« Return to search results
Case Information
Case Number:
CV1999-022011
Judge:
Blaney, Scott
File Date:
12/9/1999
Location:
Downtown
Case Type:
Civil
Party Information
Party Name
Relationship
Sex
Attorney
Party Name
David Harris
Relationship
Plaintiff
Sex
Male
Attorney
Eleanor Miller
Party Name
Belton Hodges
Relationship
Plaintiff
Sex
Male
Attorney
Eleanor Miller
Party Name
Ted Hemphill
Relationship
Plaintiff
Sex
Male
Attorney
Eleanor Miller
Party Name
Jene Hemphill
Relationship
Plaintiff
Sex
Female
Attorney
Eleanor Miller
Party Name
Arizona Game Fowl Breeders Association
Relationship
Plaintiff
Sex
None
Attorney
Eleanor Miller
Party Name
Doyle Thompson
Relationship
Plaintiff
Sex
Male
Attorney
Eleanor Miller
Party Name
Jack Robertson
Relationship
Plaintiff
Sex
Male
Attorney
Eleanor Miller
Party Name
Bonita Robertson
Relationship
Plaintiff
Sex
Female
Attorney
Eleanor Miller
Party Name
(9)State Of Arizona
Relationship
Defendant
Sex
Attorney
James Smith
Party Name
John R Cogorno Pro Hac Vice
Relationship
Endorsement Case
Sex
Male
Attorney
Pro Per
Case Documents
Filing Date
Description
Docket Date
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/1/2001
Description
042 - ME: Case Dismissed - Full
Docket Date
6/1/2001
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/22/2001
Description
REL - Reply
Docket Date
6/8/2001
Filing Party
Defendant(9)
NOTE:
IN SUPPORT OF ITS MOTION TO DISMISS PLAS FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT
Filing Date
5/8/2001
Description
RES - Response
Docket Date
6/7/2001
Filing Party
Plaintiff(1)
NOTE:
TO DEFS MOTION TO DISMISS FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT
Filing Date
4/18/2001
Description
ORD - Order
Docket Date
5/2/2001
Filing Party
Defendant(9)
NOTE:
GRANTING STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO FILE DEFS MOTION TO DISMISS
Filing Date
4/10/2001
Description
MTD - Motion To Dismiss
Docket Date
4/26/2001
Filing Party
Defendant(9)
NOTE:
PLAS 1ST AMENDED COMPLAINT
Filing Date
4/5/2001
Description
STP - Stipulation
Docket Date
4/18/2001
Filing Party
Defendant(9)
NOTE:
FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO FILE DEFS MOTION TO DISMISS
Filing Date
4/5/2001
Description
NOT - Notice
Docket Date
4/19/2001
Filing Party
Defendant(9)
NOTE:
SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL
Filing Date
2/26/2001
Description
906 - ME: Response/Reply Times Set
Docket Date
3/1/2001
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/26/2001
Description
NOT - Notice
Docket Date
2/2/2001
Filing Party
Defendant(9)
NOTE:
SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL
Filing Date
1/11/2001
Description
084 - ME: Case Continued Inactive Calendar
Docket Date
1/12/2001
Filing Party
Filing Date
11/1/2000
Description
083 - ME: Conference Reset/Cont
Docket Date
11/3/2000
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/18/2000
Description
083 - ME: Conference Reset/Cont
Docket Date
9/22/2000
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/9/2000
Description
ORD - Order
Docket Date
8/14/2000
Filing Party
NOTE:
TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE - JOHN R COGORNO
Filing Date
8/8/2000
Description
022 - ME: Order Signed
Docket Date
8/10/2000
Filing Party
NOTE:
GRANTING JOHN R COGORNO APPEARANCE AS PRO HAC VICE
Filing Date
7/13/2000
Description
APL - Application
Docket Date
7/19/2000
Filing Party
Plaintiff(1)
NOTE:
TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE (JOHN R COGORNO)
Filing Date
6/30/2000
Description
079 - ME: Case Dismissed - Partial
Docket Date
7/5/2000
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/6/2000
Description
RES - Response
Docket Date
6/14/2000
Filing Party
Plaintiff(1)
NOTE:
TO DEFS MOTION TO DISMISS
Filing Date
5/30/2000
Description
ANS - Answer
Docket Date
6/1/2000
Filing Party
Defendant(9)
Filing Date
5/30/2000
Description
MTD - Motion To Dismiss
Docket Date
6/10/2000
Filing Party
Defendant(9)
Filing Date
5/30/2000
Description
NOT - Notice
Docket Date
6/10/2000
Filing Party
Defendant(9)
NOTE:
OF FAILURE TO SERVE CERTIFICATE ON COMPULSORY ARBITRATION
Filing Date
5/16/2000
Description
311 - ME: 150 Day Minute Entry
Docket Date
5/16/2000
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/15/2000
Description
AFD - Affidavit On Default
Docket Date
5/31/2000
Filing Party
Plaintiff(1)
Filing Date
5/15/2000
Description
ADE - Application For Default
Docket Date
5/31/2000
Filing Party
Plaintiff(1)
Filing Date
4/26/2000
Description
ANS - Answer
Docket Date
5/1/2000
Filing Party
Defendant(9)
NOTE:
MOTION TO STAY
Filing Date
4/19/2000
Description
AFS - Affidavit Of Service
Docket Date
5/2/2000
Filing Party
Plaintiff(1)
Filing Date
4/17/2000
Description
AFS - Affidavit Of Service
Docket Date
4/26/2000
Filing Party
Plaintiff(1)
Filing Date
4/13/2000
Description
SUM - Summons
Docket Date
4/17/2000
Filing Party
Plaintiff(1)
Filing Date
4/13/2000
Description
AFS - Affidavit Of Service
Docket Date
4/20/2000
Filing Party
Plaintiff(1)
Filing Date
4/13/2000
Description
AFS - Affidavit Of Service
Docket Date
4/20/2000
Filing Party
Plaintiff(1)
Filing Date
4/5/2000
Description
AMC - Amended Complaint
Docket Date
4/6/2000
Filing Party
Plaintiff(1)
NOTE:
FIRST
Filing Date
12/9/1999
Description
COM - Complaint
Docket Date
12/13/1999
Filing Party
Plaintiff(1)
Filing Date
12/9/1999
Description
CCN - Cert Arbitration - Not Subject
Docket Date
12/13/1999
Filing Party
Plaintiff(1)
Case Calendar
Date
Time
Event
Date
1/8/2001
Time
8:30
Event
Status Conference.
Date
2/21/2001
Time
16:30
Event
Status Conference.
Date
5/25/2001
Time
13:30
Event
Oral Argument
Judgments
Date
(F)or / (A)gainst
Amount
Frequency
Type
Status
No records found.