Civil Court Case Information - Case History
« Return to search results
Case Information | |||
---|---|---|---|
Case Number: | CV2002-000810 | Judge: | Ryan, Timothy |
File Date: | 1/15/2002 | Location: | Downtown |
Case Type: | Civil |
Party Information | |||
---|---|---|---|
Party Name | Relationship | Sex | Attorney |
Yami Turner | Plaintiff | Female | Pro Per |
Todd Jostes | Defendant | Male | Pro Per |
Case Documents | |||
---|---|---|---|
Filing Date | Description | Docket Date | Filing Party |
7/10/2002 10:51:00 AM | JOR - Judgment And Order | 7/10/2002 10:51:00 AM | |
NOTE: Posted during iCIS Conversion | |||
7/10/2002 | AFS - Affidavit Of Service | 7/11/2002 | |
NOTE: P2 SERVED 01-13-02 | |||
6/25/2002 | 019 - ME: Ruling | 6/25/2002 | |
6/19/2002 | MOT - Motion | 7/25/2002 | Plaintiff(1) |
NOTE: TO REINSTATE | |||
6/4/2002 | 019 - ME: Ruling | 6/4/2002 | |
5/16/2002 | AFF - Affidavit | 6/19/2002 | Plaintiff(1) |
NOTE: OF DAMAGES | |||
5/16/2002 | MOT - Motion | 11/18/2002 | Plaintiff(1) |
NOTE: FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT | |||
5/10/2002 11:44:00 AM | JUD - Judgment | 5/10/2002 11:44:00 AM | |
NOTE: Posted during iCIS Conversion | |||
5/10/2002 | AFF - Affidavit | 7/2/2002 | Plaintiff(1) |
NOTE: OF DAMAGES | |||
5/10/2002 | MOT - Motion | 7/2/2002 | Plaintiff(1) |
NOTE: FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT | |||
4/25/2002 | AFS - Affidavit Of Service | 4/26/2002 | Plaintiff(1) |
NOTE: P2 SERVED 1-31-2002 | |||
4/25/2002 | AAD - Application And Affidavit Of Default | 5/28/2002 | Plaintiff(1) |
1/15/2002 | COM - Complaint | 1/18/2002 | Plaintiff(1) |
1/15/2002 | CCS - Cerificate Arbitration - Subject To | 1/18/2002 | Plaintiff(1) |
Case Calendar | ||
---|---|---|
Date | Time | Event |
7/10/2002 | 10:30 | Default Hearing |
Judgments | |||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Date | (F)or / (A)gainst | Amount | Frequency | Type | Status |
F:Yami Turner | $4,064.95 | One Time | Judgment And Order | ||
A: Todd Jostes | |||||
F:Yami Turner | $4,500.00 | One Time | Judgment Only | ||
A: Todd Jostes |