Civil Court Case Information - Case History
« Return to search results
Case Information | |||
---|---|---|---|
Case Number: | CV1999-001866 | Judge: | Adleman, Jay |
File Date: | 2/2/1999 | Location: | Downtown |
Case Type: | Civil |
Party Information | |||
---|---|---|---|
Party Name | Relationship | Sex | Attorney |
National American Insurance Company Of | Plaintiff | None | Lyndon Steimel |
Diamondback Yard Designs Inc | Defendant | None | Pro Per |
Todd Jostes | Defendant | Male | James Wees |
Abitrator | Endorsement Case | Unknown | J Martineau |
Case Documents | |||
---|---|---|---|
Filing Date | Description | Docket Date | Filing Party |
1/19/2000 | 047 - ME: Judgment Of Dismissal | 1/19/2000 | |
7/13/1999 | 311 - ME: 150 Day Minute Entry | 7/13/1999 | |
6/9/1999 | 324 - ME: Notice Of Appointment Of Arbitrator | 6/9/1999 | |
5/20/1999 | ANS - Answer | 5/25/1999 | Defendant(3) |
5/18/1999 | 322 - ME: Notice Of Intent To Dismiss | 5/18/1999 | |
2/2/1999 | COM - Complaint | 2/4/1999 | Plaintiff(1) |
2/2/1999 | CCA - Cert Compulsory Arbitration | 2/4/1999 | Plaintiff(1) |
Case Calendar | ||
---|---|---|
There are no calendar events on file |
Judgments | |||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
There are no judgments on file |