Civil Court Case Information - Case History
« Return to search results
Case Information | |||
---|---|---|---|
Case Number: | CV2001-005145 | Judge: | Gordon, Michael |
File Date: | 3/27/2001 | Location: | Northeast |
Case Type: | Civil |
Party Information | |||
---|---|---|---|
Party Name | Relationship | Sex | Attorney |
Joyce Defren | Plaintiff | Female | Jay Mann |
Trimark Homes Inc | Defendant | None | W FLOOD |
Trimark Bennett Estates Llc | Defendant | None | W FLOOD |
Gilbert Plumbing Company Inc | Third Party Defendant | None | DOUGLAS NORTHUP |
Joyce Defren | Plaintiff | Female | Pro Per |
Uponor Wirsbo | Third Party Defendant | None | Thomas Ulreich-Power |
Terrence E Bishop Pro Hac Vice | Endorsement Case | Male | Pro Per |
Case Documents | |||
---|---|---|---|
Filing Date | Description | Docket Date | Filing Party |
1/22/2004 | ODI - Order Of Dismissal | 2/11/2004 | |
NOTE: WITH PREJUDICE | |||
1/20/2004 | SFD - Stipulation For Dismissal | 1/29/2004 | |
NOTE: WITH PREJUDICE | |||
1/6/2004 | 078 - ME: Case On Dismissal Calendar | 1/6/2004 | |
12/22/2003 | NOT - Notice | 1/7/2004 | |
NOTE: WITHDRAWAL OF PROPOSED JUDGMENT KON THIRD PARTY CALIMS AND NOTICE SETTLEMENT | |||
12/12/2003 | SOC - Statement Of Costs | 12/16/2003 | |
NOTE: AND NOTICE OF TAXATION OF COSTS | |||
12/11/2003 | 019 - ME: Ruling | 12/11/2003 | |
10/15/2003 | 020 - ME: Matter Under Advisement | 10/15/2003 | |
9/15/2003 | REL - Reply | 10/10/2003 | |
NOTE: IN SUPPORT OF APPLICATION FOR ATTORNEYS FEES | |||
8/25/2003 | EDE - Entry Of Default | 8/29/2003 | |
NOTE: IN OPPOSITION TO APPLICATION FOR ATTORNEYS FEES | |||
8/21/2003 | REQ - Request | 9/16/2003 | |
NOTE: FOR EXTENDED ORAL ARGUMENT | |||
8/13/2003 | REQ - Request | 8/20/2003 | |
NOTE: FOR EXTENDED ORAL ARGUMENT | |||
8/13/2003 | REL - Reply | 8/20/2003 | |
NOTE: IN SUPPORT OF PETITION FOR DETERMINATION OF AWARD OF ATTORNEY FEES | |||
8/1/2003 | 094 - ME: Oral Argument Set | 8/1/2003 | |
7/28/2003 | MEM - Memorandum | 7/31/2003 | |
NOTE: IN OPPOSITION TO PETITION FOR DETERMINATION OF AWARD OF ATTORNEYS FEES | |||
7/24/2003 | AFF - Affidavit | 8/1/2003 | |
NOTE: OF W MICHAEL FLOOD | |||
7/24/2003 | AAF - Application For Attorney Fees | 8/4/2003 | |
7/10/2003 | ORD - Order | 8/15/2003 | |
NOTE: JOINT PRETRIAL SCHEUDLING | |||
6/30/2003 | 027 - ME: Pretrial Conference | 6/30/2003 | |
6/27/2003 | NOF - Notice Of Filing | 7/10/2003 | |
NOTE: RULE 68 OFFER OF JUDGEMENT AND PARTIAL ACCEPTANCE OF OFFER AND PETITION FOR DETERMINATION OF AWARD OF ATTORNEYS FEES | |||
6/16/2003 | MEM - Memorandum | 6/23/2003 | |
NOTE: JOINT PRETRIAL | |||
5/19/2003 | REQ - Request | 6/16/2003 | |
NOTE: FOR JURY TRIAL | |||
4/28/2003 | 083 - ME: Conference Reset/Cont | 4/28/2003 | |
3/28/2003 | 026 - ME: Pretrial Conference Set | 3/28/2003 | |
3/26/2003 | ORD - Order | 4/24/2003 | |
NOTE: REGARDING MOTION TO VACATE TRIAL DATE AND TO REQUEST COMPREHENSIVE PRETRIAL CONFERENCE | |||
3/24/2003 | AFS - Affidavit Of Service | 4/3/2003 | |
3/11/2003 | MOT - Motion | 4/2/2003 | |
NOTE: TO VACATE TRIAL DATE AND TO REQUEST COMPREHENSIVE PRETRIAL CONFERENCE | |||
3/10/2003 | REQ - Request | 3/21/2003 | |
NOTE: FOR RULE 16 SCHEDULING CONFERENCE | |||
1/23/2003 | ODI - Order Of Dismissal | 3/15/2003 | |
NOTE: WITH PREJUDICE OF CLAIMS OF PLAINTIFFS JOYCE DEFREN ONLY | |||
12/27/2002 | ORD - Order | 2/12/2003 | |
