Civil Court Case Information - Case History


« Return to search results
Case Information
Case Number: CV2002-016396 Judge: Duncan, Sally
File Date: 8/22/2002 Location: Downtown
Case Type: Civil  
Party Information
Party Name Relationship Sex Attorney
Sabin Burrell   Plaintiff  Female  Jonathan Olcott 
James Bragg   Defendant  Male  William Kozub 
Case Documents
Filing Date Description Docket Date Filing Party
9/30/2002  REL - Reply  5/30/2003   
NOTE: TO COUNTERCLAIM 
9/18/2002  ADE - Application For Default  11/15/2002   
9/18/2002  AFF - Affidavit  11/15/2002   
NOTE: IN SUPPORT OF APPLICATION FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT 
9/10/2002  CME - Credit Memo  9/18/2002   
NOTE: $136.00 ANSWER FEE 
8/22/2002  COM - Complaint  8/23/2002   
8/22/2002  MOT - Motion  8/23/2002   
NOTE: FOR ALTERNATIVE METHOD OF SERVICE 
8/22/2002  ORD - Order  8/23/2002   
NOTE: FOR ALTERNATIVE METHOD OF SERVICE 
8/22/2002  AFS - Affidavit Of Service  8/23/2002   
NOTE: JAMES BRAGG SERVED 07-15-02 
8/22/2002  ANS - Answer  8/23/2002   
NOTE: AND COUNTERCLAIM 
8/22/2002  MOT - Motion  8/23/2002   
NOTE: TO TRANSFER 
8/22/2002  REP - Report  8/23/2002   
NOTE: DOCKET PRINTOUT 
8/22/2002  ORD - Order  8/23/2002   
NOTE: OF TRANSMITTAL-------------------------BEGIN SUPERIOR COURT PLEADINGS------------------------- 
8/22/2002  NOF - Notice Of Filing  8/23/2002   
NOTE: OF CIVIL CASE FILE FROM CENTRAL PHOENIX JUSTICE COURT 
Case Calendar
There are no calendar events on file
Judgments
There are no judgments on file