« Return to search results
Case Information
Case Number:
CV2001-017894
Judge:
Fox, Dewain
File Date:
10/12/2001
Location:
Downtown
Case Type:
Civil
Party Information
Party Name
Relationship
Sex
Attorney
Party Name
Henri Castela
Relationship
Plaintiff
Sex
Male
Attorney
Marshall Meyers
Party Name
Fleetwood Enterprises Inc
Relationship
Defendant
Sex
None
Attorney
KERRY GRIGGS
Party Name
Beaudry Rv
Relationship
Defendant
Sex
None
Attorney
Michael Murphy
Party Name
Cummins Engine Company Inc
Relationship
Defendant
Sex
None
Attorney
Tamara Cook
Party Name
Spartan Motors Inc
Relationship
Defendant
Sex
None
Attorney
John Sinodis
Case Documents
Filing Date
Description
Docket Date
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/3/2003
Description
ODI - Order Of Dismissal
Docket Date
5/3/2003
Filing Party
NOTE:
WITH PREJUDICE
Filing Date
2/21/2003
Description
ODI - Order Of Dismissal
Docket Date
4/2/2003
Filing Party
NOTE:
WITH PREJUDICE
Filing Date
2/18/2003
Description
STD - Stipulation To/For Dismissal
Docket Date
3/5/2003
Filing Party
NOTE:
WITH PREJUDICE
Filing Date
1/29/2003
Description
078 - ME: Case On Dismissal Calendar
Docket Date
1/29/2003
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/23/2003
Description
NOS - Notice Of Settlement
Docket Date
2/18/2003
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/6/2003
Description
019 - ME: Ruling
Docket Date
1/6/2003
Filing Party
Filing Date
12/13/2002
Description
MOT - Motion
Docket Date
1/9/2003
Filing Party
NOTE:
JOINDER WITH DEFENDANT SPARTANS/ FOR SECURITY OF COSTS
Filing Date
12/13/2002
Description
NOT - Notice
Docket Date
12/19/2002
Filing Party
NOTE:
OF JUDGMENT
Filing Date
12/6/2002
Description
RES - Response
Docket Date
12/23/2002
Filing Party
NOTE:
TO DEFENDANTS MOTION FOR SECURITY OF COSTS AND CROSS MOTION TO STAY THE MOTION FOR COSTS PENDING THE OUTCOME OF THE 01-03-03 SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE
Filing Date
12/2/2002
Description
MOT - Motion
Docket Date
12/18/2002
Filing Party
NOTE:
JOINDER IN DEFENDANT SPARTAN MOTORS INCS/ FOR SECURITY FOR COSTS
Filing Date
11/26/2002
Description
MOT - Motion
Docket Date
12/13/2002
Filing Party
NOTE:
JOINDER IN DEFENDANTS - FOR SECURITY COSTS
Filing Date
11/26/2002
Description
ORD - Order
Docket Date
12/17/2002
Filing Party
NOTE:
FOR SETTLMENT CONFERENCE CONDUCTED BY JUDGE PRO TEM DAVID N HEAP
Filing Date
11/21/2002
Description
MOT - Motion
Docket Date
12/17/2002
Filing Party
NOTE:
FOR SECURITY FOR COSTS
Filing Date
8/20/2002
Description
OCC - Order Continuing on Inactive/Dismissal Calendar
Docket Date
11/20/2002
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/15/2002
Description
CER - Certificate
Docket Date
11/7/2002
Filing Party
NOTE:
OF SERVICE OF PLAINTIFFS INTERROGATORIES, REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION REQUEST TO ADMIT
Filing Date
8/9/2002
Description
CAA - Cert Of Agreement/Arbitration
Docket Date
10/30/2002
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/9/2002
Description
ANS - Answer
Docket Date
8/13/2002
Filing Party
Defendant(4)
NOTE:
TO THIRD AMENDED COMPLAINT
Filing Date
7/23/2002
Description
RRM - Returned/ReMailed Mail
Docket Date
9/11/2002
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/17/2002
Description
AFS - Affidavit Of Service
Docket Date
8/16/2002
Filing Party
Plaintiff(1)
NOTE:
OF PLAINTIFFS INTERROGATORIES, REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION REQUEST TO ADMIT
Filing Date
7/12/2002
Description
ANS - Answer
Docket Date
7/22/2002
Filing Party
Defendant(5)
Filing Date
7/12/2002
Description
CAA - Cert Of Agreement/Arbitration
Docket Date
7/30/2002
Filing Party
Defendant(5)
Filing Date
7/10/2002
Description
019 - ME: Ruling
Docket Date
7/10/2002
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/8/2002
Description
070 - ME: Settlement Conference Set
Docket Date
7/12/2002
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/5/2002
Description
NOT - Notice
Docket Date
7/30/2002
Filing Party
Plaintiff(1)
NOTE:
OF MOTION TO GRANT RELIEF FROM RULE 38.1 DEADLINES AND TO CONTINUE ON INACTIVE; CALENDAR
Filing Date
7/2/2002
Description
019 - ME: Ruling
Docket Date
7/2/2002
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/28/2002
Description
RES - Response
Docket Date
7/15/2002
Filing Party
Defendant(2)
NOTE:
TO PLAINTIFFS REQUEST FOR A RULE 16.1 SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE
Filing Date
6/19/2002
Description
AFS - Affidavit Of Service
Docket Date
6/24/2002
Filing Party
NOTE:
P4 SERVED 6-12-02
Filing Date
6/19/2002
Description
SUM - Summons
Docket Date
