« Return to search results
Case Information
Case Number:
CV2002-006281
Judge:
Ryan, Timothy
File Date:
4/4/2002
Location:
Downtown
Case Type:
Civil
Party Information
Party Name
Relationship
Sex
Attorney
Party Name
Letricia Hemphill
Relationship
Plaintiff
Sex
Female
Attorney
Sabinus Megwa
Party Name
Khadijah Trammel Peters
Relationship
Defendant
Sex
Female
Attorney
Paul Holloway
Party Name
Arbitrator
Relationship
Endorsement Case
Sex
Unknown
Attorney
Susan Wees
Case Documents
Filing Date
Description
Docket Date
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/21/2003
Description
SJU - Satisfaction Of Judgment
Docket Date
4/24/2003
Filing Party
NOTE:
ARBITRATION AWARD
Filing Date
3/14/2003
Description
ARA - Arbitration Award
Docket Date
5/16/2003
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/7/2003
Description
SOC - Statement Of Costs
Docket Date
8/27/2003
Filing Party
NOTE:
AND NOTICE OF TAXATION OF COSTS
Filing Date
2/20/2003
Description
NDN - Notice Of Decision of Arbitrator
Docket Date
7/18/2003
Filing Party
NOTE:
OF ARIBTRATOR
Filing Date
1/16/2003
Description
078 - ME: Case On Dismissal Calendar
Docket Date
2/25/2003
Filing Party
Filing Date
12/20/2002
Description
AFS - Affidavit Of Service
Docket Date
3/25/2003
Filing Party
Filing Date
11/27/2002
Description
398 - ME: Notice To Set Arbitrn Hrng
Docket Date
11/27/2002
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/9/2002
Description
NOH - Notice Of Hearing
Docket Date
5/29/2003
Filing Party
NOTE:
ARBITRATION
Filing Date
9/6/2002
Description
ANS - Answer
Docket Date
9/23/2002
Filing Party
NOTE:
PAID
Filing Date
9/6/2002
Description
CCA - Cert Compulsory Arbitration
Docket Date
11/9/2002
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/28/2002
Description
324 - ME: Notice Of Appointment Of Arbitrator
Docket Date
6/28/2002
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/6/2002
Description
AFS - Affidavit Of Service
Docket Date
6/10/2002
Filing Party
NOTE:
P2 SERVED 5-30-2002
Filing Date
6/6/2002
Description
SUM - Summons
Docket Date
7/11/2002
Filing Party
Plaintiff(1)
Filing Date
4/4/2002
Description
COM - Complaint
Docket Date
4/8/2002
Filing Party
Plaintiff(1)
Filing Date
4/4/2002
Description
CCS - Cerificate Arbitration - Subject To
Docket Date
4/8/2002
Filing Party
Plaintiff(1)
Case Calendar
There are no calendar events on file
Judgments
Date
(F)or / (A)gainst
Amount
Frequency
Type
Status
Date
3/14/2003
(F)or / (A)gainst
F:  Letricia Hemphill
A: Khadijah Trammel Peters
Amount
$629.75
Frequency
One Time
Type
Costs
Status
Date
3/14/2003
(F)or / (A)gainst
F:  Letricia Hemphill
A: Khadijah Trammel Peters
Amount
$7,500.00
Frequency
One Time
Type
Principal
Status