Civil Court Case Information - Case History
« Return to search results
Case Information | |||
---|---|---|---|
Case Number: | CV2001-005125 | Judge: | Fox, Dewain |
File Date: | 3/27/2001 | Location: | Downtown |
Case Type: | Civil |
Party Information | |||
---|---|---|---|
Party Name | Relationship | Sex | Attorney |
William Scott | Plaintiff | Male | Jon Hultgren |
Ingrid Scott | Plaintiff | Female | Jon Hultgren |
Stone Age Design Inc | Defendant | None | Pro Per |
Todd Jostes | Defendant | Male | James Wees |
Cami Jostes | Defendant | Female | James Wees |
Arbitrator | Endorsement Case | Unknown | GEOFFREY STURR |
B B P Concrete Co | Garnishee Defendant | Pro Per |
Case Documents | |||
---|---|---|---|
Filing Date | Description | Docket Date | Filing Party |
1/15/2004 | 314 - ME: Bankruptcy | 1/15/2004 | |
12/31/2003 | NOT - Notice | 1/29/2004 | |
NOTE: RELEASE OPF WRIT OF GARNISHMENT | |||
12/24/2003 | NOB - Notice Of Filing Bankruptcy | 1/30/2004 | |
NOTE: AND EFFECT OF AUTOMATIC STAY | |||
8/4/2003 | APL - Application | 8/25/2003 | |
NOTE: FOR ORDER FOR CONTINUING LIEN | |||
8/4/2003 | OCL - Order Of Continuing Lien | 8/25/2003 | |
7/10/2003 | ANG - Answer Of Garnishee | 7/29/2003 | |
6/27/2003 | AFS - Affidavit Of Service | 7/1/2003 | |
6/27/2003 | WGS - Writ Of Garnishment and Summons | 7/10/2003 | |
NOTE: EARNINGS-CONTINUING LIEN | |||
6/20/2003 | AWG - Application For Writ Of Garnishment | 8/4/2003 | |
5/12/2003 | ORD - Order | 6/23/2003 | |
NOTE: QUASHING CIVIL ARREST WARRANT | |||
5/5/2003 | CAW - Civil Arrest Warrant | 8/15/2003 | |
NOTE: QUASHED 04/28/03 | |||
5/5/2003 | CAW - Civil Arrest Warrant | 8/15/2003 | |
NOTE: QUASHED 04/28/03 | |||
5/5/2003 | CAW - Civil Arrest Warrant | 8/15/2003 | |
NOTE: QUASHED 04/28/03 | |||
5/5/2003 | CAW - Civil Arrest Warrant | 8/15/2003 | |
NOTE: 04/28/03 QUASHED | |||
4/10/2003 | MOT - Motion | 6/12/2003 | |
NOTE: TO QUASH CIVIL ARREST WARRANT | |||
4/9/2003 | RRM - Returned/ReMailed Mail | 4/18/2003 | |
4/1/2003 | 097 - ME:CIVIL Arrest Warrant Issued | 4/1/2003 | |
3/21/2003 | 003 - ME: Hearing Reset | 3/21/2003 | |
2/28/2003 | AFS - Affidavit Of Service | 3/27/2003 | |
2/25/2003 | ORD - Order | 3/31/2003 | |
NOTE: FOR APPEARANCE IN SUPPLEMENTAL PROCEEDINGS | |||
2/25/2003 | AFS - Affidavit Of Service | 4/2/2003 | |
2/7/2003 | PTT - Petition | 2/28/2003 | |
NOTE: IN SUPPORT OF SUPPLEMENTAL PROCEEDINGS | |||
10/3/2002 | CER - Certificate | 12/5/2002 | |
NOTE: OF ATTEMPTED SERVICE | |||
9/24/2002 | PTT - Petition | 11/27/2002 | |
NOTE: IN SUPPORT OF SUPPLEMENTAL PROCEEDINGS | |||
6/24/2002 | 097 - ME:CIVIL Arrest Warrant Issued | 6/24/2002 | |
