Civil Court Case Information - Case History
« Return to search results
Case Information | |||
---|---|---|---|
Case Number: | CV2000-009272 | Judge: | Agne, Sara |
File Date: | 5/16/2000 | Location: | Downtown |
Case Type: | Civil |
Party Information | |||
---|---|---|---|
Party Name | Relationship | Sex | Attorney |
Interwest Distributing Corporation | Plaintiff | None | Jeffrey Levinson |
Stone Age Design Inc | Defendant | None | James Wees |
Todd Jostes | Defendant | Male | James Wees |
Arbitrator | Endorsement Case | Unknown | Leslie Coulson |
Case Documents | |||
---|---|---|---|
Filing Date | Description | Docket Date | Filing Party |
7/23/2001 | 042 - ME: Case Dismissed - Full | 7/23/2001 | |
1/22/2001 | 314 - ME: Bankruptcy | 1/24/2001 | |
1/16/2001 | NOB - Notice Of Filing Bankruptcy | 1/27/2001 | Defendant(2) |
11/9/2000 12:52:00 PM | ARA - Arbitration Award | 11/9/2000 12:52:00 PM | |
NOTE: Posted during iCIS Conversion | |||
11/9/2000 | AAP - Arb Award Received & Pending | 11/20/2000 | |
10/27/2000 | ASR - Affidavit in Support of Attorney Fees | 11/2/2000 | Plaintiff(1) |
NOTE: BENJAMIN E HALLS/ | |||
10/27/2000 | AAF - Application For Attorney Fees | 11/2/2000 | Plaintiff(1) |
NOTE: AND COSTS | |||
10/24/2000 | 311 - ME: 150 Day Minute Entry | 10/24/2000 | |
10/13/2000 | NDN - Notice Of Decision of Arbitrator | 10/23/2000 | Endorsement Case(4) |
NOTE: OF ARBITRATOR | |||
9/26/2000 | REL - Reply | 10/4/2000 | Plaintiff(1) |
NOTE: IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT AND RESPONSE TO CROSS-MOTION | |||
9/20/2000 | RES - Response | 9/29/2000 | Defendant(2) |
NOTE: TO PLAS MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT AND CROSS-MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT | |||
9/20/2000 | RES - Response | 9/29/2000 | Defendant(2) |
NOTE: TO PLAS STATEMENT OF FACTS AND ADDITIONAL FACTS | |||
9/1/2000 | NOT - Notice | 9/14/2000 | |
NOTE: ORDER | |||
8/4/2000 | MSJ - Motion For Summary Judgment | 8/9/2000 | Plaintiff(1) |
8/4/2000 | SOF - Statement Of Facts | 8/9/2000 | Plaintiff(1) |
NOTE: SEPARATE/ IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT | |||
7/5/2000 | ANS - Answer | 7/6/2000 | Defendant(2) |
7/5/2000 | CCS - Cerificate Arbitration - Subject To | 7/7/2000 | Defendant(2) |
6/27/2000 | ADE - Application For Default | 7/1/2000 | Plaintiff(1) |
6/27/2000 | AFD - Affidavit On Default | 7/1/2000 | Plaintiff(1) |
6/19/2000 | AFS - Affidavit Of Service | 6/20/2000 | Plaintiff(1) |
NOTE: P3 SERVED 6-15-2000 | |||
6/19/2000 | SUM - Summons | 6/22/2000 | Plaintiff(1) |
6/16/2000 | 324 - ME: Notice Of Appointment Of Arbitrator | 6/16/2000 | |
5/23/2000 | AFS - Affidavit Of Service | 5/24/2000 | Plaintiff(1) |
NOTE: P2 SERVED 05-19-2000 | |||
5/23/2000 | SUM - Summons | 6/9/2000 | Plaintiff(1) |
5/22/2000 | ANS - Answer | 5/24/2000 | Defendant(2) |
NOTE: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE | |||
5/16/2000 | COM - Complaint | 5/18/2000 | Plaintiff(1) |
5/16/2000 | CCS - Cerificate Arbitration - Subject To | 5/18/2000 | Plaintiff(1) |
Case Calendar | ||
---|---|---|
There are no calendar events on file |
Judgments | |||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Date | (F)or / (A)gainst | Amount | Frequency | Type | Status |
F:Interwest Distributing Corporation | $324.00 | One Time | Arbitration Award | ||
A: Stone Age Design Inc | |||||
F:Interwest Distributing Corporation | $1,977.00 | One Time | Arbitration Award | ||
A: Stone Age Design Inc | |||||
F:Interwest Distributing Corporation | $16,140.97 | One Time | Arbitration Award | ||
A: Stone Age Design Inc |