« Return to search results
Case Information
Case Number:
CV1999-000922
Judge:
Herrod, Michael
File Date:
1/19/1999
Location:
Downtown
Case Type:
Civil
Party Information
Party Name
Relationship
Sex
Attorney
Party Name
Irma Barbeitia
Relationship
Plaintiff
Sex
Female
Attorney
WILLIAM WOLF
Party Name
Maurine L Hemphill
Relationship
Defendant
Sex
Female
Attorney
James Junker
Party Name
Arbitrator
Relationship
Endorsement Case
Sex
Unknown
Attorney
Charles Ferris
Case Documents
Filing Date
Description
Docket Date
Filing Party
Filing Date
12/12/2000
Description
SJU - Satisfaction Of Judgment
Docket Date
12/14/2000
Filing Party
Defendant(2)
NOTE:
ARBITRATION AWARD
Filing Date
11/9/2000
Description
RES - Response
Docket Date
11/15/2000
Filing Party
Plaintiff(1)
NOTE:
TO DEFS OBJECTION TO INTERPRETER FEES
Filing Date
10/31/2000 11:18:00 AM
Description
ARA - Arbitration Award
Docket Date
10/31/2000 11:18:00 AM
Filing Party
NOTE:
Posted during iCIS Conversion
Filing Date
10/25/2000
Description
SOC - Statement Of Costs
Docket Date
10/31/2000
Filing Party
Plaintiff(1)
NOTE:
AND NOTICE OF TAXATION
Filing Date
10/25/2000
Description
NOT - Notice
Docket Date
10/31/2000
Filing Party
Plaintiff(1)
NOTE:
OF SERVICE OF PROPOSED ARBITRATION AWARD
Filing Date
10/16/2000
Description
NDN - Notice Of Decision of Arbitrator
Docket Date
10/18/2000
Filing Party
NOTE:
OF ARBITRATOR
Filing Date
9/28/2000
Description
STA - Statement
Docket Date
10/5/2000
Filing Party
Plaintiff(1)
NOTE:
JOINT PRE-ARBITRATION
Filing Date
9/13/2000
Description
NOT - Notice
Docket Date
9/22/2000
Filing Party
Defendant(2)
NOTE:
DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL
Filing Date
7/7/2000
Description
324 - ME: Notice Of Appointment Of Arbitrator
Docket Date
7/7/2000
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/20/2000
Description
ORD - Order
Docket Date
7/7/2000
Filing Party
Plaintiff(1)
NOTE:
REFERRING THIS MATTER TO COMPULSORY ARBITRATION
Filing Date
6/14/2000
Description
MOT - Motion
Docket Date
6/19/2000
Filing Party
Plaintiff(1)
NOTE:
JOINT - TO REFER CLAIM TO COMPULSORY ARBITRATION
Filing Date
6/12/2000
Description
NSD - Notice of Service Re: 26.1 Disclosure
Docket Date
6/17/2000
Filing Party
Plaintiff(1)
NOTE:
THIRD SUPPLEMENT
Filing Date
6/5/2000
Description
070 - ME: Settlement Conference Set
Docket Date
6/7/2000
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/2/2000
Description
064 - ME: Trial Continued/Reset
Docket Date
5/4/2000
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/19/2000
Description
005 - ME: Hearing
Docket Date
4/25/2000
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/17/2000
Description
NSD - Notice of Service Re: 26.1 Disclosure
Docket Date
4/27/2000
Filing Party
Plaintiff(1)
NOTE:
SECOND
Filing Date
3/29/2000
Description
LOW - List Of Witnesses/Exhibit/Evidence
Docket Date
4/5/2000
Filing Party
Defendant(2)
NOTE:
SUPPLEMENTAL
Filing Date
3/24/2000
Description
LOW - List Of Witnesses/Exhibit/Evidence
Docket Date
3/29/2000
Filing Party
Plaintiff(1)
Filing Date
3/23/2000
Description
070 - ME: Settlement Conference Set
Docket Date
3/24/2000
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/20/2000
Description
056 - ME: Hearing Set
Docket Date
3/22/2000
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/25/2000
Description
LOW - List Of Witnesses/Exhibit/Evidence
Docket Date
3/9/2000
Filing Party
Defendant(2)
NOTE:
SUPPLEMENTAL
Filing Date
2/22/2000
Description
LOW - List Of Witnesses/Exhibit/Evidence
Docket Date
3/6/2000
Filing Party
Defendant(2)
NOTE:
SUPPLEMENTAL
Filing Date
2/18/2000
Description
023 - ME: Order Entered By Court
Docket Date
2/24/2000
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/17/2000
Description
OBJ - Objection/Opposition.
