« Return to search results
Case Information
Case Number:
CV1999-003391
Judge:
Civil Court Admin, Judge
File Date:
2/25/1999
Location:
Northeast
Case Type:
Civil
Party Information
Party Name
Relationship
Sex
Attorney
Party Name
David Harris
Relationship
Plaintiff
Sex
Male
Attorney
Eleanor Miller
Party Name
Belton Hodges
Relationship
Plaintiff
Sex
Unknown
Attorney
Eleanor Miller
Party Name
Ted Hemphill
Relationship
Plaintiff
Sex
Male
Attorney
Eleanor Miller
Party Name
Jene Hemphill
Relationship
Plaintiff
Sex
Female
Attorney
Eleanor Miller
Party Name
Arizona Game Fowl Breeders Association
Relationship
Plaintiff
Sex
None
Attorney
Eleanor Miller
Party Name
Doyle Thompson
Relationship
Plaintiff
Sex
Male
Attorney
Eleanor Miller
Party Name
(7)State Of Arizona
Relationship
Defendant
Sex
Attorney
William Wilder
Party Name
Betsey Bayless
Relationship
Defendant
Sex
Female
Attorney
Colleen Connor
Party Name
Janet Napolitano
Relationship
Defendant
Sex
Female
Attorney
William Wilder
Party Name
Jane Hull
Relationship
Defendant
Sex
Female
Attorney
William Wilder
Party Name
Citizens Against Cockfighting
Relationship
Intervenor
Sex
None
Attorney
Stephanie Nichols-Young
Party Name
John R Cogorno Pro Hac Vice
Relationship
Endorsement Case
Sex
Male
Attorney
Pro Per
Case Documents
Filing Date
Description
Docket Date
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/25/2001
Description
DEW - Disposition Of Exhibit Worksheet
Docket Date
11/19/2001
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/4/2001
Description
NRD - Notice Of Release Of Deposit
Docket Date
10/15/2001
Filing Party
NOTE:
$500.00 STEPHANIE NICHOLS YOUNG
Filing Date
9/13/2001
Description
ORE - Order To Release/Exonerate Bond
Docket Date
10/15/2001
Filing Party
Plaintiff(1)
Filing Date
9/10/2001
Description
MEB - Meb
Docket Date
9/20/2001
Filing Party
Plaintiff(1)
Filing Date
9/6/2001
Description
LET - Letter
Docket Date
9/20/2001
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/24/2001
Description
LED - 2.8 (d) Letter
Docket Date
8/24/2001
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/6/2001
Description
049 - ME: Judgment Signed
Docket Date
6/6/2001
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/4/2001 11:55:00 AM
Description
JUD - Judgment
Docket Date
6/4/2001 11:55:00 AM
Filing Party
NOTE:
Posted during iCIS Conversion
Filing Date
5/24/2001
Description
REL - Reply
Docket Date
6/11/2001
Filing Party
Defendant(7)
NOTE:
IN SUPPORT OF DEFS PROPOSED FORM OF JUDGMENT
Filing Date
5/18/2001
Description
OBJ - Objection/Opposition.
