« Return to search results
Case Information
Case Number:
CV1998-091423
Judge:
Thompson, Peter
File Date:
6/25/1998
Location:
Southeast
Case Type:
Civil
Party Information
Party Name
Relationship
Sex
Attorney
Party Name
Alejandrina Toro
Relationship
Plaintiff
Sex
Female
Attorney
Charles Slack-Mendez
Party Name
Julie Graves
Relationship
Defendant
Sex
Female
Attorney
Evan Goldstein
Party Name
Francie Hemphill
Relationship
Defendant
Sex
Female
Attorney
Evan Goldstein
Party Name
Arbitrator
Relationship
Endorsement Case
Sex
Unknown
Attorney
Katherine Verburg
Case Documents
Filing Date
Description
Docket Date
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/12/2002
Description
NRD - Notice Of Release Of Deposit
Docket Date
7/3/2002
Filing Party
NOTE:
$75 PAID TO EVANS S GOLDSTEIN
Filing Date
6/4/2002
Description
ORE - Order To Release/Exonerate Bond
Docket Date
7/3/2002
Filing Party
Defendant(2)
Filing Date
5/14/2002
Description
MEB - Meb
Docket Date
5/24/2002
Filing Party
Defendant(2)
Filing Date
10/31/2000
Description
SFD - Stipulation For Dismissal
Docket Date
11/1/2000
Filing Party
Defendant(2)
NOTE:
WITH PREJUDICE
Filing Date
10/31/2000
Description
ODI - Order Of Dismissal
Docket Date
11/13/2000
Filing Party
Defendant(2)
NOTE:
WITH PREJUDICE
Filing Date
9/26/2000
Description
078 - ME: Case On Dismissal Calendar
Docket Date
9/28/2000
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/20/2000
Description
NOS - Notice Of Settlement
Docket Date
9/26/2000
Filing Party
Defendant(2)
NOTE:
& REQUEST TO VACATE PRE-TRIAL CONFERENCE
Filing Date
8/21/2000
Description
ORD - Order
Docket Date
10/11/2000
Filing Party
Defendant(2)
NOTE:
RE MOTION TO CONTINUE ON INACTIVE CALENDAR - MOTION IS MOOT
Filing Date
8/18/2000
Description
026 - ME: Pretrial Conference Set
Docket Date
8/22/2000
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/8/2000
Description
NAP - Notice Of Appeal
Docket Date
8/11/2000
Filing Party
Defendant(2)
NOTE:
AND MOTION TO SET FOR TRIAL
Filing Date
8/8/2000
Description
NDC - Notice Of Deposit With Court
Docket Date
8/15/2000
Filing Party
NOTE:
$75 ARB APPEAL
Filing Date
8/8/2000
Description
NDC - Notice Of Deposit With Court
Docket Date
8/15/2000
Filing Party
Defendant(2)
NOTE:
ON APPEAL/$75
Filing Date
8/8/2000
Description
LOW - List Of Witnesses/Exhibit/Evidence
Docket Date
8/15/2000
Filing Party
Defendant(2)
Filing Date
7/25/2000
Description
MCC - Mot/Cont On Inactive Calendar
Docket Date
8/3/2000
Filing Party
Defendant(2)
Filing Date
7/18/2000 8:30:00 AM
Description
ARA - Arbitration Award
Docket Date
7/18/2000 8:30:00 AM
Filing Party
NOTE:
Posted during iCIS Conversion
Filing Date
7/18/2000
Description
NDN - Notice Of Decision of Arbitrator
Docket Date
7/21/2000
Filing Party
Endorsement Case(4)
NOTE:
OF ARBITRATOR
Filing Date
7/18/2000
Description
SOC - Statement Of Costs
Docket Date
7/21/2000
Filing Party
Plaintiff(1)
Filing Date
7/18/2000
Description
AAW - Appealed Arbitration Award
Docket Date
8/11/2000
Filing Party
Plaintiff(1)
Filing Date
6/14/2000
Description
ORD - Order
Docket Date
6/27/2000
Filing Party
Endorsement Case(4)
NOTE:
RE ARBITRATION
Filing Date
6/6/2000
Description
REQ - Request
Docket Date
6/13/2000
Filing Party
Defendant(2)
NOTE:
FOR ACCELERATED HEARING ON P2-3 MOTION TO CONTINUE TIME PERIOD FOR ARBITRATION
Filing Date
6/2/2000
Description
MCO - Motion To Continue
Docket Date
6/8/2000
Filing Party
Defendant(2)
NOTE:
THE TIME PERIOD FOR ARBITRATION
Filing Date
5/25/2000
Description
NOH - Notice Of Hearing
Docket Date
5/31/2000
Filing Party
Endorsement Case(4)
Filing Date
4/21/2000
Description
324 - ME: Notice Of Appointment Of Arbitrator
Docket Date
4/21/2000
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/4/2000
Description
350 - ME: Transfer To Arbitration
Docket Date
4/11/2000
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/29/2000
Description
