« Return to search results
Case Information
Case Number:
CV2002-016393
Judge:
Blaney, Scott
File Date:
9/16/2002
Location:
Downtown
Case Type:
Civil
Party Information
Party Name
Relationship
Sex
Attorney
Party Name
American Express Travel Related Services Inc
Relationship
Plaintiff
Sex
Attorney
Esther Simon
Party Name
S Petrone
Relationship
Defendant
Sex
Unknown
Attorney
Pro Per
Party Name
Robert J Petrone
Relationship
Defendant
Sex
Male
Attorney
Pro Per
Case Documents
Filing Date
Description
Docket Date
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/16/2003
Description
ODI - Order Of Dismissal
Docket Date
10/22/2003
Filing Party
NOTE:
WITHOUT PREJUDICE
Filing Date
5/16/2003
Description
SFD - Stipulation For Dismissal
Docket Date
12/1/2003
Filing Party
NOTE:
WITHOUT PREJUDICE
Filing Date
2/24/2003
Description
AFS - Affidavit Of Service
Docket Date
3/5/2003
Filing Party
NOTE:
ROBERT J PETRONE SERVED 02/15/03
Filing Date
2/24/2003
Description
SUM - Summons
Docket Date
7/8/2003
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/19/2003
Description
311 - ME: 150 Day Minute Entry
Docket Date
2/19/2003
Filing Party
Filing Date
12/25/2002
Description
322 - ME: Notice Of Intent To Dismiss
Docket Date
12/25/2002
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/16/2002
Description
COM - Complaint
Docket Date
9/18/2002
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/16/2002
Description
CCS - Cerificate Arbitration - Subject To
Docket Date
9/18/2002
Filing Party
Case Calendar
There are no calendar events on file
Judgments
Date
(F)or / (A)gainst
Amount
Frequency
Type
Status
No records found.