« Return to search results
Case Information
Case Number:
CV1999-019101
Judge:
Astrowsky, Brad
File Date:
10/25/1999
Location:
Downtown
Case Type:
Civil
Party Information
Party Name
Relationship
Sex
Attorney
Party Name
Capital Investment Group Llc
Relationship
Plaintiff
Sex
None
Attorney
Richard Spector
Party Name
John Dunatov
Relationship
Plaintiff
Sex
Male
Attorney
Richard Spector
Party Name
Bon Appetit Llc
Relationship
Defendant
Sex
None
Attorney
Pro Per
Party Name
Milenko Jerolimov
Relationship
Defendant
Sex
Male
Attorney
John Fox
Party Name
Ivo Soric
Relationship
Defendant
Sex
Male
Attorney
John Fox
Case Documents
Filing Date
Description
Docket Date
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/17/2000
Description
047 - ME: Judgment Of Dismissal
Docket Date
10/23/2000
Filing Party
NOTE:
WITHOUT PREJUDICE
Filing Date
4/4/2000
Description
311 - ME: 150 Day Minute Entry
Docket Date
4/4/2000
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/8/2000
Description
314 - ME: Bankruptcy
Docket Date
3/10/2000
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/8/2000
Description
314 - ME: Bankruptcy
Docket Date
3/10/2000
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/2/2000
Description
NOB - Notice Of Filing Bankruptcy
Docket Date
2/11/2000
Filing Party
Defendant(4)
NOTE:
E
Filing Date
11/15/1999
Description
ANS - Answer
Docket Date
11/17/1999
Filing Party
Defendant(4)
Filing Date
11/15/1999
Description
CCE - Controverting Certificate
Docket Date
11/23/1999
Filing Party
Defendant(4)
NOTE:
OF COMPULSORY ARBITRATION
Filing Date
10/29/1999
Description
AFS - Affidavit Of Service
Docket Date
11/1/1999
Filing Party
Plaintiff(1)
NOTE:
P5 SERVED 10-27-99
Filing Date
10/28/1999
Description
AFS - Affidavit Of Service
Docket Date
11/1/1999
Filing Party
Plaintiff(1)
NOTE:
P3 SERVED 10-27-99
Filing Date
10/28/1999
Description
AFS - Affidavit Of Service
Docket Date
11/1/1999
Filing Party
Plaintiff(1)
NOTE:
P4 SERVED 10-27-99
Filing Date
10/28/1999
Description
SUM - Summons
Docket Date
11/1/1999
Filing Party
Plaintiff(1)
Filing Date
10/28/1999
Description
SUM - Summons
Docket Date
11/1/1999
Filing Party
Plaintiff(1)
Filing Date
10/28/1999
Description
SUM - Summons
Docket Date
11/1/1999
Filing Party
Plaintiff(1)
Filing Date
10/25/1999
Description
COM - Complaint
Docket Date
10/27/1999
Filing Party
Plaintiff(1)
Filing Date
10/25/1999
Description
CCN - Cert Arbitration - Not Subject
Docket Date
10/27/1999
Filing Party
Plaintiff(1)
Case Calendar
There are no calendar events on file
Judgments
Date
(F)or / (A)gainst
Amount
Frequency
Type
Status
No records found.