Civil Court Case Information - Case History
« Return to search results
Case Information | |||
---|---|---|---|
Case Number: | CV2001-003874 | Judge: | Astrowsky, Brad |
File Date: | 3/6/2001 | Location: | Downtown |
Case Type: | Civil |
Party Information | |||
---|---|---|---|
Party Name | Relationship | Sex | Attorney |
Robert C Westmyer | Plaintiff | Male | MICHAEL PALUMBO |
Rosemary Westmyer | Plaintiff | Female | MICHAEL PALUMBO |
Stone Age Designs Inc | Defendant | None | Pro Per |
Mg And Tj Inc | Defendant | None | James Wees |
Robb & Stucky | Defendant | None | Todd Wiley |
Todd Jostes | Defendant | Male | Pro Per |
Mike George | Defendant | Male | James Wees |
Cami Jostes | Defendant | Female | Pro Per |
Tawny George | Defendant | Female | Pro Per |
Brian Harper | Defendant | Male | Pro Per |
Frontier Insurance Company | Defendant | None | Pro Per |
Contractors Bonding And Insurance Compa | Defendant | None | James Wees |
Case Documents | |||
---|---|---|---|
Filing Date | Description | Docket Date | Filing Party |
6/24/2011 | DEW - Disposition Of Exhibit Worksheet | 6/28/2011 | |
4/4/2011 | RTM - Returned Mail or Returned/ReMailed Mail | 4/6/2011 | |
3/21/2011 | EXH - Exhibit | 3/24/2011 | |
12/24/2003 | NOB - Notice Of Filing Bankruptcy | 1/30/2004 | |
NOTE: AND EFFECT OF AUTHOMATIC STAY | |||
4/9/2003 | ODI - Order Of Dismissal | 6/4/2003 | |
NOTE: WITH PREJUDICE AS TO DEFENDANTS MG & TJ INC AND MICHAEL GEORGE AND TAWNY GEORGE AND CONTRACTORS BONDING AND INSURANCE COMPANY AND JASON LETTERLY AND ROBB & STUCKY ONLY | |||
3/5/2003 | ORD - Order | 5/16/2003 | |
NOTE: DIRECTING PAYMENT OUT OF RESIDENTIAL CONTRACTORS RECOVERY FUND | |||
2/21/2003 | SFD - Stipulation For Dismissal | 9/19/2003 | |
NOTE: WITH PREJUDICE | |||
2/3/2003 | APL - Application | 2/24/2003 | |
NOTE: FOR ORDER DIRECTING PAYMENT OUT OF RESIDENTIAL CONTRACTORS RECOVERY FUND | |||
12/4/2002 | RTM - Returned Mail or Returned/ReMailed Mail | 2/20/2003 | |
12/4/2002 | RTM - Returned Mail or Returned/ReMailed Mail | 2/20/2003 | |
11/13/2002 | LET - Letter | 11/18/2002 | |
11/7/2002 | 019 - ME: Ruling | 11/7/2002 | |
11/4/2002 | JUD - Judgment | 11/19/2002 | |
NOTE: Notice of filing and entry provided to the parties | |||
11/4/2002 | EXW - Exhibits Work Sheet | 12/10/2002 | |
10/18/2002 | ORD - Order | 11/25/2002 | |
NOTE: EXTENDING THIS MATTER ON THE INACTIVE CALENDAR FOR 60 DAYS | |||
10/15/2002 | 020 - ME: Matter Under Advisement | 10/15/2002 | |
10/2/2002 | AFF - Affidavit | 11/20/2002 | |
NOTE: OF ATTORNEYS FEES | |||
10/2/2002 | NOH - Notice Of Hearing | 12/3/2002 | |
10/2/2002 | MOT - Motion | 12/3/2002 | |
NOTE: FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT | |||
10/2/2002 | STA - Statement | 12/3/2002 | |
NOTE: DECLARATION OF MICHAEL R PALUMBO | |||
10/2/2002 | SOC - Statement Of Costs | 12/3/2002 | |
NOTE: AND NOTICE OF TAXATION OF COSTS | |||
9/20/2002 | MCC - Mot/Cont On Inactive Calendar | 11/27/2002 | |
9/3/2002 | AFD - Affidavit On Default | 11/19/2002 | |
NOTE: AGAINST STONE AGE DESIGNS INC | |||
9/3/2002 | NOT - Notice | 11/19/2002 | |
NOTE: OF APPLICATION FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT | |||
9/3/2002 | APL - Application | 11/19/2002 | |
NOTE: FOR DEFAULT AGAINST STONE AGE DESINGS INC | |||
