« Return to search results
Case Information
Case Number:
CV1999-092354
Judge:
Driggs, Adam
File Date:
9/3/1999
Location:
Southeast
Case Type:
Civil
Party Information
Party Name
Relationship
Sex
Attorney
Party Name
Antoinett L Hemphill
Relationship
Plaintiff
Sex
Female
Attorney
Pro Per
Party Name
J W Reidhead
Relationship
Defendant
Sex
Male
Attorney
Pro Per
Party Name
Melissa A Reidhead
Relationship
Defendant
Sex
Female
Attorney
Pro Per
Party Name
Omega Financial Of The Southwest Inc
Relationship
Defendant
Sex
None
Attorney
Elliot Isaac
Party Name
Arbitrator
Relationship
Endorsement Case
Sex
Unknown
Attorney
Bobbi Kiese
Case Documents
Filing Date
Description
Docket Date
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/7/2000 12:35:00 PM
Description
ARA - Arbitration Award
Docket Date
6/7/2000 12:35:00 PM
Filing Party
NOTE:
Posted during iCIS Conversion
Filing Date
5/10/2000
Description
NDN - Notice Of Decision of Arbitrator
Docket Date
7/17/2000
Filing Party
Endorsement Case(5)
NOTE:
OF ARBITRATOR
Filing Date
5/9/2000
Description
SOC - Statement Of Costs
Docket Date
5/16/2000
Filing Party
Defendant(4)
NOTE:
VERIFIED
Filing Date
4/14/2000
Description
ORD - Order
Docket Date
4/27/2000
Filing Party
NOTE:
DENIAL OF APPLICATION FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT
Filing Date
4/5/2000
Description
OBJ - Objection/Opposition.
Docket Date
4/6/2000
Filing Party
Plaintiff(1)
NOTE:
TO FINAL JUDGMENT ON REIDHEADS AND RENEWAL FOR COMPLAINT AGAINST REIDHEADS
Filing Date
3/31/2000
Description
RES - Response
Docket Date
4/4/2000
Filing Party
Plaintiff(1)
NOTE:
TO COUNTERCLAIM BY P4
Filing Date
3/27/2000
Description
ADE - Application For Default
Docket Date
4/3/2000
Filing Party
Defendant(4)
Filing Date
3/27/2000
Description
AFD - Affidavit On Default
Docket Date
4/3/2000
Filing Party
Defendant(4)
Filing Date
3/27/2000
Description
NOT - Notice
Docket Date
4/3/2000
Filing Party
Defendant(4)
NOTE:
ENTRY OF DEFAULT/NOT SIGNED
Filing Date
3/27/2000
Description
NOT - Notice
Docket Date
4/3/2000
Filing Party
Defendant(4)
NOTE:
OF LODGING FORM OF ORDER
Filing Date
2/28/2000
Description
NOH - Notice Of Hearing
Docket Date
3/3/2000
Filing Party
NOTE:
ARBITRATION
Filing Date
2/25/2000
Description
NOT - Notice
Docket Date
3/2/2000
Filing Party
Defendant(4)
NOTE:
OF FILING VERIFICATION
Filing Date
2/15/2000
Description
311 - ME: 150 Day Minute Entry
Docket Date
2/15/2000
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/27/2000
Description
023 - ME: Order Entered By Court
Docket Date
2/1/2000
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/21/2000
Description
023 - ME: Order Entered By Court
Docket Date
1/27/2000
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/14/2000
Description
NOT - Notice
Docket Date
1/19/2000
Filing Party
Plaintiff(1)
NOTE:
SUPPLEMENT TO P1 MOTION FOR RULE 60 RELIEF
Filing Date
1/10/2000
Description
RES - Response
Docket Date
1/13/2000
Filing Party
Defendant(4)
NOTE:
