER ADJUDICATION OF MOTION TO STRIKE | |||
6/16/2004 | RES - Response | 6/23/2004 | |
NOTE: IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO STRIKE AND ALTERNATIVE MOTION TO DEFER ADJUDICATION OF MOTION TO STRIKE | |||
6/16/2004 | MOT - Motion | 6/22/2004 | |
NOTE: FOR EXPEDITED RULING RE: RESCHEDULING OF DEPOSITIONS IN FOLLOW-UP TO RULING ON MOTION FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER | |||
6/10/2004 | RES - Response | 6/17/2004 | |
NOTE: TO MOTION FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER | |||
6/8/2004 | 094 - ME: Oral Argument Set | 6/8/2004 | |
6/8/2004 | ORD - Order | 6/11/2004 | |
NOTE: GRANTING DEFENDANTS MOTION TO EXCEED THE PAGE LIMITATION | |||
6/8/2004 | ORD - Order | 6/11/2004 | |
NOTE: GRANTING DEFENDANTS MOTION FOR EXPEDITED HEARING REGARDING PROTECTIVE ORDER | |||
6/2/2004 | MOT - Motion | 6/4/2004 | |
NOTE: FOR EXPEDITED HEARING REGARDING MOTION FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER | |||
6/2/2004 | MOT - Motion | 6/4/2004 | |
NOTE: TO STRIKE TESTIMONY OF PLAINTIFFS EXPERT WILLIAM J FLYNN | |||
6/2/2004 | MOT - Motion | 6/4/2004 | |
NOTE: TO STRIKE TESTIMONY OF PLAINTIFFS EXPERTS CHRISTINA MELNYKOVYCH AND CHAROL SPAULDING | |||
6/2/2004 | MOT - Motion | 6/4/2004 | |
NOTE: TO EXCEED PAGE LIMIT FOR MOTION FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER | |||
6/2/2004 | MSJ - Motion For Summary Judgment | 6/4/2004 | |
NOTE: PARTIAL/ REGARDING PUNITIVE DAMAGES | |||
6/2/2004 | REQ - Request | 6/7/2004 | |
NOTE: RULE 16/ FOR STATUS CONFERENCE | |||
6/2/2004 | SOF - Statement Of Facts | 6/7/2004 | |
NOTE: IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT REGARDING PUNITIVE DAMAGES | |||
6/2/2004 | CER - Certificate | 6/7/2004 | |
NOTE: OF COUNSEL PURSUANT TO RULE 26(G) IN SUPPORT OF MAYOS MOTION FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER | |||
6/2/2004 | MOT - Motion | 6/7/2004 | |
NOTE: FOR LEAVE TO FILE AMENDED COMPLAINT | |||
6/2/2004 | NSD - Notice of Service Re: 26.1 Disclosure | 6/7/2004 | |
NOTE: FIFTH SUPPLEMENTAL | |||
6/2/2004 | MOT - Motion | 6/14/2004 | |
NOTE: FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER | |||
5/28/2004 | NOT - Notice | 6/9/2004 | |
NOTE: OF SERVICE OF DEPOSITION | |||
5/28/2004 | NDE - Notice Of Deposition | 6/9/2004 | |
NOTE: TO DEFENDANT | |||
5/28/2004 | NOT - Notice | 6/9/2004 | |
NOTE: OF SERVICE OF DEPOSITION | |||
5/28/2004 | NOT - Notice | 6/9/2004 | |
NOTE: OF SERVICE OF DEPOSITION | |||
5/28/2004 | NOT - Notice | 6/9/2004 | |
NOTE: OF SERVICE OF DEPOSITION | |||
5/28/2004 | NOT - Notice | 6/9/2004 | |
NOTE: OF SERVICE OF DEPOSITION | |||
5/18/2004 | NOT - Notice | 5/24/2004 | |
