« Return to search results
Case Information
Case Number:
CV2001-008049
Judge:
Minder, Scott
File Date:
5/10/2001
Location:
Southeast
Case Type:
Civil
Party Information
Party Name
Relationship
Sex
Attorney
Party Name
Deborah K Hemphill
Relationship
Plaintiff
Sex
Female
Attorney
ROBERT MCCRACKEN
Party Name
Russell Hemphill
Relationship
Plaintiff
Sex
Male
Attorney
ROBERT MCCRACKEN
Party Name
Starbucks Coffee Company
Relationship
Defendant
Sex
None
Attorney
Pro Per
Party Name
Arbitrator
Relationship
Endorsement Case
Sex
Unknown
Attorney
Robert Blesch
Case Documents
Filing Date
Description
Docket Date
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/12/2002
Description
ODI - Order Of Dismissal
Docket Date
7/9/2002
Filing Party
NOTE:
WITHOUT PREJUDICE
Filing Date
6/7/2002
Description
399 - ME: Notice To File Arbit Award
Docket Date
6/7/2002
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/14/2002
Description
NOH - Notice Of Hearing
Docket Date
4/2/2002
Filing Party
NOTE:
ARBITRATION
Filing Date
11/9/2001
Description
324 - ME: Notice Of Appointment Of Arbitrator
Docket Date
11/9/2001
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/16/2001
Description
311 - ME: 150 Day Minute Entry
Docket Date
10/16/2001
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/14/2001
Description
SUM - Summons
Docket Date
9/22/2001
Filing Party
Plaintiff(1)
Filing Date
9/14/2001
Description
AFS - Affidavit Of Service
Docket Date
9/18/2001
Filing Party
Plaintiff(1)
NOTE:
P3 SERVED 09-07-01
Filing Date
8/22/2001
Description
322 - ME: Notice Of Intent To Dismiss
Docket Date
8/22/2001
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/10/2001
Description
COM - Complaint
Docket Date
5/14/2001
Filing Party
Plaintiff(1)
Filing Date
5/10/2001
Description
CCS - Cerificate Arbitration - Subject To
Docket Date
5/14/2001
Filing Party
Plaintiff(1)
Case Calendar
There are no calendar events on file
Judgments
Date
(F)or / (A)gainst
Amount
Frequency
Type
Status
No records found.