4/19/2002 | AFS - Affidavit Of Service | 5/3/2002 | Plaintiff(1) |
4/19/2002 | AAS - Affidavit Of Attempted Service | 5/3/2002 | Plaintiff(1) |
4/19/2002 | ORD - Order | 5/3/2002 | Plaintiff(1) |
NOTE: FOR APPEARANCE IN SUPPLEMENTAL PROCEEDINGS | |||
4/5/2002 | PTT - Petition | 4/19/2002 | Plaintiff(1) |
NOTE: IN SUPPORT OF SUPPLEMENTAL PROCEEDINGS | |||
1/15/2002 3:23:00 PM | ARA - Arbitration Award | 1/15/2002 3:23:00 PM | |
NOTE: Posted during iCIS Conversion | |||
1/15/2002 | SOC - Statement Of Costs | 1/23/2002 | Plaintiff(1) |
NOTE: AND NOTICE OF TAXATION | |||
1/15/2002 | AAF - Application For Attorney Fees | 1/23/2002 | Plaintiff(1) |
NOTE: REASONABLENESS | |||
12/17/2001 | NOH - Notice Of Hearing | 1/3/2002 | |
NOTE: ARBITRATION | |||
12/10/2001 | ORD - Order | 12/20/2001 | |
NOTE: RE MOTION FOR JUDGMENT ON THE PLEADINGS | |||
9/7/2001 | 324 - ME: Notice Of Appointment Of Arbitrator | 9/7/2001 | |
9/4/2001 | 311 - ME: 150 Day Minute Entry | 9/4/2001 | |
8/3/2001 | NOT - Notice | 8/10/2001 | Defendant(4) |
NOTE: OF STRIKE | |||
7/27/2001 | 324 - ME: Notice Of Appointment Of Arbitrator | 7/27/2001 | |
7/16/2001 | NOT - Notice | 7/27/2001 | Plaintiff(1) |
NOTE: TO STRIKE | |||
7/10/2001 | MOT - Motion | 7/24/2001 | Plaintiff(1) |
NOTE: FOR JUDGMENT ON THE PLEADINGS | |||
7/6/2001 | 324 - ME: Notice Of Appointment Of Arbitrator | 7/6/2001 | |
6/20/2001 | ANS - Answer | 6/21/2001 | Defendant(4) |
6/14/2001 | ACS - Acceptance Of Service | 6/19/2001 | Plaintiff(1) |
NOTE: P4-5 SERVED 5-25-2001 | |||
4/16/2001 | NOB - Notice Of Filing Bankruptcy | 4/25/2001 | Defendant(3) |
NOTE: AND NOTICE OF AUTOMATIC STAY | |||
4/6/2001 | AFS - Affidavit Of Service | 4/10/2001 | Plaintiff(1) |
NOTE: P3 SERVED 03-28-01 | |||
4/6/2001 | SUM - Summons | 4/17/2001 | Plaintiff(1) |
4/4/2001 | AAS - Affidavit Of Attempted Service | 4/9/2001 | |
4/4/2001 | AAS - Affidavit Of Attempted Service | 4/9/2001 | |
3/27/2001 | COM - Complaint | 4/2/2001 | Plaintiff(1) |
3/27/2001 | CCS - Cerificate Arbitration - Subject To | 4/2/2001 | Plaintiff(1) |
Case Calendar | ||
---|---|---|
Date | Time | Event |
6/11/2002 | 13:30 | Judgment Debtor Exam |
11/5/2002 | 13:30 | Judgment Debtor Exam |
3/18/2003 | 13:30 | Judgment Debtor Exam |
3/25/2003 | 13:30 | Judgment Debtor Exam |
Judgments | |||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Date | (F)or / (A)gainst | Amount | Frequency | Type | Status |
F:William Scott | $262.25 | One Time | Arbitration Award | ||
A: Todd Jostes | |||||
F:William Scott | $700.00 | One Time | Arbitration Award | ||
A: Todd Jostes | |||||
F:William Scott | $18,800.00 | One Time | Arbitration Award | ||
A: Todd Jostes |