« Return to search results
Case Information
Case Number:
CV2002-093101
Judge:
Coffey, Rodrick
File Date:
12/12/2002
Location:
Southeast
Case Type:
Civil
Party Information
Party Name
Relationship
Sex
Attorney
Party Name
Terry Houle
Relationship
Plaintiff
Sex
Male
Attorney
Hyung Choi
Party Name
Joyce Houle
Relationship
Plaintiff
Sex
Female
Attorney
Hyung Choi
Party Name
Beaudry R V Mesa Inc
Relationship
Defendant
Sex
Attorney
WILLIAM SHATTUCK
Party Name
Country Coach Inc.
Relationship
Defendant
Sex
Attorney
WILLIAM SHATTUCK
Case Documents
Filing Date
Description
Docket Date
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/21/2006
Description
ODI - Order Of Dismissal
Docket Date
3/24/2006
Filing Party
NOTE:
OF PLAINTIFFS CLAIMS ONLY
Filing Date
3/20/2006
Description
SFD - Stipulation For Dismissal
Docket Date
3/23/2006
Filing Party
NOTE:
OF PLAINTIFFS CLAIMS ONLY
Filing Date
2/28/2006
Description
NOS - Notice Of Settlement
Docket Date
3/3/2006
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/9/2005
Description
MSE - Motion To Set & Cert/Readiness
Docket Date
9/19/2005
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/1/2005
Description
909 - ME: Case Transfer/Assignment
Docket Date
7/1/2005
Filing Party
NOTE:
CV2002-093101 TRANSFERRED TO CV2002-025209
Filing Date
6/27/2005
Description
STA - Statement
Docket Date
6/28/2005
Filing Party
NOTE:
JOINT PRETRIAL
Filing Date
6/24/2005
Description
NJR - Notice of change of Judge for right
Docket Date
6/30/2005
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/22/2005
Description
RES - Response
Docket Date
6/27/2005
Filing Party
NOTE:
PLAINTIFFS' TO DEFENDANTS' MOTIONS IN LIMINE
Filing Date
6/22/2005
Description
066 - ME: Case Reassigned
Docket Date
6/22/2005
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/20/2005
Description
RES - Response
Docket Date
7/1/2005
Filing Party
NOTE:
TO PLAINTIFFS MOTIONS IN LIMINE 1 AND 2
Filing Date
6/17/2005
Description
REL - Reply
Docket Date
7/6/2005
Filing Party
NOTE:
IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR SANCTIONS
Filing Date
6/15/2005
Description
023 - ME: Order Entered By Court
Docket Date
6/15/2005
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/13/2005
Description
RES - Response
Docket Date
6/27/2005
Filing Party
NOTE:
DEFENDANTS' TO PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR SANCTIONS
Filing Date
6/13/2005
Description
NJR - Notice of change of Judge for right
Docket Date
6/27/2005
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/10/2005
Description
MIL - Motion In Limine
Docket Date
6/15/2005
Filing Party
NOTE:
DEFENDANTS'
Filing Date
6/10/2005
Description
MIL - Motion In Limine
Docket Date
6/15/2005
Filing Party
NOTE:
PLAINTIFFS' #2 RE HCV DEFECTS AND IMPROVED DESIGN AND SUPPLEMENT TO MOTION FOR SANCTIONS
Filing Date
6/10/2005
Description
MIL - Motion In Limine
Docket Date
6/15/2005
Filing Party
NOTE:
PLAINTIFFS' RE FINANCIAL INFORMATION
Filing Date
5/31/2005
Description
MTC - Motion To Compel
Docket Date
6/8/2005
Filing Party
NOTE:
SUPPLEMENT TO PLAINTIFFS' DISCOVERY RESPONSE BY DEFENDANT COUNTRY COACH
Filing Date
5/12/2005
Description
094 - ME: Oral Argument Set
Docket Date
5/12/2005
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/20/2005
Description
ORD - Order
Docket Date
4/25/2005
Filing Party
NOTE:
CONTINUING THE CUT-OFF DEADLINE FOR DISCOVERY
Filing Date
4/12/2005
Description
MOT - Motion
Docket Date
4/18/2005
Filing Party
NOTE:
STIPULATED/ TO EXTEND DEADLINE FOR DISCOVERY CUT OFF
Filing Date
4/11/2005
Description
REL - Reply
Docket Date
4/14/2005
Filing Party
NOTE:
IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFFS MOTION TO COMPEL DISCOVERY RESPONSE BY DEFENDANT COUNTY COACH
Filing Date
4/7/2005
Description
RES - Response
Docket Date
4/12/2005
Filing Party
NOTE:
TO PLAINTIFFS MOTION TO COMPEL DISCOVERY RESPONSES
Filing Date
3/25/2005
Description
MOT - Motion
Docket Date
3/31/2005
Filing Party
NOTE:
TO COMPEL DISCOVERY RESPONSE BY DEFENDANT COUNTY COACH
Filing Date
3/25/2005
Description
STA - Statement