NOTE: OF DEPOSITION TO DEFENDANT | |||
5/18/2004 | NOT - Notice | 5/24/2004 | |
NOTE: OF SERVICE OF DEPOSITION | |||
5/18/2004 | NOT - Notice | 5/24/2004 | |
NOTE: OF SERVICE OF DEPOSITION | |||
5/18/2004 | NOT - Notice | 5/24/2004 | |
NOTE: OF SERVICE OF DEPOSITION | |||
5/18/2004 | NOT - Notice | 5/24/2004 | |
NOTE: OF SERVICE OF DEPOSITION | |||
5/18/2004 | NOT - Notice | 5/24/2004 | |
NOTE: OF SERVICE OF DEPOSITION | |||
5/13/2004 | APL - Application | 5/18/2004 | |
NOTE: FOR COMMISSION TO TAKE FOREIGN DEPOSITION | |||
5/7/2004 | 083 - ME: Conference Reset/Cont | 5/7/2004 | |
4/12/2004 | NSD - Notice of Service Re: 26.1 Disclosure | 4/23/2004 | |
NOTE: FOURTH SUPPLEMENTAL | |||
4/6/2004 | NOT - Notice | 4/14/2004 | |
NOTE: PLAINTIFFS OFFER OF JUDGMENT TO DEFENDANTS | |||
4/1/2004 | NSD - Notice of Service Re: 26.1 Disclosure | 4/14/2004 | |
NOTE: 3RD SUPPLEMENTAL | |||
4/1/2004 | NOT - Notice | 4/14/2004 | |
NOTE: 3RD AMENDED/OF SERVICE OF DEPOSITION VIDEO TAPED AND AUDIO TAPED DEPOSITION | |||
3/30/2004 | APL - Application | 4/8/2004 | |
NOTE: FOR COMMISSION TO TAKE FOREIGN DEPOSITION | |||
3/23/2004 | RES - Response | 4/9/2004 | |
NOTE: 1ST SUPPLEMENTAL/TO REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS | |||
3/19/2004 | NOT - Notice | 4/7/2004 | |
NOTE: OF SERVICE OF FIRST SUPPLEMENTAL INTERROGATORIES | |||
3/17/2004 | NOT - Notice | 4/14/2004 | |
NOTE: OF SERVICE OF SUBPOENA DUCES TECUM TO DEPOSITION | |||
3/12/2004 | 089 - ME: Trial Setting | 3/12/2004 | |
3/11/2004 | NOT - Notice | 4/7/2004 | |
NOTE: 3RD AMENDED/OF SERVICE OF DEPOSITION | |||
3/9/2004 | 083 - ME: Conference Reset/Cont | 3/9/2004 | |
3/5/2004 | 094 - ME: Oral Argument Set | 3/5/2004 | |
3/1/2004 | RES - Response | 4/8/2004 | |
NOTE: TO PLAINTIFFS PAUL J PHILLIPS EXPEDITED EMERGENCY EX PARTE MOTION TO TAKE POSSESSION OF THE MEDICAL RECORDS FOR DELIVERY TO THE CLERK OF THE SUPERIOR COURT FOR PRESERVATION OF MATERIAL EVIDENCE | |||
3/1/2004 | RES - Response | 4/14/2004 | |
NOTE: ERRATA TO DEFENDANTS/TO PLAINTIFFS PAUL J PHILLIPS EXPEDITED EMERGENCY EX PARTE MOTION TO TAKE POSSESSION OF THE MEDICAL RECORDS FOR DELIVERY TO THE CLERK OF THE SUPERIOR COURT FOR PRESERVATION OF MATERIAL EVIDENCE | |||
2/25/2004 | MOT - Motion | 4/14/2004 | |
NOTE: EX PARTE/TO TAKE POSSESSION OF THE MEDICAL RECORDS FOR DELIVERY TO THE CLERK OF THE SUPERIOR COURT FOR PRESERVATION OF MATERIAL EVIDENCE | |||
2/20/2004 | NSD - Notice of Service Re: 26.1 Disclosure | 4/14/2004 | |
NOTE: 2ND SUPPLEMENTAL | |||
2/20/2004 | NSD - Notice of Service Re: 26.1 Disclosure | 4/14/2004 | |
NOTE: 2ND SUPPLEMENTAL | |||
2/20/2004 | NOT - Notice | 4/14/2004 | |
