« Return to search results
Case Information
Case Number:
CV2002-025209
Judge:
Warner, Randall
File Date:
12/12/2002
Location:
Downtown
Case Type:
Civil
eFile
Party Information
Party Name
Relationship
Sex
Attorney
Party Name
Terry Houle
Relationship
Plaintiff
Sex
Male
Attorney
Hyung Choi
Party Name
Joyce Houle
Relationship
Plaintiff
Sex
Female
Attorney
Hyung Choi
Party Name
Beaudry R V Mesa Inc
Relationship
Defendant
Sex
Attorney
WILLIAM SHATTUCK
Party Name
Country Coach Inc
Relationship
Defendant
Sex
Attorney
WILLIAM SHATTUCK
Party Name
Holland U S A
Relationship
Third Party Defendant
Sex
Attorney
Kristine Campbell
Party Name
Holland Group Inc, The
Relationship
Third Party Defendant
Sex
Attorney
Kristine Campbell
Party Name
Aaron M Phelps
Relationship
Endorsement Case
Sex
Male
Attorney
Pro Per
Case Documents
Filing Date
Description
Docket Date
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/9/2008
Description
ODI - Order Of Dismissal
Docket Date
4/9/2008
Filing Party
NOTE:
ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE
Filing Date
3/31/2008
Description
ODI - Order Of Dismissal
Docket Date
3/31/2008
Filing Party
NOTE:
ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE
Filing Date
3/25/2008
Description
SFD - Stipulation For Dismissal
Docket Date
3/25/2008
Filing Party
NOTE:
Stipulation for Dismissal With Prejudice
Filing Date
3/25/2008
Description
SFD - Stipulation For Dismissal
Docket Date
3/25/2008
Filing Party
NOTE:
Stipulation for Dismissal With Prejudice
Filing Date
9/27/2007
Description
083 - ME: Conference Reset/Cont
Docket Date
9/27/2007
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/18/2007
Description
ODI - Order Of Dismissal
Docket Date
9/18/2007
Filing Party
NOTE:
ORDER
Filing Date
9/11/2007
Description
SFD - Stipulation For Dismissal
Docket Date
9/11/2007
Filing Party
NOTE:
eFile Id 106520 -- Stipulation for Dismissal Without Prejudice
Filing Date
7/30/2007
Description
ORD - Order
Docket Date
7/30/2007
Filing Party
NOTE:
eFile Id 99119 -- ORDER EXTENDING DISCLOSURE, DISCOVERY AND MOTIONS DEADLINES
Filing Date
6/19/2007
Description
ORD - Order
Docket Date
6/26/2007
Filing Party
NOTE:
EXTENDING DISCLSOURE DISCOVERY AND MOTIONS DEADLINES
Filing Date
6/1/2007
Description
STP - Stipulation
Docket Date
6/1/2007
Filing Party
NOTE:
eFile Id 81785 -- Stipulation to extend disclosure, discovery and motions deadlines
Filing Date
4/12/2007
Description
028 - ME: Status Conference Set
Docket Date
4/12/2007
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/9/2007
Description
MEM - Memorandum
Docket Date
4/9/2007
Filing Party
NOTE:
eFile Id 64875 -- Joint Pretrial Memorandum
Filing Date
3/9/2007
Description
023 - ME: Order Entered By Court
Docket Date
3/9/2007
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/9/2007
Description
530 - ME: Case Designated for Mandatory E-Filing
Docket Date
3/9/2007
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/2/2006
Description
NSC - Notice of Substitution of Counsel
Docket Date
10/3/2006
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/25/2006
Description
CCE - Controverting Certificate
Docket Date
9/5/2006
Filing Party
NOTE:
HOLLAND USA AND THE HOLLAND GROUP'S
Filing Date
8/22/2006
Description
STA - Statement
Docket Date
8/29/2006
Filing Party
NOTE:
JOINT ALTERNATIVE DISPUTE RESOLUTION
Filing Date
8/8/2006
Description
MSE - Motion To Set & Cert/Readiness
Docket Date
8/11/2006
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/19/2006
Description
PHO - Pro Hac Vice Order
Docket Date
5/26/2006
Filing Party
NOTE:
PERRIN RYNDERS
Filing Date
5/19/2006
Description
PHO - Pro Hac Vice Order
Docket Date
5/26/2006
Filing Party
NOTE:
AARON M PHELPS
Filing Date
5/18/2006
Description
MOT - Motion
Docket Date
5/23/2006
Filing Party
NOTE:
AND CONSENT OF LOCAL COUNSEL FOR PRO HAC VICE ADMISSION OF AARON M PHELPS
Filing Date
5/18/2006
Description
