« Return to search results
Case Information
Case Number:
CV1999-009747
Judge:
Whitten, Christopher
File Date:
6/1/1999
Location:
Downtown
Case Type:
Civil
Party Information
Party Name
Relationship
Sex
Attorney
Party Name
Mobile Mini Inc
Relationship
Plaintiff
Sex
None
Attorney
J Glasscock
Party Name
Todd Jostes
Relationship
Defendant
Sex
Male
Attorney
Pro Per
Case Documents
Filing Date
Description
Docket Date
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/15/2000
Description
065 - ME: Order Exonerating Bond
Docket Date
6/19/2000
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/15/2000
Description
ORD - Order
Docket Date
6/19/2000
Filing Party
Plaintiff(1)
NOTE:
TO EXONERATE BOND
Filing Date
6/7/2000
Description
MOT - Motion
Docket Date
6/15/2000
Filing Party
Plaintiff(1)
NOTE:
TO EXONERATE BOND
Filing Date
6/15/1999
Description
NDI - Notice Of Dismissal
Docket Date
6/24/1999
Filing Party
Plaintiff(1)
Filing Date
6/1/1999
Description
COM - Complaint
Docket Date
6/3/1999
Filing Party
Plaintiff(1)
Filing Date
6/1/1999
Description
CCN - Cert Arbitration - Not Subject
Docket Date
6/3/1999
Filing Party
Plaintiff(1)
Filing Date
6/1/1999
Description
APL - Application
Docket Date
6/3/1999
Filing Party
Plaintiff(1)
NOTE:
FOR PROVISIONAL REMEDY WITH NOTICE - REPLEVIN
Filing Date
6/1/1999
Description
AFF - Affidavit
Docket Date
6/3/1999
Filing Party
Plaintiff(1)
NOTE:
OF PLA IN SUPPORT OF ISSUANCE OF APPLICATION FOR PROVISIONAL REMEDY WITH NOTICE; REPLEVIN
Case Calendar
There are no calendar events on file
Judgments
Date
(F)or / (A)gainst
Amount
Frequency
Type
Status
No records found.