« Return to search results
Case Information
Case Number:
CV2000-000151
Judge:
Warner, Randall
File Date:
1/4/2000
Location:
Downtown
Case Type:
Civil
Party Information
Party Name
Relationship
Sex
Attorney
Party Name
Michael P Mullen
Relationship
Plaintiff
Sex
Male
Attorney
Jack Hirsch
Party Name
David A Hemphill
Relationship
Defendant
Sex
Male
Attorney
Dorothy Paine
Party Name
Arbitrator
Relationship
Endorsement Case
Sex
Unknown
Attorney
Robert Neville
Case Documents
Filing Date
Description
Docket Date
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/16/2000
Description
SFD - Stipulation For Dismissal
Docket Date
6/21/2000
Filing Party
Defendant(2)
NOTE:
WITH PREJUDICE
Filing Date
6/16/2000
Description
ODI - Order Of Dismissal
Docket Date
6/21/2000
Filing Party
Defendant(2)
NOTE:
WITH PREJUDICE
Filing Date
6/13/2000
Description
311 - ME: 150 Day Minute Entry
Docket Date
6/13/2000
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/10/2000
Description
NOH - Notice Of Hearing
Docket Date
4/17/2000
Filing Party
NOTE:
ARBITRATION
Filing Date
4/6/2000
Description
APL - Application
Docket Date
4/12/2000
Filing Party
Defendant(2)
NOTE:
FOR COURT REPORTER AT ARBITRATION HEARING
Filing Date
2/11/2000
Description
324 - ME: Notice Of Appointment Of Arbitrator
Docket Date
2/11/2000
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/27/2000
Description
ANS - Answer
Docket Date
1/28/2000
Filing Party
Defendant(2)
Filing Date
1/27/2000
Description
CCS - Cerificate Arbitration - Subject To
Docket Date
2/7/2000
Filing Party
Defendant(2)
Filing Date
1/13/2000
Description
AFS - Affidavit Of Service
Docket Date
1/18/2000
Filing Party
Plaintiff(1)
NOTE:
JANE DOE HEMPHILL SERVED 1-8-2000
Filing Date
1/13/2000
Description
AFS - Affidavit Of Service
Docket Date
1/18/2000
Filing Party
Plaintiff(1)
NOTE:
P2 SERVED 1-8-2000
Filing Date
1/13/2000
Description
SUM - Summons
Docket Date
1/25/2000
Filing Party
Plaintiff(1)
Filing Date
1/4/2000
Description
COM - Complaint
Docket Date
1/6/2000
Filing Party
Plaintiff(1)
Filing Date
1/4/2000
Description
CCS - Cerificate Arbitration - Subject To
Docket Date
1/6/2000
Filing Party
Plaintiff(1)
Case Calendar
There are no calendar events on file
Judgments
Date
(F)or / (A)gainst
Amount
Frequency
Type
Status
No records found.