Civil Court Case Information - Case History


« Return to search results
Case Information
Case Number: CV2002-014918 Judge: Agne, Sara
File Date: 8/1/2002 Location: Downtown
Case Type: Civil  
Party Information
Party Name Relationship Sex Attorney
Foothills Club West Community Associati   Plaintiff  None  James Hazlewood 
Sabin L Burrell   Defendant  Male  Pro Per 
Case Documents
Filing Date Description Docket Date Filing Party
11/7/2003  SJU - Satisfaction Of Judgment  11/20/2003   
9/5/2002  JUD - Judgment  9/30/2002   
NOTE: Notice of filing and entry provided to the parties 
8/27/2002  002 - ME: Hearing Vacated  8/27/2002   
8/26/2002  ANS - Answer  9/12/2002  Defendant(2)  
NOTE: PD; STIPULATION FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT 
8/12/2002  AFS - Affidavit Of Service  8/20/2002   
NOTE: P2 SERVED 8-8-02 
8/12/2002  SUM - Summons  11/2/2002   
8/6/2002  OSC - Order To Show Cause  10/25/2002   
8/1/2002  COM - Complaint  8/5/2002  Plaintiff(1)  
8/1/2002  REQ - Request  8/5/2002  Plaintiff(1)  
NOTE: FOR A PRELIMINARY AND PERMANENT INJUNCTION 
8/1/2002  RQH - Request For Hearing  8/7/2002  Plaintiff(1)  
NOTE: RE ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE 
Case Calendar
Date Time Event
8/23/2002  14:00  Order To Show Cause 
Judgments
Date (F)or / (A)gainst Amount Frequency Type Status
9/5/2002  F:Foothills Club West Community Associati  $1,300.00  One Time  Attorney Fee  Satisfied 
  A: Sabin L Burrell