Civil Court Case Information - Case History
« Return to search results
Case Information | |||
---|---|---|---|
Case Number: | CV2002-009891 | Judge: | McCoy, M. Scott |
File Date: | 5/22/2002 | Location: | Downtown |
Case Type: | Civil |
Party Information | |||
---|---|---|---|
Party Name | Relationship | Sex | Attorney |
Michael D George | Plaintiff | Male | Samuel Tiffany |
Todd Jostes | Defendant | Male | Pro Per |
Cami Jostes | Defendant | Female | Pro Per |
Arbitrator | Endorsement Case | Unknown | David Wattel |
Case Documents | |||
---|---|---|---|
Filing Date | Description | Docket Date | Filing Party |
7/12/2004 | 047 - ME: Judgment Of Dismissal | 7/12/2004 | |
1/8/2004 | 314 - ME: Bankruptcy | 1/8/2004 | |
12/24/2003 | NOB - Notice Of Filing Bankruptcy | 4/7/2004 | |
NOTE: AND EFFECT OF AUTOMATIC STAY | |||
10/29/2003 | PTT - Petition | 2/28/2004 | |
NOTE: FOR ORDER REQUIRING JUDGMENT DEBTOR TO APPEAR FOR EXAMINATION | |||
10/10/2003 | JUD - Judgment | 10/27/2003 | |
NOTE: Notice of filing and entry provided to the parties | |||
10/8/2003 | NOT - Notice | 2/24/2004 | |
NOTE: OF LODGING PROPOSED FORM OF ORDER | |||
10/8/2003 | AAF - Application For Attorney Fees | 2/24/2004 | |
8/29/2003 | AFF - Affidavit | 1/20/2004 | |
NOTE: IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT | |||
8/29/2003 | SOF - Statement Of Facts | 1/20/2004 | |
NOTE: IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT | |||
8/29/2003 | MSJ - Motion For Summary Judgment | 1/20/2004 | |
6/2/2003 | RTM - Returned Mail or Returned/ReMailed Mail | 10/28/2003 | |
5/21/2003 | OBJ - Objection/Opposition. | 10/23/2003 | |
NOTE: TO SUBPOENA DUCES TECUM | |||
5/20/2003 | 399 - ME: Notice To File Arbit Award | 5/20/2003 | |
4/17/2003 | 089 - ME: Trial Setting | 4/17/2003 | |
4/14/2003 | ARA - Arbitration Award | 8/22/2003 | |
4/10/2003 | MEM - Memorandum | 10/3/2003 | |
NOTE: JOINT PRETRIAL | |||
4/7/2003 | LOW - List Of Witnesses/Exhibit/Evidence | 9/16/2003 | |
NOTE: PLAINTIFF'S | |||
4/2/2003 | 399 - ME: Notice To File Arbit Award | 10/8/2003 | |
3/24/2003 | 041 - ME: Scheduling Conference Set | 3/24/2003 | |
3/14/2003 | NAP - Notice Of Appeal | 9/8/2003 | Defendant(2) |
3/5/2003 | NDN - Notice Of Decision of Arbitrator | 3/6/2003 | |
NOTE: OF ARBITRATOR | |||
2/6/2003 | NOH - Notice Of Hearing | 6/24/2003 | |
NOTE: FOURTH AMENDED/ARBITRATION | |||
1/29/2003 | NOH - Notice Of Hearing | 1/31/2003 | |
NOTE: FOURTH AMENDED/ARBITRATION | |||
1/23/2003 | RTM - Returned Mail or Returned/ReMailed Mail | 2/19/2003 | |
1/16/2003 | RTM - Returned Mail or Returned/ReMailed Mail | 5/22/2003 | |
1/15/2003 | NOH - Notice Of Hearing | 1/17/2003 | |
NOTE: 3RD AMENDED/ARBITRATION | |||
1/8/2003 | NOH - Notice Of Hearing | 1/13/2003 | |
NOTE: 2ND AMENDED/OF ARBITRATION HEARING | |||
11/20/2002 | NOH - Notice Of Hearing | 11/27/2002 | |
NOTE: AMENDED/ARBITRATION | |||
10/30/2002 | 311 - ME: 150 Day Minute Entry | 10/30/2002 | |
10/25/2002 | RTM - Returned Mail or Returned/ReMailed Mail | 2/14/2012 | |
10/4/2002 | 019 - ME: Ruling | 10/4/2002 | |
9/19/2002 | 003 - ME: Hearing Reset | 9/19/2002 | |
9/12/2002 | 056 - ME: Hearing Set | 9/12/2002 | |
8/12/2002 | RES - Response | 10/31/2002 | |
NOTE: TO MOTION TO SET ASIDE DEFAULT | |||
7/16/2002 | NOH - Notice Of Hearing | 7/25/2002 | |
NOTE: ARBITRATION | |||
7/9/2002 | ANS - Answer | 7/11/2002 | Defendant(2) |
7/9/2002 | MOT - Motion | 10/1/2002 | Defendant(2) |
NOTE: TO SET ASIDE DEFAULT | |||
7/2/2002 | MAJ - Mot/Aff Entry Def Jud W/O Hear | 8/15/2002 | Plaintiff(1) |
7/2/2002 | SOC - Statement Of Costs | 8/15/2002 | Plaintiff(1) |
6/28/2002 | 324 - ME: Notice Of Appointment Of Arbitrator | 6/28/2002 | |
6/19/2002 | AFD - Affidavit On Default | 7/29/2002 | Plaintiff(1) |
6/19/2002 | ADE - Application For Default | 7/29/2002 | Plaintiff(1) |
6/7/2002 | ODF - Order Deferring Court Fees | 6/10/2002 | |
6/7/2002 | ADW - Application Deferral/Waiver | 6/10/2002 | Defendant(3) |
6/7/2002 | ANS - Answer | 6/10/2002 | Defendant(3) |
NOTE: SEPARATE | |||
5/24/2002 | AFS - Affidavit Of Service | 5/30/2002 | Plaintiff(1) |
NOTE: P3 SERVED 05-23-02 | |||
5/23/2002 | AFS - Affidavit Of Service | 5/28/2002 | |
NOTE: P2 SERVED 5-22-02 | |||
5/23/2002 | SUM - Summons | 6/29/2002 | Plaintiff(1) |
5/22/2002 | COM - Complaint | 5/28/2002 | Plaintiff(1) |
5/22/2002 | CCS - Cerificate Arbitration - Subject To | 5/28/2002 | Plaintiff(1) |
Case Calendar | ||
---|---|---|
Date | Time | Event |
9/18/2002 | 15:00 | Oral Argument |
9/26/2002 | 14:30 | Oral Argument |
1/13/2003 | 9:00 | Arbitration Hearing |
4/15/2003 | 8:30 | Pre-Trial Conference |
12/16/2003 | 9:30 | Trial |
12/18/2003 | 10:30 | Judgment Debtor Exam |
Judgments | |||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Date | (F)or / (A)gainst | Amount | Frequency | Type | Status |
10/10/2003 | F:Michael D George | $245.84 | One Time | Costs | |
A: Todd Jostes | |||||
A: Cami Jostes | |||||
10/10/2003 | F:Michael D George | $7,471.00 | One Time | Attorney Fee | |
A: Todd Jostes | |||||
A: Cami Jostes | |||||
10/10/2003 | F:Michael D George | $1,367.00 | One Time | Interest | |
A: Todd Jostes | |||||
A: Cami Jostes | |||||
10/10/2003 | F:Michael D George | $9,595.06 | One Time | Principal | |
A: Todd Jostes | |||||
A: Cami Jostes |