« Return to search results
Case Information
Case Number:
CV2001-000735
Judge:
McCoy, M. Scott
File Date:
1/12/2001
Location:
Downtown
Case Type:
Civil
Party Information
Party Name
Relationship
Sex
Attorney
Party Name
Antoinette Hemphill
Relationship
Plaintiff
Sex
Female
Attorney
John Wilborn
Party Name
Dominique Gray
Relationship
In The Matter Of (IMO)
Sex
Female
Attorney
Pro Per
Party Name
Titan Indemnity Company
Relationship
Defendant
Sex
None
Attorney
Joseph Watkins
Party Name
Titan Insurance Company
Relationship
Defendant
Sex
None
Attorney
Joseph Watkins
Party Name
Titan Holdings
Relationship
Defendant
Sex
None
Attorney
Joseph Watkins
Case Documents
Filing Date
Description
Docket Date
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/4/2002
Description
ODI - Order Of Dismissal
Docket Date
7/2/2002
Filing Party
In The Matter Of (IMO)(2)
NOTE:
WITH PREJUDICE
Filing Date
5/24/2002
Description
SFD - Stipulation For Dismissal
Docket Date
6/19/2002
Filing Party
Defendant(3)
NOTE:
WITH PREJUDICE
Filing Date
4/10/2002
Description
NOT - Notice
Docket Date
4/22/2002
Filing Party
Defendant(3)
NOTE:
SUPPLEMENTAL PLEADING IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANTS MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT
Filing Date
4/10/2002
Description
NOT - Notice
Docket Date
4/22/2002
Filing Party
Defendant(3)
NOTE:
OF COMPLIANCE PER COURT ORDER
Filing Date
3/21/2002
Description
RQH - Request For Hearing
Docket Date
4/4/2002
Filing Party
Defendant(3)
NOTE:
EXPEDITED ON MOTION FOR DISCOVERY SANCTIONS
Filing Date
3/21/2002
Description
ASR - Affidavit in Support of Attorney Fees
Docket Date
4/4/2002
Filing Party
Defendant(3)
Filing Date
3/21/2002
Description
MOT - Motion
Docket Date
4/4/2002
Filing Party
Defendant(3)
NOTE:
FOR DISCOVERY SANCTIONS
Filing Date
3/21/2002
Description
ORD - Order
Docket Date
4/23/2002
Filing Party
Defendant(3)
NOTE:
THAT ANTOINETTE HEMPHILL APPEAR IN ARIZONA FOR A DEPOSITION WITHIN 45 DAYS
Filing Date
2/7/2002
Description
019 - ME: Ruling
Docket Date
2/7/2002
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/18/2002
Description
094 - ME: Oral Argument Set
Docket Date
1/18/2002
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/16/2002
Description
REL - Reply
Docket Date
1/24/2002
Filing Party
Defendant(3)
NOTE:
IN SUPPORT OF MOITON FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT AND OPPOSITION TO REQUEST FOR ADDI-; TIONAL DISCOVERY
Filing Date
1/15/2002
Description
MEM - Memorandum
Docket Date
1/23/2002
Filing Party
Plaintiff(1)
NOTE:
JOINT RULE 16 ARCP/
Filing Date
1/14/2002
Description
REQ - Request
Docket Date
1/23/2002
Filing Party
Defendant(3)
NOTE:
TO APPEAR TELEPHONICALLY
Filing Date
1/3/2002
Description
REL - Reply
Docket Date
1/15/2002
Filing Party
Plaintiff(1)
NOTE:
TO HER MOTION TO COMPEL
Filing Date
12/12/2001
Description
OBJ - Objection/Opposition.
Docket Date
12/19/2001
Filing Party
Defendant(3)
NOTE:
TO MOTION TO COMPEL
Filing Date
12/11/2001
Description
SOF - Statement Of Facts
Docket Date
12/19/2001
Filing Party
Plaintiff(1)
NOTE:
SEPARATE - IN SUPPORT OF PLAS RESPONSE TO MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT
Filing Date
12/11/2001
Description
RES - Response
Docket Date
12/20/2001
Filing Party
Plaintiff(1)
NOTE:
TO MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT AND RULE 56(F) AFFIDAVIT
Filing Date
11/27/2001
Description
ORD - Order
Docket Date
12/14/2001
Filing Party
NOTE:
CONTINUING RULE 16 SCHEDULING CONFERENCE
Filing Date
11/20/2001
Description
MSJ - Motion For Summary Judgment
Docket Date
12/7/2001
Filing Party
Defendant(3)
Filing Date
11/20/2001
Description
SOF - Statement Of Facts
Docket Date
12/7/2001
Filing Party
Defendant(3)
NOTE:
IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT
Filing Date
11/13/2001
Description
MCO - Motion To Continue
Docket Date
11/29/2001
Filing Party
Plaintiff(1)
NOTE:
RULE 16 SCHEDULING CONFERENCE
Filing Date
11/7/2001
Description
MOT - Motion
Docket Date
11/27/2001
Filing Party
Plaintiff(1)
NOTE:
TO COMPEL
Filing Date
8/27/2001
Description
089 - ME: Trial Setting
Docket Date
8/27/2001
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/3/2001
Description
RES - Response
Docket Date
8/10/2001
Filing Party
Plaintiff(1)
NOTE:
AND OBJECTION TO DEFS MOTION TO SET
Filing Date
7/27/2001
Description
MSE - Motion To Set & Cert/Readiness
Docket Date
8/9/2001
Filing Party
Defendant(3)
Filing Date
7/20/2001
Description
REQ - Request
Docket Date
7/31/2001
Filing Party
Defendant(3)
NOTE:
FOR RULE 16 PRETRIAL CONFERENCE
Filing Date
6/26/2001
Description
311 - ME: 150 Day Minute Entry
Docket Date
6/26/2001
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/26/2001
Description
AFS - Affidavit Of Service
Docket Date
3/27/2001
Filing Party
Plaintiff(1)
NOTE:
P4 SERVED 3-20-01
Filing Date
3/26/2001
Description
SUM - Summons
Docket Date
4/9/2001
Filing Party
Plaintiff(1)
Filing Date
2/26/2001
Description
ANS - Answer
Docket Date
2/28/2001
Filing Party
Defendant(3)
Filing Date
2/26/2001
Description
NOT - Notice
Docket Date
3/3/2001
Filing Party
Defendant(3)
NOTE:
OF SERVICE OF OFFER OF JUDGMENT
Filing Date
2/7/2001
Description
AFS - Affidavit Of Service
Docket Date
2/13/2001
Filing Party
Plaintiff(1)
NOTE:
P3 SERVED 02-05-2001
Filing Date
2/7/2001
Description
SUM - Summons
Docket Date
2/15/2001
Filing Party
Plaintiff(1)
Filing Date
1/12/2001
Description
COM - Complaint
Docket Date
1/17/2001
Filing Party
Plaintiff(1)
Filing Date
1/12/2001
Description
CCN - Cert Arbitration - Not Subject
Docket Date
1/17/2001
Filing Party
Plaintiff(1)
Filing Date
1/12/2001
Description
NOT - Notice
Docket Date
1/17/2001
Filing Party
Plaintiff(1)
NOTE:
DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL
Case Calendar
Date
Time
Event
Date
1/16/2002
Time
8:30
Event
Pre-Trial Conference
Date
2/5/2002
Time
8:30
Event
Telephonic Conference
Judgments
Date
(F)or / (A)gainst
Amount
Frequency
Type
Status
No records found.