« Return to search results
Case Information
Case Number:
CV2002-092440
Judge:
Driggs, Adam
File Date:
9/26/2002
Location:
Southeast
Case Type:
Civil
Party Information
Party Name
Relationship
Sex
Attorney
Party Name
Richard S Heppler
Relationship
Plaintiff
Sex
Male
Attorney
Bonnie Griffin
Party Name
Alice Heppler
Relationship
Plaintiff
Sex
Female
Attorney
Bonnie Griffin
Party Name
Melissa Anderson
Relationship
Defendant
Sex
Female
Attorney
Pro Per
Party Name
Christopher Anderson
Relationship
Defendant
Sex
Male
Attorney
Pro Per
Party Name
Beaudry R V Mesa Inc
Relationship
Garnishee Defendant
Sex
Attorney
Pro Per
Party Name
Auto Safety House L L C
Relationship
Garnishee Defendant
Sex
Attorney
Pro Per
Party Name
Dillons R V City Parts And Service
Relationship
Garnishee Defendant
Sex
Attorney
Pro Per
Case Documents
Filing Date
Description
Docket Date
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/10/2011
Description
SJU - Satisfaction Of Judgment
Docket Date
8/10/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
Satisfaction of Judgment And Release of Judgment Lien
Filing Date
10/15/2007
Description
ARJ - Affidavit: Renewal Of Judgment
Docket Date
10/16/2007
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/27/2007
Description
OCL - Order Of Continuing Lien
Docket Date
3/2/2007
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/6/2007
Description
APL - Application
Docket Date
2/12/2007
Filing Party
NOTE:
BY JUDGMENT CREDITOR FOR ORDER OF CONTINUING LIEN AGAINST GARNISHEE-DEFENDANT
Filing Date
1/17/2007
Description
STA - Statement
Docket Date
1/24/2007
Filing Party
NOTE:
GARNISHEE'S NONEXEMPT EARNINGS
Filing Date
1/17/2007
Description
ANG - Answer Of Garnishee
Docket Date
1/22/2007
Filing Party
Garnishee Defendant(7)
Filing Date
1/16/2007
Description
WGS - Writ Of Garnishment and Summons
Docket Date
1/19/2007
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/16/2007
Description
AFS - Affidavit Of Service
Docket Date
1/16/2007
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/3/2007
Description
AWG - Application For Writ Of Garnishment
Docket Date
1/5/2007
Filing Party
NOTE:
EARNINGS
Filing Date
11/17/2006
Description
OCL - Order Of Continuing Lien
Docket Date
11/21/2006
Filing Party
Filing Date
11/1/2006
Description
APL - Application
Docket Date
11/6/2006
Filing Party
NOTE:
BY JUDGMENT CREDITOR FOR ORDER OF CONTINUING LIEN AGAINST GARNISHEE-DEFENDANT
Filing Date
10/12/2006
Description
ANG - Answer Of Garnishee
Docket Date
10/18/2006
Filing Party
Garnishee Defendant(6)
Filing Date
10/10/2006
Description
AFS - Affidavit Of Service
Docket Date
10/12/2006
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/10/2006
Description
WGS - Writ Of Garnishment and Summons
Docket Date
10/17/2006
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/2/2006
Description
AWG - Application For Writ Of Garnishment
Docket Date
10/4/2006
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/1/2004
Description
ANG - Answer Of Garnishee
Docket Date
9/3/2004
Filing Party
Garnishee Defendant(5)
Filing Date
8/17/2004
Description
WGS - Writ Of Garnishment and Summons
Docket Date
8/20/2004
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/17/2004
Description
AFS - Affidavit Of Service
Docket Date
8/25/2004
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/16/2004
Description
NOT - Notice
Docket Date
8/26/2004
Filing Party
NOTE:
OF DELIVERY OF WRIT OF GARNISHMENT, FIRST NOTICE TO JUDGMENT DEBTOR OF GARNISHMENT AND FIRST HEARING REQUEST AND NOTICE OF HEARING ON GARNISHMENT
Filing Date
8/10/2004
Description
AWG - Application For Writ Of Garnishment
Docket Date
8/20/2004
Filing Party
Filing Date
12/10/2002
Description
JUD - Judgment
Docket Date
12/14/2002
Filing Party
NOTE:
Notice of filing and entry provided to the parties
Filing Date
12/6/2002
Description
ANS - Answer
Docket Date
12/14/2002
Filing Party
NOTE:
PAID, STIPULATION FOR ENTRY OF JUDGMENT
Filing Date
11/13/2002
Description
NOT - Notice
Docket Date
5/8/2003
Filing Party
NOTE:
APPLICATION AND AFFIDAVIT FOR DEFAULT
Filing Date
10/24/2002
Description
AFS - Affidavit Of Service
Docket Date
11/8/2002
Filing Party
NOTE:
MELISSA ANDERSON AND CHRISTOPHER ANDERSON SERVED 10-20-02
Filing Date
10/24/2002
Description
SUM - Summons
Docket Date
2/26/2003
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/26/2002
Description
COM - Complaint
Docket Date
10/2/2002
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/26/2002
Description
CCS - Cerificate Arbitration - Subject To
Docket Date
10/2/2002
Filing Party
Case Calendar
There are no calendar events on file
Judgments
Date
(F)or / (A)gainst
Amount
Frequency
Type
Status
Date
12/10/2002
(F)or / (A)gainst
F:
Richard S Heppler, Alice Heppler
A: Melissa Anderson
A: Melissa Anderson
Amount
$16,570.91
Frequency
One Time
Type
Affidavit of Renewal of Judgment
Status
Satisfied
Date
12/10/2002
(F)or / (A)gainst
F:
Richard S Heppler, Alice Heppler
A: Melissa Anderson
A: Melissa Anderson
Amount
$15,926.89
Frequency
One Time
Type
Principal
Status
Satisfied