NOTE: 2ND AMENDED/OF SERVICE OF DEPOSITION VIDEO TAPED AND AUDIO TAPED DEPOSITION | |||
2/2/2004 | ORD - Order | 4/7/2004 | |
NOTE: ON STIPULATION TO CONTINUE EXPERT DISCLOSURE DEADLINE | |||
1/30/2004 | NOT - Notice | 4/14/2004 | |
NOTE: OF SERVICE OF DEPOSITION | |||
1/30/2004 | NOT - Notice | 4/14/2004 | |
NOTE: 1ST AMENDED/OF SERVICE OF DEPOSITION | |||
1/30/2004 | NOT - Notice | 4/14/2004 | |
NOTE: 1ST AMENDED/OF SERVICE OF DEPOSITION | |||
1/30/2004 | NOT - Notice | 4/14/2004 | |
NOTE: 1ST AMENDED/OF SERVICE OF DEPOSITION | |||
1/27/2004 | SFC - Stipulation For Continuance | 4/14/2004 | |
NOTE: EXPERT DISCLOSURE DEADLINE | |||
12/9/2003 | NOT - Notice | 3/5/2004 | |
NOTE: OF SERVICE OF DEPOSITION | |||
12/9/2003 | NOT - Notice | 3/5/2004 | |
NOTE: OF SERVICE OF DEPOSITION | |||
12/9/2003 | NOT - Notice | 3/5/2004 | |
NOTE: OF SERVICE OF DEPOSITION | |||
12/9/2003 | NOT - Notice | 4/8/2004 | |
NOTE: OF SERVICE OF DEPOSITION | |||
12/9/2003 | NOT - Notice | 4/8/2004 | |
NOTE: OF SERVICE OF DEPOSITION | |||
11/27/2003 | 029 - ME: Status Conference | 11/27/2003 | |
11/20/2003 | MEM - Memorandum | 12/5/2003 | |
NOTE: JOINT COMPREHENSIVE PRETRIAL CONFERENCE | |||
11/10/2003 | NSD - Notice of Service Re: 26.1 Disclosure | 11/20/2003 | |
NOTE: INITIAL | |||
11/10/2003 | NSD - Notice of Service Re: 26.1 Disclosure | 11/20/2003 | |
NOTE: 1ST SUPPLEMENTAL | |||
11/4/2003 | 041 - ME: Scheduling Conference Set | 11/4/2003 | |
9/23/2003 | 005 - ME: Hearing | 9/23/2003 | |
8/22/2003 | REL - Reply | 1/20/2004 | |
NOTE: TO PLAINTIFF'S RESPONSE TO DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO STRIKE COMPLAINT | |||
8/20/2003 | 311 - ME: 150 Day Minute Entry | 8/20/2003 | |
8/13/2003 | 094 - ME: Oral Argument Set | 8/13/2003 | |
8/12/2003 | RES - Response | 10/8/2003 | |
NOTE: TO DEFENDANTS MOTION TO STRIKE COMPLAINT PLAINTIFF'S ALTERNATIVE MOTION FOR LEAVE TO AMEND PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT SHOULD MOTION TO STRIKE BE GRANTED | |||
8/5/2003 | MOT - Motion | 8/25/2003 | |
NOTE: TO STRIKE COMPLAINT | |||
8/1/2003 | NOT - Notice | 12/3/2003 | |
NOTE: OF EXCHANGE OF MEDICAL RECORDS | |||
8/1/2003 | NOT - Notice | 12/3/2003 | |
NOTE: OF EXCHANGE OF MEDICAL RECORDS | |||
7/28/2003 | REQ - Request | 2/6/2004 | |
NOTE: FOR COMPREHENSIVE PRETRIAL CONFERENCE | |||
7/23/2003 | CCN - Cert Arbitration - Not Subject | 10/29/2003 | |
7/23/2003 | ANS - Answer | 7/31/2003 | |
NOTE: PAID | |||
7/7/2003 | AFS - Affidavit Of Service | 7/15/2003 | |
NOTE: MAYO REGIONAL PRACTICES ARIZONA SERVED SERVED 07/03/03 | |||
7/7/2003 | AFS - Affidavit Of Service | 7/15/2003 | |
NOTE: MAYO CLINIC HOSPITAL SERVED 07/03/03 | |||
7/7/2003 | AFS - Affidavit Of Service | 7/15/2003 | |