NOTE: REQUIRING THE PERSONS WITH SETTLEMENT AUTHORITY INCLUDING INSURERS TO PERSONALLY ATTEND THE 01-10-03 MEDIATION BEFORE DAN NASTRO | |||
12/9/2002 | REQ - Request | 12/18/2002 | |
NOTE: STIPULATED/ FOR ORDER RELATING TO MEDIATION | |||
12/9/2002 | STP - Stipulation | 12/18/2002 | |
NOTE: REQUEST FOR ORDER RELATING TO MEDIATION | |||
11/25/2002 | ORD - Order | 12/16/2002 | |
NOTE: REQUIRING THE PARTIES TO PARTICIPATE IN A MEDIATION BEFORE DAN NASTRO WITHIN 45 DAYD OF THIS ORDER OR BY NO LATER THAN 1/2/03 | |||
11/18/2002 | REQ - Request | 12/10/2002 | |
NOTE: STIPULATED / FOR SUBMISSION OF CASE TO MEDIATION AND FOR TEMPORARY STAY OF CASE AND PENDING DEADLINES | |||
10/22/2002 | 078 - ME: Case On Dismissal Calendar | 10/22/2002 | |
10/8/2002 | NOS - Notice Of Settlement | 12/5/2002 | |
10/7/2002 | ODI - Order Of Dismissal | 12/12/2002 | |
NOTE: OF GILBERT PLUMBINS THIRD PARTY COMPLAINT AGAINST UPONOR WIRSBO | |||
10/3/2002 | MOT - Motion | 11/15/2002 | |
NOTE: TO ENFORCE SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT | |||
9/25/2002 | 066 - ME: Case Reassigned | 9/25/2002 | |
9/20/2002 | 066 - ME: Case Reassigned | 9/20/2002 | |
9/12/2002 | SFD - Stipulation For Dismissal | 11/21/2002 | |
NOTE: GILBERT PLUMBINGS THIRD PARTY COMPLAINT AGAINST UPNOR WIRSBO | |||
9/2/2002 | 019 - ME: Ruling | 9/2/2002 | |
8/29/2002 | ORD - Order | 11/16/2002 | |
NOTE: RE: SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL | |||
8/29/2002 | ORD - Order | 11/19/2002 | |
NOTE: GRANTING PLAINTIFFS MOTION TO AMEND THE COMPLAINT | |||
8/27/2002 | NOT - Notice | 11/14/2002 | |
NOTE: OF SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL | |||
8/23/2002 | 098 - ME: Substitution Of Counsel | 8/23/2002 | |
8/21/2002 | 089 - ME: Trial Setting | 8/21/2002 | |
8/21/2002 | 029 - ME: Status Conference | 8/21/2002 | |
7/30/2002 | MOT - Motion | 9/26/2002 | |
NOTE: TO AMEND THE COMPLAINT | |||
6/21/2002 | NAR - Notice Of Appearance | 7/2/2002 | Plaintiff(1) |
NOTE: AND REQUEST FOR NOTICE | |||
6/18/2002 | 029 - ME: Status Conference | 6/18/2002 | |
6/17/2002 | ORD - Order | 6/19/2002 | Third Party Defendant(6) |
NOTE: TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE (TERRENCE E BISHOP) | |||
6/12/2002 | AFS - Affidavit Of Service | 6/14/2002 | Third Party Defendant(6) |
NOTE: P1 SERVED WITH UPONOR WIRSBOR'S ANSWER TO GILBERT PLUMBING COMPANY INC'S; THIRD-PARTY COMPLAINT | |||
6/10/2002 | APL - Application | 6/26/2002 | Third Party Defendant(6) |
NOTE: TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE (TERRENCE E BISHOP) | |||
6/10/2002 | ANS - Answer | 6/11/2002 | Third Party Defendant(6) |
6/10/2002 | ANS - Answer | 6/11/2002 | Third Party Defendant(6) |
NOTE: SEPARATE/ | |||
5/10/2002 | NNF - Not Of Non-Parties At Fault | 6/10/2002 | Third Party Defendant(4) |
5/9/2002 | 029 - ME: Status Conference | 5/9/2002 | |
5/8/2002 | ORD - Order | 5/24/2002 | Defendant(2) |
NOTE: PERMITTING TRIMARK HOMES INC AND TRIMARK BENNETT ESTATES LLC TO AMEND THEIR; ANSWER TO PLAINTIFFS COMPLAINT AND TO AMEND THEIR THIRD PARTY COMPLAINT | |||
5/7/2002 | ANS - Answer | 5/9/2002 | |
NOTE: AMENDED/ | |||
5/7/2002 | AMC - Amended Complaint | 5/9/2002 | Defendant(2) |
NOTE: THIRD PARTY | |||
4/25/2002 | COM - Complaint | 4/29/2002 | Third Party Defendant(4) |
NOTE: THIRD PARTY | |||
4/22/2002 | ORD - Order | 5/16/2002 | Third Party Defendant(4) |
NOTE: GRANTING MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE THIRD-PARTY COMPLAINT | |||