8/21/2002 | 078 - ME: Case On Dismissal Calendar | 8/21/2002 | |
6/12/2002 | NOS - Notice Of Settlement | 6/29/2002 | Plaintiff(1) |
NOTE: AND CONFIRMATION OF DATE FOR PRETRIAL CONFERENCE | |||
5/6/2002 | ANS - Answer | 5/8/2002 | Plaintiff(1) |
5/3/2002 | NSD - Notice of Service Re: 26.1 Disclosure | 5/16/2002 | Defendant(4) |
NOTE: FOURTH SUPPLEMENTAL | |||
4/30/2002 | NOT - Notice | 5/13/2002 | Plaintiff(1) |
NOTE: FINAL LIST OF LAY WITNESSES | |||
4/1/2002 | 005 - ME: Hearing | 4/1/2002 | |
3/28/2002 | AFS - Affidavit Of Service | 4/2/2002 | |
NOTE: P12 SERVED 3-26-2002 | |||
3/28/2002 | AFS - Affidavit Of Service | 4/2/2002 | |
NOTE: P11 SERVED 3-26-2002 | |||
3/28/2002 | SUM - Summons | 4/17/2002 | Plaintiff(1) |
NOTE: ALIAS | |||
3/28/2002 | SUM - Summons | 4/17/2002 | Plaintiff(1) |
NOTE: ALIAS | |||
3/25/2002 | AMC - Amended Complaint | 3/27/2002 | Plaintiff(1) |
NOTE: FIRST/ | |||
3/25/2002 | 056 - ME: Hearing Set | 3/25/2002 | |
3/20/2002 | ORD - Order | 4/9/2002 | Plaintiff(1) |
NOTE: PLAINTIFFS SHALL FILE THEIR FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT WITHIN 10 DAYS OF THIS ORDER | |||
3/18/2002 | NOT - Notice | 4/3/2002 | Plaintiff(1) |
NOTE: OF NON-COMPLIANCE AND REQUEST FOR ACCELERATED DISPOSITION | |||
3/18/2002 | STP - Stipulation | 4/3/2002 | Plaintiff(1) |
NOTE: JOINT - TO PERMIT PLAINTIFFS TO FILE FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT | |||
2/28/2002 | 026 - ME: Pretrial Conference Set | 2/28/2002 | |
2/26/2002 11:00:00 AM | JUD - Judgment | 2/26/2002 11:00:00 AM | |
NOTE: Posted during iCIS Conversion | |||
2/19/2002 | MEM - Memorandum | 3/12/2002 | Plaintiff(1) |
NOTE: JOINT RULE 16 CONFERENCE | |||
2/15/2002 | REL - Reply | 3/12/2002 | Defendant(7) |
NOTE: IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO DISMISS/MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT FOR DEFENDANT; MICHAEL GEORGE | |||
1/31/2002 | RES - Response | 2/13/2002 | Plaintiff(1) |
NOTE: TO MOTION TO DISMISS/MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OF DEFS GEORGE | |||
1/31/2002 | SOF - Statement Of Facts | 2/19/2002 | Plaintiff(1) |
NOTE: SEPARATE/ IN SUPPORT OF RESPONSE TO MOITON TO DISMISS MOITON FOR SUMMARY; JUDGMENT OF DEF GEORGE | |||
1/25/2002 | WSS - Waiver Of Service Of Summons | 1/29/2002 | Plaintiff(1) |
NOTE: P3 SERVED 01-23-2002 | |||
1/22/2002 | STA - Statement | 1/30/2002 | Plaintiff(1) |
NOTE: SEPARATE - OF COUNSEL RE: EFFORTS TO RESOLVE DISCOVERY DISPUTE | |||
1/22/2002 | MOT - Motion | 2/15/2002 | Plaintiff(1) |
NOTE: TO STRIKE RESPONSIVE PLEADING OF TODD JOSTES AND FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT | |||
1/15/2002 | 026 - ME: Pretrial Conference Set | 1/15/2002 | |
1/15/2002 | NOT - Notice | 1/23/2002 | Plaintiff(1) |
NOTE: OF LODGING PROPOSED FORM OF JUDGMENT | |||
1/10/2002 | 094 - ME: Oral Argument Set | 1/10/2002 | |
12/17/2001 | REQ - Request | 1/2/2002 | Plaintiff(1) |
NOTE: FOR RULE 16 SCHEDULING CONFERENCE | |||
12/13/2001 | NSD - Notice of Service Re: 26.1 Disclosure | 1/2/2002 | Defendant(4) |
NOTE: 3RD SUPPLEMENT | |||
12/12/2001 | 019 - ME: Ruling | 12/12/2001 | |
12/5/2001 | REQ - Request | 12/19/2001 | Plaintiff(1) |
NOTE: FOR RULE 16 PRETRIAL CONFERENCE | |||