TO PLAS RULE 60 MOTION
Filing Date
1/5/2000
Description
REP - Report
Docket Date
1/6/2000
Filing Party
Plaintiff(1)
NOTE:
RULE 60 RELIEF FROM JUDGMENT
Filing Date
12/30/1999
Description
324 - ME: Notice Of Appointment Of Arbitrator
Docket Date
12/30/1999
Filing Party
Filing Date
12/21/1999
Description
REQ - Request
Docket Date
12/28/1999
Filing Party
Defendant(4)
NOTE:
FOR RULE 54(B) LANGUAGE
Filing Date
12/13/1999
Description
023 - ME: Order Entered By Court
Docket Date
12/15/1999
Filing Party
Filing Date
12/8/1999
Description
RES - Response
Docket Date
12/9/1999
Filing Party
Plaintiff(1)
NOTE:
TO MOTION FOR SUMMARY ADJUDICATION OF MOTION TO DISMISS
Filing Date
12/8/1999
Description
RES - Response
Docket Date
12/9/1999
Filing Party
Plaintiff(1)
NOTE:
TO MOTION TO DISMISS AGAINST P2-3
Filing Date
12/8/1999
Description
MSE - Motion To Set & Cert/Readiness
Docket Date
12/13/1999
Filing Party
Plaintiff(1)
NOTE:
FOR TRIAL AND/OR ARBITRATION
Filing Date
12/8/1999
Description
MOT - Motion
Docket Date
12/15/1999
Filing Party
Defendant(2)
NOTE:
TO STRIKE PLAS MOTION TO SET
Filing Date
11/22/1999
Description
RES - Response
Docket Date
11/23/1999
Filing Party
Plaintiff(1)
NOTE:
TO P2-4 MOTION FOR SUMMARY ADJUDICATION OF THEIR MOTION TO DISMISS
Filing Date
11/19/1999
Description
REL - Reply
Docket Date
11/29/1999
Filing Party
Defendant(4)
NOTE:
IN SUPPORT OF ITS MOTION FOR SUMMARY ADJUDICATION OF THEIR MOTION TO DISMISS
Filing Date
11/15/1999
Description
MOT - Motion
Docket Date
11/20/1999
Filing Party
Defendant(4)
NOTE:
FOR SUMMARY ADJUDICATION OF THEIR MOTION TO DISMISS
Filing Date
11/3/1999
Description
RES - Response
Docket Date
11/8/1999
Filing Party
Plaintiff(1)
NOTE:
TO MOTION TO DISMISS AGAINST REIDHEADS
Filing Date
10/15/1999
Description
AFS - Affidavit Of Service
Docket Date
10/18/1999
Filing Party
NOTE:
SERVED P2-4 091199
Filing Date
10/15/1999
Description
SUM - Summons
Docket Date
10/19/1999
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/12/1999
Description
ANS - Answer
Docket Date
10/13/1999
Filing Party
Defendant(4)
NOTE:
AND COUNTERCLAIM
Filing Date
10/12/1999
Description
MTD - Motion To Dismiss
Docket Date
10/14/1999
Filing Party
Defendant(4)
Filing Date
10/12/1999
Description
RES - Response
Docket Date
10/14/1999
Filing Party
Defendant(4)
NOTE:
TO CERTIFICATE OF COMPULSORY ARBITRATION
Filing Date
10/5/1999
Description
ADE - Application For Default
Docket Date
10/8/1999
Filing Party
Plaintiff(1)
Filing Date
9/3/1999
Description
COM - Complaint
Docket Date
9/3/1999
Filing Party
Plaintiff(1)
Filing Date
9/3/1999
Description
CCS - Cerificate Arbitration - Subject To
Docket Date
9/3/1999
Filing Party
Plaintiff(1)
Case Calendar
There are no calendar events on file
Judgments
Date
(F)or / (A)gainst
Amount
Frequency
Type
Status
Date
6/7/2000
(F)or / (A)gainst
F:
Omega Financial Of The Southwest Inc
A: Antoinett L Hemphill
A: Antoinett L Hemphill
Amount
$7,822.00
Frequency
One Time
Type
Arbitration Award
Status