Docket Date
3/1/2000
Filing Party
Defendant(2)
NOTE:
TO AFFIDAVIT OF PLA CONCERNING SECURITY OF COSTS
Filing Date
2/17/2000
Description
LOW - List Of Witnesses/Exhibit/Evidence
Docket Date
3/1/2000
Filing Party
Defendant(2)
NOTE:
SUPPLEMENTAL
Filing Date
2/9/2000
Description
REQ - Request
Docket Date
2/22/2000
Filing Party
Plaintiff(1)
NOTE:
FOR SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE
Filing Date
1/6/2000
Description
AFF - Affidavit
Docket Date
1/13/2000
Filing Party
Plaintiff(1)
NOTE:
OF P1 AS TO INABILITY TO POST BOND
Filing Date
12/21/1999
Description
089 - ME: Trial Setting
Docket Date
12/29/1999
Filing Party
Filing Date
12/13/1999
Description
023 - ME: Order Entered By Court
Docket Date
12/17/1999
Filing Party
Filing Date
11/18/1999
Description
003 - ME: Hearing Reset
Docket Date
11/22/1999
Filing Party
Filing Date
11/12/1999
Description
STA - Statement
Docket Date
11/20/1999
Filing Party
Defendant(2)
NOTE:
SUPPLEMENT TO THE JOINT PRETRIAL SCHEDULING CONFERENCE
Filing Date
11/9/1999
Description
STA - Statement
Docket Date
11/18/1999
Filing Party
Defendant(2)
NOTE:
JOINT PRETRIAL SCHEDULING CONFERENCE
Filing Date
11/4/1999
Description
MOT - Motion
Docket Date
11/10/1999
Filing Party
Defendant(2)
NOTE:
FOR ORDER TO PLA TO PROVIDE SECURITY FOR COSTS
Filing Date
10/25/1999
Description
CCE - Controverting Certificate
Docket Date
10/28/1999
Filing Party
Defendant(2)
Filing Date
10/15/1999
Description
MSE - Motion To Set & Cert/Readiness
Docket Date
10/18/1999
Filing Party
Plaintiff(1)
Filing Date
10/4/1999
Description
LOW - List Of Witnesses/Exhibit/Evidence
Docket Date
10/7/1999
Filing Party
Defendant(2)
Filing Date
10/4/1999
Description
026 - ME: Pretrial Conference Set
Docket Date
10/13/1999
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/29/1999
Description
MOT - Motion
Docket Date
9/30/1999
Filing Party
Defendant(2)
NOTE:
FOR RULE 16 SCHEDULING CONFERENCE
Filing Date
9/27/1999
Description
079 - ME: Case Dismissed - Partial
Docket Date
10/1/1999
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/24/1999
Description
ODI - Order Of Dismissal
Docket Date
9/27/1999
Filing Party
NOTE:
WITH PREJUDICE
Filing Date
9/20/1999
Description
SFD - Stipulation For Dismissal
Docket Date
9/24/1999
Filing Party
Plaintiff(1)
NOTE:
WITH PREJUDICE
Filing Date
9/14/1999
Description
NSD - Notice of Service Re: 26.1 Disclosure
Docket Date
9/17/1999
Filing Party
Plaintiff(1)
NOTE:
1ST RULE
Filing Date
9/2/1999
Description
002 - ME: Hearing Vacated
Docket Date
9/23/1999
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/26/1999
Description
NSD - Notice of Service Re: 26.1 Disclosure
Docket Date
8/31/1999
Filing Party