12/4/2001 | NOT - Notice | 12/18/2001 | Defendant(4) |
NOTE: OF SERVICE OF DEF MG&TJ INC AND MICHAEL D GEORGES SECOND SUPPLEMENTAL; DISCLOSURE STATEMENT | |||
12/3/2001 | REL - Reply | 12/17/2001 | Defendant(4) |
NOTE: IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER | |||
11/29/2001 | REQ - Request | 12/11/2001 | Plaintiff(1) |
NOTE: FOR SUMMARY DISPOSITION OF MOTION TO DISMISS | |||
11/26/2001 | REL - Reply | 12/12/2001 | Plaintiff(1) |
NOTE: IN SUPPORT OF PLAS MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF RULE 56(F) CONTINUANCE | |||
11/20/2001 | RES - Response | 12/5/2001 | Plaintiff(1) |
NOTE: TO DEF MICHAEL GEORGE'S MOTION FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER | |||
11/16/2001 | RES - Response | 11/28/2001 | Defendant(4) |
NOTE: TO MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF RULE 56(F) CONTINUANCE | |||
11/7/2001 | MTD - Motion To Dismiss | 11/21/2001 | Plaintiff(1) |
11/7/2001 | AFS - Affidavit Of Service | 11/21/2001 | |
11/7/2001 | AFS - Affidavit Of Service | 11/21/2001 | |
11/7/2001 | SDT - Subpoena Duces Tecum | 11/21/2001 | Plaintiff(1) |
11/7/2001 | SDT - Subpoena Duces Tecum | 11/21/2001 | Plaintiff(1) |
11/6/2001 | MOT - Motion | 11/26/2001 | Defendant(4) |
NOTE: FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER | |||
11/2/2001 | NSD - Notice of Service Re: 26.1 Disclosure | 11/21/2001 | Defendant(3) |
NOTE: FIRST SUPPLEMENTAL | |||
10/31/2001 | MOT - Motion | 11/21/2001 | Plaintiff(1) |
NOTE: FOR EXTENSION OF RULE 56(F) CONTINUANCE OF DEADLINE FOR RESPONDING TO MOTIONS; FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT/DISMISSAL OF DEFS GEORGE AND JOSTES | |||
10/12/2001 | 021 - ME: Nunc Pro Tunc Order | 10/12/2001 | |
10/3/2001 | 094 - ME: Oral Argument Set | 10/3/2001 | |
9/28/2001 | NSD - Notice of Service Re: 26.1 Disclosure | 10/11/2001 | Plaintiff(1) |
NOTE: INITIAL | |||
9/10/2001 | RRM - Returned/ReMailed Mail | 9/19/2001 | |
9/10/2001 | RRM - Returned/ReMailed Mail | 9/19/2001 | |
9/7/2001 | RRM - Returned/ReMailed Mail | 9/19/2001 | |
8/28/2001 | 053 - ME: Case Consolidation | 8/28/2001 | |
NOTE: CV2001-004576 CONSOLIDATED INTO CV2001-003874 | |||
8/28/2001 | RRM - Returned/ReMailed Mail | 8/31/2001 | |
8/27/2001 | 028 - ME: Status Conference Set | 8/27/2001 | |
8/22/2001 | 028 - ME: Status Conference Set | 8/22/2001 | |
8/14/2001 | 311 - ME: 150 Day Minute Entry | 8/14/2001 | |
8/14/2001 | RES - Response | 8/21/2001 | Plaintiff(1) |
NOTE: TO DEFS JOSTES MOTION TO DISMISS | |||
8/13/2001 | ORD - Order | 8/20/2001 | Plaintiff(1) |
NOTE: THAT PLAINTIFF SHALL HAVE UNTIL SEPTEMBER 16, 2001 TO EFFECT SERVICE ON; DEFENDANT TODD JOSTES AND JANE DOE JOSTES | |||
8/3/2001 | ANS - Answer | 8/6/2001 | Defendant(6) |
NOTE: MOTION TO DISMISS | |||
7/27/2001 | AFF - Affidavit | 8/7/2001 | Plaintiff(1) |
NOTE: OF COMPLIANCE WITH RULE 37(A)(2)(C) ARCP | |||
7/27/2001 | MOT - Motion | 8/9/2001 | Plaintiff(1) |
NOTE: FOR CONTINUANCE | |||
7/26/2001 | ADE - Application For Default | 8/3/2001 | Plaintiff(1) |
7/26/2001 | AFD - Affidavit On Default | 8/3/2001 | Plaintiff(1) |
7/26/2001 | NOT - Notice | 8/3/2001 | Plaintiff(1) |
NOTE: OF APPLICATION FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT AGAINST TODD JOSTES AND JANE DOE JOSTES | |||