7/1/2002
Filing Party
Plaintiff(1)
NOTE:
ALIAS/
Filing Date
6/17/2002
Description
REQ - Request
Docket Date
7/1/2002
Filing Party
Plaintiff(1)
NOTE:
FOR A RULE 16.1 SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE
Filing Date
6/11/2002
Description
AMC - Amended Complaint
Docket Date
6/12/2002
Filing Party
Plaintiff(1)
Filing Date
6/11/2002
Description
CCN - Cert Arbitration - Not Subject
Docket Date
6/26/2002
Filing Party
Plaintiff(1)
NOTE:
AMENDED
Filing Date
6/5/2002
Description
ANS - Answer
Docket Date
6/6/2002
Filing Party
Defendant(2)
NOTE:
SEPARATE/TO PLAINTIFFS THIRD AMENDED COMPLAINT
Filing Date
5/24/2002
Description
RRM - Returned/ReMailed Mail
Docket Date
6/18/2002
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/13/2002
Description
019 - ME: Ruling
Docket Date
5/13/2002
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/26/2002
Description
311 - ME: 150 Day Minute Entry
Docket Date
3/26/2002
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/19/2002
Description
NOF - Notice Of Filing
Docket Date
4/4/2002
Filing Party
NOTE:
PLAINTIFFS REPLY TO DEFENDANTS RESPONSE TO PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE; 3RD AMENDED COMPLAINT
Filing Date
3/8/2002
Description
RES - Response
Docket Date
3/27/2002
Filing Party
Defendant(2)
NOTE:
TO PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE THIRD AMENDED COMPLAINT
Filing Date
3/1/2002
Description
RRM - Returned/ReMailed Mail
Docket Date
3/19/2002
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/21/2002
Description
AMC - Amended Complaint
Docket Date
3/13/2002
Filing Party
Plaintiff(1)
NOTE:
SECOND
Filing Date
2/19/2002
Description
MOT - Motion
Docket Date
2/27/2002
Filing Party
Plaintiff(1)
NOTE:
FOR LEAVE TO FILE 3RD AMENDED COMPLAINT
Filing Date
2/19/2002
Description
NOF - Notice Of Filing
Docket Date
3/12/2002
Filing Party
Plaintiff(1)
NOTE:
PLAS MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE 3RD AMENDED COMPLAINT
Filing Date
2/12/2002
Description
019 - ME: Ruling
Docket Date
2/12/2002
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/17/2002
Description
NOF - Notice Of Filing
Docket Date
1/24/2002
Filing Party
Plaintiff(1)
NOTE:
PLAS REPLY TO DEF FLEETWOOD MOTOR HOMES OF INDIANA INCS RESPONSE TO PLAS; MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE AMENDED COMPLAINT
Filing Date
1/17/2002
Description
REL - Reply
Docket Date
1/24/2002
Filing Party
Plaintiff(1)
NOTE:
TO DEF FLEETWOOD MOTOR HOMES OF INDIANA INCS RESPONSE TO PLAS MOTION FOR; LEAVE TO FILE AMENDED COMPLAINT
Filing Date
1/7/2002
Description
RES - Response
Docket Date
1/16/2002
Filing Party
Defendant(2)
NOTE:
TO PLAS MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE AMENDED COMPLAINT
Filing Date
12/26/2001
Description
NOF - Notice Of Filing
Docket Date
1/10/2002
Filing Party
Plaintiff(1)
NOTE:
PLAS MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE AMENDED COMPLAINT
Filing Date
12/26/2001
Description
MOT - Motion
Docket Date
1/17/2002
Filing Party
Plaintiff(1)
NOTE:
FOR LEAVE TO FILE AMENDED COMPLAINT
Filing Date
12/12/2001
Description
ORD - Order
Docket Date
12/18/2001
Filing Party
NOTE:
THAT THE CAPTION OF THIS LAWSUIT SHALL BE AMENDED SUBSTITUTING THE NAMED DEF; FLEETWOOD ENTERPRISES INC WITH THE NAME OF FLEETWOOD MOTOR HOMES OF INDIANA INC
Filing Date
12/4/2001
Description
NOF - Notice Of Filing
Docket Date
12/18/2001
Filing Party
Plaintiff(1)
NOTE:
PLAS RULE 26.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT
Filing Date
11/29/2001
Description
ANS - Answer
Docket Date
12/7/2001
Filing Party
Defendant(3)
Filing Date
11/29/2001
Description
CCN - Cert Arbitration - Not Subject
Docket Date
12/18/2001
Filing Party
Defendant(3)
Filing Date
11/26/2001
Description
STP - Stipulation
Docket Date
12/11/2001
Filing Party
Defendant(2)
NOTE:
FOR AMENDMENT OF CAPTION
Filing Date
11/14/2001
Description
ANS - Answer
Docket Date
11/16/2001
Filing Party
Defendant(2)
NOTE:
SEPARATE/
Filing Date
11/14/2001
Description
CCN - Cert Arbitration - Not Subject
Docket Date
11/29/2001
Filing Party
Defendant(2)
Filing Date
10/12/2001
Description
COM - Complaint
Docket Date
10/16/2001
Filing Party
Plaintiff(1)
Filing Date
10/12/2001
Description
CCN - Cert Arbitration - Not Subject
Docket Date
10/16/2001
Filing Party
Plaintiff(1)
Case Calendar
Date
Time
Event
Date
2/6/2002
Time
0:00
Event
Motion To Amend
Date
5/7/2002
Time
0:00
Event
Motion To Amend
Date
1/3/2003
Time
9:00
Event
Civil Settlement Conference
Date
1/3/2003
Time
9:30
Event
Civil Settlement Conference
Judgments
Date
(F)or / (A)gainst
Amount
Frequency
Type
Status
No records found.