ORD - Order
Docket Date
4/4/2000
Filing Party
Plaintiff(1)
NOTE:
REINSTATING MATTER
Filing Date
3/20/2000
Description
MEM - Memorandum
Docket Date
3/24/2000
Filing Party
Plaintiff(1)
NOTE:
HEARING / ON MOTION TO REINSTATE
Filing Date
2/1/2000
Description
094 - ME: Oral Argument Set
Docket Date
2/17/2000
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/18/2000
Description
RES - Response
Docket Date
2/1/2000
Filing Party
Defendant(2)
NOTE:
TO PLAINTIFFS MOTION TO REINSTATE
Filing Date
1/10/2000
Description
MOT - Motion
Docket Date
1/11/2000
Filing Party
Plaintiff(1)
NOTE:
TO REINSTATE
Filing Date
12/29/1999
Description
047 - ME: Judgment Of Dismissal
Docket Date
12/29/1999
Filing Party
Filing Date
12/21/1999
Description
CCS - Cerificate Arbitration - Subject To
Docket Date
12/28/1999
Filing Party
Plaintiff(1)
NOTE:
AMENDED
Filing Date
9/15/1999
Description
SUM - Summons
Docket Date
9/16/1999
Filing Party
Plaintiff(1)
Filing Date
8/24/1999
Description
NSD - Notice of Service Re: 26.1 Disclosure
Docket Date
8/26/1999
Filing Party
Plaintiff(1)
Filing Date
7/1/1999
Description
ANS - Answer
Docket Date
7/8/1999
Filing Party
Defendant(2)
Filing Date
7/1/1999
Description
CCN - Cert Arbitration - Not Subject
Docket Date
7/16/1999
Filing Party
Defendant(2)
Filing Date
6/4/1999
Description
APU - Affidavit Of Publication
Docket Date
6/7/1999
Filing Party
Plaintiff(1)
NOTE:
05-06-99
Filing Date
6/4/1999
Description
NAR - Notice Of Appearance
Docket Date
6/7/1999
Filing Party
Plaintiff(1)
Filing Date
5/6/1999
Description
UPI - Updated Information Address and/or Name
Docket Date
5/13/1999
Filing Party
Plaintiff(1)
Filing Date
5/5/1999
Description
ORD - Order
Docket Date
5/10/1999
Filing Party
Plaintiff(1)
NOTE:
EXTEND SVS
Filing Date
4/28/1999
Description
RRM - Returned/ReMailed Mail
Docket Date
5/3/1999
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/27/1999
Description
MOT - Motion
Docket Date
4/30/1999
Filing Party
Plaintiff(1)
NOTE:
TO EXTEND TIME FOR SERVING PROCESS TO DEFENDANTS AND ORDER
Filing Date
4/6/1999
Description
016 - ME: Ext/Time/Filing Granted
Docket Date
4/14/1999
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/1/1999
Description
ORD - Order
Docket Date
4/8/1999
Filing Party
Plaintiff(1)
Filing Date
3/16/1999
Description
MFR - Motion For Reconsideration
Docket Date
3/22/1999
Filing Party
Plaintiff(1)
NOTE:
RE-MOTION TO EXTEND TIME FOR SERVING PROCESS TO DEFENDANTS AND ORDER
Filing Date
3/2/1999
Description
019 - ME: Ruling
Docket Date
3/4/1999
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/9/1999
Description
MXS - Motion To Extend Time For Service
Docket Date
2/17/1999
Filing Party
Plaintiff(1)
Filing Date
12/16/1998
Description
RTM - Returned Mail or Returned/ReMailed Mail
Docket Date
12/21/1998
Filing Party
Filing Date
12/8/1998
Description
311 - ME: 150 Day Minute Entry
Docket Date
12/8/1998
Filing Party
Filing Date
12/8/1998
Description
ORD - Order
Docket Date
12/15/1998
Filing Party
Plaintiff(1)
Filing Date
11/10/1998
Description
MXS - Motion To Extend Time For Service
Docket Date
11/17/1998
Filing Party
Plaintiff(1)
NOTE:
AND ORDER UNSIGNED
Filing Date
10/6/1998
Description
322 - ME: Notice Of Intent To Dismiss
Docket Date
10/6/1998
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/25/1998
Description
COM - Complaint
Docket Date
6/29/1998
Filing Party
Plaintiff(1)
Filing Date
6/25/1998
Description
CCA - Cert Compulsory Arbitration
Docket Date
6/29/1998
Filing Party
Plaintiff(1)
Case Calendar
There are no calendar events on file
Judgments
Date
(F)or / (A)gainst
Amount
Frequency
Type
Status
Date
7/18/2000
(F)or / (A)gainst
F:  Alejandrina Toro
A: Julie Graves
Amount
$535.44
Frequency
One Time
Type
Arbitration Award
Status
Date
7/18/2000
(F)or / (A)gainst
F:  Alejandrina Toro
A: Julie Graves
Amount
$6,300.00
Frequency
One Time
Type
Arbitration Award
Status