Docket Date
4/1/2005
Filing Party
NOTE:
IN SUPPORT OF THEIR MOTION TO COMPEL DISCOVERY RESPONSE BY DEFENDANT COUNTY COACH
Filing Date
2/22/2005
Description
ORD - Order
Docket Date
2/24/2005
Filing Party
NOTE:
EXTENDING DISCOVERY DEADLINE
Filing Date
2/17/2005
Description
MOT - Motion
Docket Date
3/1/2005
Filing Party
NOTE:
STIPULATED/TO EXTEND DEADLINE FOR DISCOVERY CUT OFF
Filing Date
11/2/2004
Description
053 - ME: Case Consolidation
Docket Date
11/2/2004
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/29/2004
Description
053 - ME: Case Consolidation
Docket Date
9/29/2004
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/24/2004
Description
ORD - Order
Docket Date
9/29/2004
Filing Party
NOTE:
VACATING THE TELEPHONIC STATUS CONFERENCE RE TRIAL CONFLICT SET FOR DECEMBER 13 2004
Filing Date
9/8/2004
Description
MCD - Motion To Consolidate
Docket Date
9/20/2004
Filing Party
NOTE:
DEFENDANTS' JOINDER IN PLAINTIFF'S
Filing Date
8/20/2004
Description
RES - Response
Docket Date
8/26/2004
Filing Party
NOTE:
PER AFFIDAVIT IN OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO CONSOLIDATE
Filing Date
8/17/2004
Description
MCD - Motion To Consolidate
Docket Date
8/26/2004
Filing Party
NOTE:
AND MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT
Filing Date
8/17/2004
Description
MCD - Motion To Consolidate
Docket Date
8/26/2004
Filing Party
NOTE:
AND MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT
Filing Date
7/19/2004
Description
NOT - Notice
Docket Date
7/20/2004
Filing Party
NOTE:
JUDGE PRO TEMPORE/ OF SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE
Filing Date
7/7/2004
Description
028 - ME: Status Conference Set
Docket Date
7/7/2004
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/16/2004
Description
NOT - Notice
Docket Date
6/25/2004
Filing Party
NOTE:
OF TRIAL CONFLICT
Filing Date
6/8/2004
Description
019 - ME: Ruling
Docket Date
6/8/2004
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/25/2004
Description
005 - ME: Hearing
Docket Date
5/25/2004
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/17/2004
Description
REL - Reply
Docket Date
5/24/2004
Filing Party
NOTE:
TO PLAINTIFFS SUPPLEMENTAL RESPONSE
Filing Date
5/4/2004
Description
RES - Response
Docket Date
5/11/2004
Filing Party
NOTE:
SUPPLEMENT TO PLAINTIFFS/ TO MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT; AND CROSS-MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT ON THE ISSUE OF IMPLIED WARRANTIES UNDER THE MAGNUSON-MOSS WARRANTY ACT
Filing Date
5/3/2004
Description
070 - ME: Settlement Conference Set
Docket Date
5/13/2004
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/15/2004
Description
094 - ME: Oral Argument Set
Docket Date
4/15/2004
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/30/2004
Description
MEM - Memorandum
Docket Date
4/15/2004
Filing Party
NOTE:
REPLY IN SUPPORT OF CROSS-MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT
Filing Date
3/18/2004
Description
RES - Response
Docket Date
4/1/2004
Filing Party
NOTE:
TO PLAINTIFFS CONTROVERTING STATEMENT OF FACTS AND DEFENDANT CONTROVERTING STATEMENT OF FACTS
Filing Date
3/18/2004
Description
REL - Reply
Docket Date
4/12/2004
Filing Party
NOTE:
IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT AND RESPONSE TO CROSS-MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT ON EFFECT OF IMPLIED WARRANTIES UNDER THE MAGNUSON-MOSS WARRANTY ACT
Filing Date
3/5/2004
Description
ORD - Order
Docket Date
3/16/2004
Filing Party
NOTE:
TO FILE RESPONSE TO MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT
Filing Date
3/5/2004
Description
ORD - Order
Docket Date
3/16/2004
Filing Party
NOTE:
RESCHEDULING TRIAL
Filing Date
3/3/2004
Description
ORD - Order
Docket Date
3/16/2004
Filing Party
NOTE:
TO EXCEED PAGE LIMIT
Filing Date
2/27/2004
Description
RES - Response
Docket Date
4/8/2004
Filing Party
NOTE:
TO MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT AND CROSS MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT ON THE ISSUE OF IMPLIED WARRANTIES UNDER THE MAGNUSON-MOSS WARRANTY ACT
