« Return to search results
Case Information
Case Number:
CV2000-011684
Judge:
Herrod, Michael
File Date:
6/21/2000
Location:
Downtown
Case Type:
Civil
Party Information
Party Name
Relationship
Sex
Attorney
Party Name
Dana M Hinderberger
Relationship
Plaintiff
Sex
Female
Attorney
Robert Bohm
Party Name
Wayne B Hemphill
Relationship
Defendant
Sex
Male
Attorney
Pro Per
Party Name
Lois Hemphill
Relationship
Defendant
Sex
Female
Attorney
Pro Per
Case Documents
Filing Date
Description
Docket Date
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/16/2000
Description
NDI - Notice Of Dismissal
Docket Date
8/21/2000
Filing Party
Plaintiff(1)
NOTE:
VOLUNTARY - WITH PREJUDICE
Filing Date
7/28/2000
Description
AFS - Affidavit Of Service
Docket Date
8/1/2000
Filing Party
NOTE:
P2 SERVED 06-11-2000
Filing Date
7/28/2000
Description
AFS - Affidavit Of Service
Docket Date
8/1/2000
Filing Party
NOTE:
P3 SERVED 06-11-2000
Filing Date
7/28/2000
Description
SUM - Summons
Docket Date
8/2/2000
Filing Party
Plaintiff(1)
Filing Date
7/28/2000
Description
SUM - Summons
Docket Date
8/2/2000
Filing Party
Plaintiff(1)
Filing Date
6/21/2000
Description
COM - Complaint
Docket Date
6/23/2000
Filing Party
Plaintiff(1)
Filing Date
6/21/2000
Description
CCS - Cerificate Arbitration - Subject To
Docket Date
6/23/2000
Filing Party
Plaintiff(1)
Case Calendar
There are no calendar events on file
Judgments
Date
(F)or / (A)gainst
Amount
Frequency
Type
Status
No records found.