Plaintiff(1)
NOTE:
2ND SUPPLEMENT
Filing Date
8/5/1999
Description
NSD - Notice of Service Re: 26.1 Disclosure
Docket Date
8/10/1999
Filing Party
Plaintiff(1)
NOTE:
FIRST SUPPLEMENTAL
Filing Date
7/22/1999
Description
094 - ME: Oral Argument Set
Docket Date
7/27/1999
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/22/1999
Description
NOT - Notice
Docket Date
8/3/1999
Filing Party
Defendant(2)
NOTE:
OF FILING OFFER OF JUDGMENT
Filing Date
7/16/1999
Description
SOF - Statement Of Facts
Docket Date
7/27/1999
Filing Party
Plaintiff(1)
Filing Date
7/16/1999
Description
MSJ - Motion For Summary Judgment
Docket Date
7/27/1999
Filing Party
Plaintiff(1)
Filing Date
6/29/1999
Description
311 - ME: 150 Day Minute Entry
Docket Date
6/29/1999
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/4/1999
Description
NSD - Notice of Service Re: 26.1 Disclosure
Docket Date
6/14/1999
Filing Party
Plaintiff(1)
Filing Date
4/15/1999
Description
ANS - Answer
Docket Date
4/19/1999
Filing Party
Plaintiff(1)
NOTE:
TO COUNTERCLAIM OF P2
Filing Date
4/15/1999
Description
CCA - Cert Compulsory Arbitration
Docket Date
4/27/1999
Filing Party
Plaintiff(1)
Filing Date
4/9/1999
Description
NSD - Notice of Service Re: 26.1 Disclosure
Docket Date
4/20/1999
Filing Party
Plaintiff(1)
Filing Date
2/25/1999
Description
ANS - Answer
Docket Date
2/26/1999
Filing Party
Defendant(2)
NOTE:
AND COUNTERCLAIM
Filing Date
2/25/1999
Description
CCA - Cert Compulsory Arbitration
Docket Date
3/10/1999
Filing Party
Defendant(2)
Filing Date
2/24/1999
Description
ANS - Answer
Docket Date
2/26/1999
Filing Party
Defendant(2)
NOTE:
AND COUNTER-CLAIM
Filing Date
2/24/1999
Description
CCA - Cert Compulsory Arbitration
Docket Date
3/10/1999
Filing Party
Plaintiff(1)
Filing Date
2/2/1999
Description
SUM - Summons
Docket Date
2/3/1999
Filing Party
Plaintiff(1)
Filing Date
2/2/1999
Description
AFM - Affidavit of Service Registered/Certified Mail
Docket Date
2/5/1999
Filing Party
Plaintiff(1)
NOTE:
P2 SERVED 1-26-99
Filing Date
1/19/1999
Description
CCA - Cert Compulsory Arbitration
Docket Date
1/21/1999
Filing Party
Plaintiff(1)
Filing Date
1/19/1999
Description
COM - Complaint
Docket Date
1/21/1999
Filing Party
Plaintiff(1)
Case Calendar
There are no calendar events on file
Judgments
Date
(F)or / (A)gainst
Amount
Frequency
Type
Status
Date
10/31/2000
(F)or / (A)gainst
F:
Irma Barbeitia
A: Maurine L Hemphill
A: Maurine L Hemphill
Amount
$303.20
Frequency
One Time
Type
Arbitration Award
Status
Satisfied
Date
10/31/2000
(F)or / (A)gainst
F:
Irma Barbeitia
A: Maurine L Hemphill
A: Maurine L Hemphill
Amount
$25,000.00
Frequency
One Time
Type
Arbitration Award
Status
Satisfied