Filing Date
2/27/2004
Description
SOF - Statement Of Facts
Docket Date
4/8/2004
Filing Party
NOTE:
CONTROVERTING IN SUPPORT OF RESPONSE TO MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT AND CROSS-MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT ON THE ISSUE OF IMPLIED WARRANTIES UNDER THE MAGNUSON-MOSS WARRANTY ACT
Filing Date
2/27/2004
Description
MOT - Motion
Docket Date
4/8/2004
Filing Party
NOTE:
FOR LEAVE TO EXCEED PAGE LIMITATION
Filing Date
2/24/2004
Description
STP - Stipulation
Docket Date
4/13/2004
Filing Party
NOTE:
TO CONTINUE TRIAL DATE
Filing Date
2/24/2004
Description
MOT - Motion
Docket Date
4/13/2004
Filing Party
NOTE:
STIPULATED/TO EXTEND TIME TO RESPOND TO MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT AND FOR REPLY IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT
Filing Date
2/20/2004
Description
ORD - Order
Docket Date
2/25/2004
Filing Party
NOTE:
PLAINTIFFS MAY FILE RESPONSE TO DEFENDANTS MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT
Filing Date
2/12/2004
Description
MOT - Motion
Docket Date
4/12/2004
Filing Party
NOTE:
STIPULATED/TO EXTEND TIME TO RESPOND TO MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT AND FOR REPLY IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT
Filing Date
1/30/2004
Description
089 - ME: Trial Setting
Docket Date
1/30/2004
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/26/2004
Description
MSJ - Motion For Summary Judgment
Docket Date
4/1/2004
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/26/2004
Description
SOF - Statement Of Facts
Docket Date
4/1/2004
Filing Party
NOTE:
IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANTS MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT
Filing Date
1/16/2004
Description
MEM - Memorandum
Docket Date
4/8/2004
Filing Party
NOTE:
JOINT PRETRIAL CONFERENCE
Filing Date
12/23/2003
Description
026 - ME: Pretrial Conference Set
Docket Date
12/23/2003
Filing Party
Filing Date
11/5/2003
Description
MSE - Motion To Set & Cert/Readiness
Docket Date
4/7/2004
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/21/2003
Description
311 - ME: 150 Day Minute Entry
Docket Date
5/21/2003
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/21/2003
Description
CCN - Cert Arbitration - Not Subject
Docket Date
6/3/2003
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/21/2003
Description
ANS - Answer
Docket Date
2/10/2003
Filing Party
NOTE:
PAID
Filing Date
1/15/2003
Description
AAE - Application/Affidavit And Entry Of Default
Docket Date
2/3/2003
Filing Party
NOTE:
AND ENTRY OF DEFAULT
Filing Date
1/15/2003
Description
NOT - Notice
Docket Date
5/20/2003
Filing Party
NOTE:
OF APPLICATION FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT
Filing Date
12/31/2002
Description
AFS - Affidavit Of Service
Docket Date
1/9/2003
Filing Party
NOTE:
BEADRY RV MESA INC SERVED 12/23/02
Filing Date
12/26/2002
Description
AFS - Affidavit Of Service
Docket Date
1/9/2003
Filing Party
NOTE:
BEAUDRY RV MESA INC SERVED 12/23/02
Filing Date
12/26/2002
Description
SUM - Summons
Docket Date
5/19/2003
Filing Party
Filing Date
12/12/2002
Description
COM - Complaint
Docket Date
12/17/2002
Filing Party
Filing Date
12/12/2002
Description
CCN - Cert Arbitration - Not Subject
Docket Date
12/17/2002
Filing Party
Case Calendar
Date
Time
Event
Date
1/26/2004
Time
9:15
Event
Pre-Trial Conference
Date
5/21/2004
Time
14:00
Event
Oral Argument
Date
8/31/2004
Time
10:00
Event
Civil Settlement Conference
Date
10/25/2004
Time
9:00
Event
Pre-Trial Conference
Date
10/28/2004
Time
9:15
Event
Pre-Trial Conference
Date
11/1/2004
Time
9:30
Event
Trial
Date
12/13/2004
Time
9:00
Event
Status Conference
Date
1/18/2005
Time
9:00
Event
Pre-Trial Conference
Date
1/24/2005
Time
9:30
Event
Trial
Date
6/2/2005
Time
9:00
Event
Oral Argument
Date
6/28/2005
Time
9:00
Event
Pre-Trial Conference
Date
7/11/2005
Time
13:00
Event
Trial
Date
9/16/2005
Time
13:45
Event
Pre-Trial Conference
Judgments
Date
(F)or / (A)gainst
Amount
Frequency
Type
Status
No records found.