Docket Date
6/7/2001
Filing Party
Plaintiff(1)
NOTE:
TO PROPOSED JUDDGMENT
Filing Date
5/11/2001
Description
NOT - Notice
Docket Date
5/29/2001
Filing Party
Defendant(7)
NOTE:
OF LODGING JUDGMENT
Filing Date
3/14/2001
Description
ALT - Appeals Letter Of Transmittal
Docket Date
3/14/2001
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/14/2001
Description
MAN - Order Of Mandate
Docket Date
3/14/2001
Filing Party
NOTE:
& ORDER/AFFIRMED IN PART/REVERSED IN PART/REMANDED
Filing Date
3/9/2001
Description
TSP - Transcript of Proceedings
Docket Date
3/27/2001
Filing Party
NOTE:
3-25-99; MORNING SESSION
Filing Date
3/9/2001
Description
TSP - Transcript of Proceedings
Docket Date
3/27/2001
Filing Party
NOTE:
3-25-99; ORAL ARGUMENT ON COUNSEL FOR CITIZENS AGAINST COCKFIGHTING MOITON TO; INTERVENE
Filing Date
3/9/2001
Description
TSP - Transcript of Proceedings
Docket Date
3/27/2001
Filing Party
NOTE:
3-25-99; TESTIMONY TAKEN DURING EVIDENTIARY HEARING
Filing Date
3/9/2001
Description
TSP - Transcript of Proceedings
Docket Date
3/27/2001
Filing Party
NOTE:
JANE ANNE WESTLUND; 5-25-99; RE: INJUNCTIVE RELIEF
Filing Date
3/7/2001
Description
023 - ME: Order Entered By Court
Docket Date
3/9/2001
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/2/2001
Description
316 - ME: Case Assigned/Reassigned
Docket Date
3/5/2001
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/17/2000
Description
ATR - Appeals Transmittal Receipt
Docket Date
3/25/2000
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/15/2000
Description
CAO - Court Of Appeals Order
Docket Date
3/15/2000
Filing Party
NOTE:
TRANSMIT ORIGINAL RECORD ON APPEAL WITHIN 15 DAYS
Filing Date
10/1/1999
Description
RTM - Returned Mail or Returned/ReMailed Mail
Docket Date
10/5/1999
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/24/1999
Description
CAR - Court Of Appeals Receipt
Docket Date
9/28/1999
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/24/1999
Description
NOT - Notice
Docket Date
9/28/1999
Filing Party
NOTE:
RE FILING FEES
Filing Date
9/24/1999
Description
AIX - Appeals Index
Docket Date
9/28/1999
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/3/1999
Description
NOT - Notice
Docket Date
9/13/1999
Filing Party
Plaintiff(1)
NOTE:
OF FILING CROSS-APPELLANTS DOCKETING STATEMENT
Filing Date
8/30/1999
Description
ALT - Appeals Letter Of Transmittal
Docket Date
8/30/1999
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/30/1999
Description
CAO - Court Of Appeals Order
Docket Date
8/30/1999
Filing Party
NOTE:
DECLINING JURISDICTION
Filing Date
8/26/1999
Description
CAS - Civil Appeals Docketing Statement
Docket Date
8/31/1999
Filing Party
Plaintiff(1)
Filing Date
8/26/1999
Description
TSP - Transcript of Proceedings
Docket Date
9/1/1999
Filing Party
NOTE:
PARTIAL 5-25-99 BY JANE ANNE WESTLUND
Filing Date
8/20/1999
Description
NAP - Notice Of Appeal
Docket Date
8/26/1999
Filing Party
Plaintiff(1)
NOTE:
CROSS-APPEAL
Filing Date
8/12/1999
Description
NAP - Notice Of Appeal
Docket Date
8/13/1999
Filing Party
Defendant(7)
Filing Date
8/12/1999
Description
NDC - Notice Of Deposit With Court
Docket Date
8/13/1999
Filing Party
NOTE:
$500.00 FOR INTERVENOR-CITIZENS AGAINST COCKFIGHTING COST BOND
Filing Date
8/12/1999