7/17/2001 | ANS - Answer | 7/18/2001 | Defendant(5) |
7/17/2001 | NOT - Notice | 7/27/2001 | Defendant(5) |
NOTE: DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL | |||
7/17/2001 | CAA - Cert Of Agreement/Arbitration | 7/27/2001 | Defendant(5) |
7/10/2001 | SUM - Summons | 7/25/2001 | Plaintiff(1) |
7/9/2001 | AFS - Affidavit Of Service | 7/17/2001 | |
NOTE: P6 SERVED 07-01-01 | |||
7/6/2001 | 016 - ME: Ext/Time/Filing Granted | 7/6/2001 | |
6/29/2001 | ORD - Order | 7/17/2001 | Plaintiff(1) |
NOTE: EXTEND SERVICE 09-16-01 | |||
6/29/2001 | STA - Statement | 7/19/2001 | Plaintiff(1) |
NOTE: RE EXPERT OPINION TESTIMONY | |||
6/28/2001 | 066 - ME: Case Reassigned | 6/28/2001 | |
6/28/2001 | MTD - Motion To Dismiss | 7/21/2001 | Plaintiff(1) |
NOTE: FOR DEF MICHAEL GEORGE | |||
6/22/2001 | ANS - Answer | 6/25/2001 | Defendant(4) |
6/22/2001 | CCN - Cert Arbitration - Not Subject | 7/11/2001 | Defendant(4) |
6/21/2001 | ANS - Answer | 6/22/2001 | Defendant(4) |
NOTE: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE | |||
6/21/2001 | AFD - Affidavit On Default | 7/11/2001 | Plaintiff(1) |
6/21/2001 | NOT - Notice | 7/11/2001 | Plaintiff(1) |
NOTE: OF APPLICATION FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT | |||
6/21/2001 | ADE - Application For Default | 7/11/2001 | Plaintiff(1) |
6/20/2001 | MXS - Motion To Extend Time For Service | 7/9/2001 | Plaintiff(1) |
6/5/2001 | 001 - ME: Disqualification | 6/5/2001 | |
6/5/2001 | WSS - Waiver Of Service Of Summons | 6/14/2001 | Plaintiff(1) |
NOTE: P4 SERVED 05-25-01 | |||
5/22/2001 | AFS - Affidavit Of Service | 5/25/2001 | Plaintiff(1) |
NOTE: P7 SERVED 5-22-01 | |||
5/11/2001 | AFS - Affidavit Of Service | 5/15/2001 | Plaintiff(1) |
NOTE: P6 SERVED 5-10-01 | |||
5/11/2001 | AFS - Affidavit Of Service | 5/15/2001 | Plaintiff(1) |
NOTE: P7 SERVED 5-10-01 | |||
5/11/2001 | SUM - Summons | 5/30/2001 | Plaintiff(1) |
5/11/2001 | SUM - Summons | 5/30/2001 | Plaintiff(1) |
5/9/2001 | WSS - Waiver Of Service Of Summons | 5/10/2001 | Plaintiff(1) |
NOTE: P5 SERVED 3-14-2001 | |||
3/6/2001 | COM - Complaint | 3/8/2001 | Plaintiff(1) |
3/6/2001 | CCN - Cert Arbitration - Not Subject | 3/8/2001 | Plaintiff(1) |
Case Calendar | ||
---|---|---|
Date | Time | Event |
8/22/2001 | 8:30 | Oral Argument |
8/22/2001 | 9:00 | Telephonic Conference |
10/1/2001 | 9:15 | Status Conference |
2/26/2002 | 9:15 | Oral Argument |
3/27/2002 | 9:00 | Oral Argument |
8/16/2002 | 10:15 | Pre-Trial Conference |
10/11/2002 | 10:30 | Default Hearing |
Judgments | |||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Date | (F)or / (A)gainst | Amount | Frequency | Type | Status |
11/4/2002 | F:Robert C Westmyer | $41,363.00 | One Time | Attorney Fee | |
F:Rosemary Westmyer | |||||
A: Stone Age Designs Inc | |||||
A: Todd Jostes | |||||
A: Cami Jostes | |||||
11/4/2002 | F:Robert C Westmyer | $2,098.80 | One Time | Costs | |
F:Rosemary Westmyer | |||||
A: Stone Age Designs Inc | |||||
A: Todd Jostes | |||||
A: Cami Jostes | |||||
11/4/2002 | F:Robert C Westmyer | $214,249.31 | One Time | Principal | |
F:Rosemary Westmyer | |||||
A: Stone Age Designs Inc | |||||
A: Todd Jostes | |||||
A: Cami Jostes | |||||
F:Robert C Westmyer | $0.00 | Judgment Only | |||
A: Mg And Tj Inc |