MOT - Motion
Docket Date
5/23/2006
Filing Party
NOTE:
AND CONSENT OF LOCAL COUNSEL FOR PRO HAC VICE ADMISSION OF PERRIN RYNDERS
Filing Date
5/9/2006
Description
ANS - Answer
Docket Date
5/15/2006
Filing Party
NOTE:
TO FIRST AMENDED THIRD-PARTY COMPLAINT/PAID
Filing Date
5/5/2006
Description
ANS - Answer
Docket Date
5/8/2006
Filing Party
NOTE:
TO FIRST AMENDED THIRD-PARTY COMPLAINT/PAID
Filing Date
4/11/2006
Description
AFM - Affidavit of Service Registered/Certified Mail
Docket Date
4/12/2006
Filing Party
NOTE:
HOLLAND USA INC AND THE HOLLAND GROUP INC SERVED 3/27/06 AND HALDEX BRAKE PRODUCTS CORPORATION SERVED 3/29/06
Filing Date
3/24/2006
Description
AMC - Amended Complaint
Docket Date
3/27/2006
Filing Party
NOTE:
FIRST/ THIRD PARTY
Filing Date
3/20/2006
Description
COM - Complaint
Docket Date
3/21/2006
Filing Party
NOTE:
THIRD PARTY
Filing Date
3/15/2006
Description
078 - ME: Case On Dismissal Calendar
Docket Date
3/15/2006
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/8/2006
Description
078 - ME: Case On Dismissal Calendar
Docket Date
3/8/2006
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/28/2006
Description
NOS - Notice Of Settlement
Docket Date
7/21/2006
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/27/2006
Description
MOT - Motion
Docket Date
3/2/2006
Filing Party
NOTE:
FOR LEAVE TO FILE THIRD-PARTY COMPLAINT
Filing Date
2/27/2006
Description
MSE - Motion To Set & Cert/Readiness
Docket Date
3/3/2006
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/18/2006
Description
019 - ME: Ruling
Docket Date
1/18/2006
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/12/2006
Description
078 - ME: Case On Dismissal Calendar
Docket Date
1/12/2006
Filing Party
Filing Date
12/28/2005
Description
MEM - Memorandum
Docket Date
1/6/2006
Filing Party
NOTE:
JOINT PRETRIAL CONFERENCE
Filing Date
11/10/2005
Description
094 - ME: Oral Argument Set
Docket Date
11/10/2005
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/25/2005
Description
026 - ME: Pretrial Conference Set
Docket Date
10/25/2005
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/21/2005
Description
066 - ME: Case Reassigned
Docket Date
10/21/2005
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/29/2005
Description
NOS - Notice Of Settlement
Docket Date
10/6/2005
Filing Party
NOTE:
CONFERENCE
Filing Date
9/27/2005
Description
003 - ME: Hearing Reset
Docket Date
9/27/2005
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/15/2005
Description
070 - ME: Settlement Conference Set
Docket Date
9/15/2005
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/15/2005
Description
027 - ME: Pretrial Conference
Docket Date
9/15/2005
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/9/2005
Description
MEM - Memorandum
Docket Date
9/15/2005
Filing Party
NOTE:
JOINT PRETRIAL CONFERENCE/
Filing Date
8/30/2005
Description
083 - ME: Conference Reset/Cont
Docket Date
8/30/2005
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/24/2005
Description
NOT - Notice
Docket Date
4/21/2006
Filing Party
NOTE:
DEFDANT'S OBJECTIONS TO PLAINTTIFFS' DESIGNATION OF DEPOSITION EXCERPTS TO BE ;USED AT TRIAL
Filing Date
7/14/2005
Description
026 - ME: Pretrial Conference Set
Docket Date
7/14/2005
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/13/2005
Description
078 - ME: Case On Dismissal Calendar
Docket Date
7/13/2005
Filing Party
Case Calendar
Date
Time
Event
Date
9/14/2005
Time
13:45
Event
Pre-Trial Conference
Date
10/21/2005
Time
11:00
Event
Oral Argument
Date
11/3/2005
Time
9:00
Event
Civil Settlement Conference
Date
1/3/2006
Time
9:15
Event
Oral Argument
Date
1/6/2006
Time
8:30
Event
Oral Argument
Date
3/9/2006
Time
8:30
Event
Status Conference
Date
9/24/2007
Time
11:00
Event
Status Conference
Date
1/7/2008
Time
10:30
Event
Status Conference
Judgments
Date
(F)or / (A)gainst
Amount
Frequency
Type
Status
No records found.