Description
NAP - Notice Of Appeal
Docket Date
8/16/1999
Filing Party
Plaintiff(1)
NOTE:
CROSS-APPEAL
Filing Date
8/3/1999
Description
311 - ME: 150 Day Minute Entry
Docket Date
8/3/1999
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/14/1999
Description
ORD - Order
Docket Date
8/3/1999
Filing Party
Plaintiff(1)
NOTE:
FOR PARTIAL PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION
Filing Date
6/4/1999
Description
LET - Letter
Docket Date
6/14/1999
Filing Party
NOTE:
E
Filing Date
5/28/1999
Description
019 - ME: Ruling
Docket Date
6/3/1999
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/27/1999
Description
020 - ME: Matter Under Advisement
Docket Date
6/3/1999
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/27/1999
Description
EXW - Exhibits Work Sheet
Docket Date
6/9/1999
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/5/1999
Description
003 - ME: Hearing Reset
Docket Date
5/13/1999
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/30/1999
Description
REL - Reply
Docket Date
5/14/1999
Filing Party
Plaintiff(1)
NOTE:
TO PLEADING FILED BY DEFS ON/ABOUT 3-22-99 AND SUPPLEMENT THERETO FILED ON/ABOUT; 4-16-99
Filing Date
4/27/1999
Description
REL - Reply
Docket Date
5/11/1999
Filing Party
Defendant(7)
NOTE:
TO RESPONSE TO MOTION TO DISMISS COUNT II OF PLAS COMPLAINT ON BEHALF OF THE; STATE OF ARIZONA JANE DEE HULL AND JANET NAPOLITANO
Filing Date
4/22/1999
Description
REL - Reply
Docket Date
5/4/1999
Filing Party
Defendant(8)
NOTE:
TO PLAS RESPONSE TO SECRETARY OF STATES MOTION TO DISMISS
Filing Date
4/16/1999
Description
MEM - Memorandum
Docket Date
4/27/1999
Filing Party
Defendant(7)
NOTE:
SUPPLEMENTAL BRIEF IN OPPOSITION TO PLAS REQUEST FOR PRELIMINARY INJUNCTIVE; RELIEF
Filing Date
4/13/1999
Description
RES - Response
Docket Date
4/22/1999
Filing Party
Plaintiff(1)
NOTE:
TO MOTION TO DISMISS CT 2 OF PLA'S COMPLAINT ON BEHALF OF THE STATE OF ARIZONA,; GOVERNOR JANE DEE HULL AND ATTORNEY GENERAL JANET NAPOLITANO
Filing Date
4/13/1999
Description
RES - Response
Docket Date
4/22/1999
Filing Party
Plaintiff(1)
NOTE:
TO SECRETARY OF STATE'S MOTION TO DISMISS
Filing Date
4/12/1999
Description
RTM - Returned Mail or Returned/ReMailed Mail
Docket Date
4/22/1999
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/8/1999
Description
REL - Reply
Docket Date
4/20/1999
Filing Party
Plaintiff(1)
NOTE:
TO DEFS RESPONSE TO PLAS APPLICATION FOR DEFAULT; REQUEST FOR EXPENSES AND; SANCTIONS
Filing Date
4/7/1999
Description
NOT - Notice
Docket Date
4/16/1999
Filing Party
Defendant(7)
NOTE:
OF FILING ORIGINAL VERIFICATION
Filing Date
4/5/1999
Description
RES - Response
Docket Date
4/14/1999
Filing Party
Defendant(7)
NOTE:
TO PLAS APPLICATION FOR DEFAULT
Filing Date
3/26/1999
Description
005 - ME: Hearing
Docket Date
4/5/1999
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/25/1999
Description
REL - Reply
Docket Date
4/1/1999
Filing Party
Plaintiff(1)
NOTE:
IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO INTERVENE
Filing Date
3/24/1999
Description
ANS - Answer
Docket Date
3/25/1999
Filing Party
Defendant(7)
NOTE:
G TO COUNT I OF PLA COMPLAINT
Filing Date
3/24/1999
Description
MTD - Motion To Dismiss
Docket Date
3/31/1999
Filing Party
Defendant(7)
NOTE:
COUNT II OF PLAS COMPLAINT ON BEHALF OF THE STATE OF ARIZONA GOVERNOR JANE DEE; HULL AND ATTORNEY GENERAL JANET NAPOLITANO
Filing Date
3/24/1999
Description
AED - Affidavit And Entry Of Default
Docket Date
4/6/1999
Filing Party
Plaintiff(1)
Filing Date
3/24/1999
Description
ADE - Application For Default
Docket Date
4/6/1999
Filing Party
Plaintiff(1)
Filing Date
3/22/1999
Description
RES - Response
Docket Date
3/26/1999
Filing Party
Defendant(7)
NOTE:
TO PLA COMPLAINT SEEKING DECLARATORY AND INJUNCTIVE RELIEF
Filing Date
3/22/1999
Description
MOT - Motion
Docket Date
3/26/1999
Filing Party
Defendant(7)
NOTE:
TO EXCEED PAGE LIMIT
Filing Date
3/22/1999
Description
MTD - Motion To Dismiss
Docket Date
3/29/1999
Filing Party
Defendant(8)
Filing Date
3/17/1999
Description
003 - ME: Hearing Reset
Docket Date
3/22/1999
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/17/1999
Description
RES - Response
Docket Date
3/22/1999
Filing Party
Plaintiff(1)
NOTE:
TO MOTION TO INTERVENE
Filing Date
3/12/1999
Description
MOT - Motion
Docket Date
3/15/1999
Filing Party
Plaintiff(1)
NOTE:
TO INTERVENE
Filing Date
3/11/1999
Description
EXH - Exhibit
Docket Date
3/16/1999
Filing Party
Plaintiff(1)
NOTE:
CORRECTION OF EXHIBIT 2 ATTACHED TO COMPLAINT
Filing Date
3/10/1999
Description
066 - ME: Case Reassigned
Docket Date
3/16/1999
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/9/1999
Description
MEM - Memorandum
Docket Date
3/11/1999
Filing Party
Plaintiff(1)
NOTE:
HEARING-INJUNCTIVE RELIEF
Filing Date
3/9/1999
Description
NJR - Notice of change of Judge for right
Docket Date
3/15/1999
Filing Party
Defendant(7)
Filing Date
3/9/1999
Description
MEM - Memorandum
Docket Date
3/17/1999
Filing Party
Plaintiff(1)
NOTE:
HEARING - BOND RULE 65(E)
Filing Date
3/8/1999
Description
AFS - Affidavit Of Service
Docket Date
3/10/1999
Filing Party
Plaintiff(1)
NOTE:
P7 SERVED 3-3-99
Filing Date
3/8/1999
Description
AFS - Affidavit Of Service
Docket Date
3/10/1999
Filing Party
Plaintiff(1)
NOTE:
P8 SERVED 3-3-99
Filing Date
3/8/1999
Description
AFS - Affidavit Of Service
Docket Date
3/10/1999
Filing Party
Plaintiff(1)
NOTE:
P10 SERVED 3-3-99
Filing Date
3/8/1999
Description
AFS - Affidavit Of Service
Docket Date
3/10/1999
Filing Party
Plaintiff(1)
NOTE:
P9 SERVED 3-3-99
Filing Date
3/8/1999
Description
NOT - Notice
Docket Date
3/11/1999
Filing Party
Plaintiff(1)
NOTE:
OF ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION
Filing Date
3/8/1999
Description
SUM - Summons
Docket Date
3/11/1999
Filing Party
Plaintiff(1)
Filing Date
3/5/1999
Description
ORD - Order
Docket Date
3/17/1999
Filing Party
NOTE:
JOHN R COGORNO MAY APPEAR AS PRO HAC VICE
Filing Date
2/25/1999
Description
COM - Complaint
Docket Date
3/1/1999
Filing Party
Plaintiff(1)
Filing Date
2/25/1999
Description
CCA - Cert Compulsory Arbitration
Docket Date
3/1/1999
Filing Party
Plaintiff(1)
Filing Date
2/25/1999
Description
APL - Application
Docket Date
3/1/1999
Filing Party
Plaintiff(1)
NOTE:
TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE
Case Calendar
There are no calendar events on file
Judgments
Date
(F)or / (A)gainst
Amount
Frequency
Type
Status
Date
6/4/2001
(F)or / (A)gainst
F:  State Of Arizona
A: David Harris
Amount
$0.00
Frequency
Type
Judgment Only
Status