3/25/2002 | MOT - Motion | 4/9/2002 | Third Party Defendant(4) |
NOTE: FOR LEAVE TO FILE A THIRD PARTY COMPLAINT | |||
3/11/2002 | 083 - ME: Conference Reset/Cont | 3/11/2002 | |
3/4/2002 | MCO - Motion To Continue | 3/25/2002 | Defendant(2) |
NOTE: RULE 16 COMPREHENSIVE PRETRIAL CONFERENCE SET FOR MARCH 14 | |||
2/6/2002 | ORD - Order | 2/25/2002 | Third Party Defendant(4) |
NOTE: RE: SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL WITH CONSENT | |||
2/5/2002 | NOT - Notice | 2/22/2002 | Third Party Defendant(4) |
NOTE: OF SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL WITH CONSENT | |||
1/17/2002 | ORD - Order | 1/24/2002 | Plaintiff(1) |
NOTE: TO WITHDRAW AS ATTORNEY OF RECORD WITH CLIENT CONSENT | |||
1/16/2002 | 026 - ME: Pretrial Conference Set | 1/16/2002 | |
1/16/2002 | 099 - ME: Withdrawal Of Counsel | 1/16/2002 | |
1/10/2002 | RES - Response | 1/19/2002 | Defendant(2) |
NOTE: TO PLAS MOTION TO SET AND CERTIFICATE OF READINESS | |||
1/9/2002 | MSE - Motion To Set & Cert/Readiness | 1/19/2002 | Plaintiff(1) |
1/9/2002 | REQ - Request | 1/17/2002 | Plaintiff(1) |
NOTE: FOR RULE 16 SCHEDULING AND LITIGATION MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE | |||
1/9/2002 | MOT - Motion | 1/18/2002 | Plaintiff(1) |
NOTE: TO WITHDRAW AS ATTORNEY OF RECORD WITH CLIENT CONSENT | |||
9/4/2001 | 311 - ME: 150 Day Minute Entry | 9/4/2001 | |
7/18/2001 | ANS - Answer | 7/19/2001 | Third Party Defendant(4) |
NOTE: AMENDED | |||
7/17/2001 | ANS - Answer | 7/18/2001 | Third Party Defendant(4) |
7/17/2001 | CCN - Cert Arbitration - Not Subject | 7/27/2001 | Third Party Defendant(4) |
7/17/2001 | NOT - Notice | 7/27/2001 | Third Party Defendant(4) |
NOTE: DEMAND FOR TRIAL BY JURY | |||
7/6/2001 | 070 - ME: Settlement Conference Set | 7/9/2001 | |
6/29/2001 | SUM - Summons | 7/18/2001 | Defendant(2) |
6/28/2001 | AFS - Affidavit Of Service | 7/2/2001 | Plaintiff(1) |
NOTE: P4 SERVED 6-27-2001 | |||
6/28/2001 | AFS - Affidavit Of Service | 7/17/2001 | |
6/13/2001 | REQ - Request | 6/21/2001 | Plaintiff(1) |
NOTE: FOR SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE | |||
5/14/2001 | COM - Complaint | 5/15/2001 | Defendant(2) |
NOTE: THIRD PARTY | |||
5/14/2001 | ANS - Answer | 5/15/2001 | Defendant(2) |
5/14/2001 | CCN - Cert Arbitration - Not Subject | 5/30/2001 | Defendant(2) |
4/10/2001 | AFS - Affidavit Of Service | 4/11/2001 | |
NOTE: P2 SERVED 03-29-01 | |||
4/10/2001 | AFS - Affidavit Of Service | 4/11/2001 | |
NOTE: P3 SERVED 03-27-01 | |||
4/9/2001 | AFS - Affidavit Of Service | 4/10/2001 | |
NOTE: P3 SERVED 03-27-01 | |||
4/9/2001 | SUM - Summons | 4/23/2001 | Plaintiff(1) |
4/9/2001 | SUM - Summons | 4/23/2001 | Plaintiff(1) |
4/9/2001 | AFS - Affidavit Of Service | 4/10/2001 | |
NOTE: P2 SERVED 03-29-01 | |||
3/27/2001 | COM - Complaint | 3/29/2001 | Plaintiff(1) |
3/27/2001 | CCN - Cert Arbitration - Not Subject | 3/29/2001 | Plaintiff(1) |
Case Calendar | ||
---|---|---|
Date | Time | Event |
5/7/2002 | 8:30 | Oral Argument |
6/13/2002 | 9:00 | Status Conference |
8/19/2002 | 9:00 | Status Conference |
3/31/2003 | 9:30 | Trial |
6/4/2003 | 8:45 | Pre-Trial Conference |
6/25/2003 | 9:15 | Pre-Trial Conference |
10/10/2003 | 10:00 | Oral Argument |
11/14/2003 | 10:00 | Pre-Trial Conference |
5/4/2004 | 9:30 | Trial |
Judgments | |||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
There are no judgments on file |