NOTE: MAYO REGIONAL PRACTICES ARIZONA SERVED 07/03/03 | |||
7/7/2003 | AFS - Affidavit Of Service | 7/15/2003 | |
NOTE: MAYO HEALTH PLAN ARIZONA SERVED 07/03/03 | |||
7/7/2003 | AFS - Affidavit Of Service | 7/15/2003 | |
NOTE: MAYO CLINIC SCOTTSDALE SERVED 07/03/03 | |||
7/7/2003 | AFS - Affidavit Of Service | 7/15/2003 | |
NOTE: MAYO CLINIC ARIZONA SERVED 07/03/03 | |||
7/7/2003 | SUM - Summons | 11/25/2003 | |
6/18/2003 | 322 - ME: Notice Of Intent To Dismiss | 6/18/2003 | |
3/21/2003 | NJT - Not Demand For Jury Trials | 9/19/2003 | |
3/13/2003 | COM - Complaint | 3/18/2003 | |
3/13/2003 | CCN - Cert Arbitration - Not Subject | 3/18/2003 |
Case Calendar | ||
---|---|---|
Date | Time | Event |
9/19/2003 | 9:45 | Oral Argument |
11/25/2003 | 9:00 | Pre-Trial Conference |
3/10/2004 | 8:30 | Oral Argument |
3/22/2004 | 8:30 | Pre-Trial Conference |
6/15/2004 | 9:30 | Oral Argument |
6/16/2004 | 16:30 | Emergency Hearing |
6/17/2004 | 14:30 | Emergency Hearing |
7/30/2004 | 10:30 | Oral Argument |
10/8/2004 | 9:45 | Pre-Trial Conference |
10/22/2004 | 8:45 | Pre-Trial Conference |
11/1/2004 | 9:15 | Pre-Trial Conference |
11/1/2004 | 9:30 | Trial |
3/25/2005 | 9:00 | Pre-Trial Conference |
4/18/2005 | 9:30 | Trial |
10/20/2005 | 8:45 | Oral Argument |
5/12/2006 | 14:30 | Pre-Trial Conference |
5/26/2006 | 8:45 | Pre-Trial Conference |
6/14/2006 | 8:45 | Pre-Trial Conference |
6/15/2006 | 14:30 | Pre-Trial Conference |
6/16/2006 | 10:00 | Pre-Trial Conference |
6/26/2006 | 9:30 | Trial |
6/27/2006 | 9:30 | Trial |
6/28/2006 | 9:30 | Trial |
6/29/2006 | 9:30 | Trial |
7/5/2006 | 9:00 | Trial |
7/13/2006 | 9:30 | Trial |
7/17/2006 | 9:30 | Trial |
7/18/2006 | 9:30 | Trial |
7/19/2006 | 9:30 | Trial |
7/20/2006 | 9:30 | Trial |
9/6/2006 | 9:00 | Oral Argument |
9/14/2006 | 10:00 | Pre-Trial Conference |
9/18/2006 | 10:00 | Oral Argument |
10/13/2006 | 8:45 | Oral Argument |
11/2/2006 | 9:00 | Status Conference |
11/17/2006 | 11:30 | Status Conference |
Judgments | |||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Date | (F)or / (A)gainst | Amount | Frequency | Type | Status |
9/13/2006 | F:Paul J Phillips | $3,500,000.00 | One Time | Principal | |
A: Mayo Clinic Arizona | |||||
A: Mayo Clinic Scottsdale | |||||
A: Mayo Foundation | |||||
A: Mayo Clinic Hospital | |||||
A: Mayo Clinics In Our Care | |||||
A: Mayo Regional Practices Arizona | |||||
A: Mayo Foundation For Medical Education And Research | |||||
A: Mayo Health Plan Arizona | |||||
A: Mayo Management Services Inc | |||||
A: Mayo Healthcare Network | |||||
7/20/2006 | F:Maricopa County Creditor | $2,166.00 | One Time | Judgment for Jury Fees | Satisfied |
A: Mayo Clinic Arizona |