« Return to search results
Case Information
Case Number:
CV2002-091755
Judge:
Thompson, Peter
File Date:
7/12/2002
Location:
Southeast
Case Type:
Civil
Party Information
Party Name
Relationship
Sex
Attorney
Party Name
Leon McClelland
Relationship
Plaintiff
Sex
Male
Attorney
David Schwartz
Party Name
Marietta Gibbs
Relationship
Defendant
Sex
Female
Attorney
Carlton Casler
Party Name
Debra Tolton
Relationship
Defendant
Sex
Female
Attorney
Carlton Casler
Party Name
Donna McCormick
Relationship
Defendant
Sex
Female
Attorney
Pro Per
Party Name
Larry Hemphill
Relationship
Defendant
Sex
Male
Attorney
Pro Per
Party Name
Karen Hemphill
Relationship
Defendant
Sex
Female
Attorney
Pro Per
Case Documents
Filing Date
Description
Docket Date
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/19/2003
Description
ORD - Order
Docket Date
5/28/2003
Filing Party
NOTE:
DISMISSING DEFENDANTS GIBBS AND TOLTON
Filing Date
5/15/2003
Description
SFD - Stipulation For Dismissal
Docket Date
12/1/2003
Filing Party
NOTE:
DEFENDANTS GIBBS AND TOLTON
Filing Date
5/1/2003
Description
NDI - Notice Of Dismissal
Docket Date
5/22/2003
Filing Party
NOTE:
VOLUNTARY OF DEFENDANTS HEMPHILLS
Filing Date
4/14/2003
Description
SUM - Summons
Docket Date
4/30/2003
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/1/2003
Description
AFS - Affidavit Of Service
Docket Date
4/3/2003
Filing Party
NOTE:
LARRY AND KAREN HEMPHILL SERVED 3/30/03
Filing Date
3/11/2003
Description
056 - ME: Hearing Set
Docket Date
3/11/2003
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/7/2003
Description
STP - Stipulation
Docket Date
3/10/2003
Filing Party
NOTE:
TO STAY CASE AND CONTINUE HEARING ON DEFENDANTS MOTION FOR PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT
Filing Date
1/27/2003
Description
AMC - Amended Complaint
Docket Date
2/11/2003
Filing Party
NOTE:
FIRST/
Filing Date
1/23/2003
Description
019 - ME: Ruling
Docket Date
1/23/2003
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/15/2003
Description
SOF - Statement Of Facts
Docket Date
7/30/2003
Filing Party
NOTE:
CONTROVERTING
Filing Date
1/15/2003
Description
RES - Response
Docket Date
7/30/2003
Filing Party
NOTE:
TO PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT
Filing Date
1/10/2003
Description
094 - ME: Oral Argument Set
Docket Date
1/10/2003
Filing Party
Filing Date
12/23/2002
Description
SOF - Statement Of Facts
Docket Date
8/6/2003
Filing Party
NOTE:
IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT
Filing Date
12/23/2002
Description
MSJ - Motion For Summary Judgment
Docket Date
8/6/2003
Filing Party
NOTE:
PARTIAL
Filing Date
12/18/2002
Description
311 - ME: 150 Day Minute Entry
Docket Date
12/18/2002
Filing Party
Filing Date
12/4/2002
Description
MOT - Motion
Docket Date
12/5/2002
Filing Party
NOTE:
TO AMEND COMPLAINT
Filing Date
10/18/2002
Description
ORD - Order
Docket Date
11/4/2002
Filing Party
NOTE:
EX PARTE/ FOR SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL OF RECORD FOR PLAINTIFF
Filing Date
10/11/2002
Description
NOT - Notice
Docket Date
10/26/2002
Filing Party
NOTE:
OF LIS PENDENS
Filing Date
10/8/2002
Description
APL - Application
Docket Date
10/26/2002
Filing Party
NOTE:
FOR SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL OF RECORD FOR PLAINTIFF WITH CONSENT
Filing Date
9/9/2002
Description
ANS - Answer
Docket Date
9/23/2002
Filing Party
NOTE:
PAID
Filing Date
9/9/2002
Description
CCN - Cert Arbitration - Not Subject
Docket Date
10/28/2002
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/9/2002
Description
NAR - Notice Of Appearance
Docket Date
10/28/2002
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/26/2002
Description
NOT - Notice
Docket Date
10/17/2002
Filing Party
NOTE:
OF APPLICATION FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT
Filing Date
8/26/2002
Description
ADE - Application For Default
Docket Date
10/17/2002
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/26/2002
Description
AFD - Affidavit On Default
Docket Date
10/17/2002
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/23/2002
Description
SUM - Summons
Docket Date
10/22/2002
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/23/2002
Description
AFS - Affidavit Of Service
Docket Date
8/6/2002
Filing Party
NOTE:
P2 SERVED 7-15-02
Filing Date
7/22/2002
Description
SUM - Summons
Docket Date
10/7/2002
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/22/2002
Description
AFS - Affidavit Of Service
Docket Date
8/2/2002
Filing Party
NOTE:
P3 SERVED 07-14-02
Filing Date
7/12/2002
Description
CCN - Cert Arbitration - Not Subject
Docket Date
7/15/2002
Filing Party
Plaintiff(1)
Filing Date
7/12/2002
Description
COM - Complaint
Docket Date
7/15/2002
Filing Party
Plaintiff(1)
Case Calendar
Date
Time
Event
Date
3/14/2003
Time
9:00
Event
Oral Argument
Date
6/3/2003
Time
9:15
Event
Status Conference
Judgments
Date
(F)or / (A)gainst
Amount
Frequency
Type
Status
No records found.