« Return to search results
Case Information
Case Number:
CV1998-023566
Judge:
Ryan, Timothy
File Date:
12/31/1998
Location:
Downtown
Case Type:
Civil
Party Information
Party Name
Relationship
Sex
Attorney
Party Name
Janice R Reynolds
Relationship
Plaintiff
Sex
Female
Attorney
Jack Hirsch
Party Name
Nelson B Hemphill
Relationship
Defendant
Sex
Male
Attorney
James Kloss
Party Name
Pima Unified School District
Relationship
Defendant
Sex
None
Attorney
James Kloss
Party Name
Amy Hemphill
Relationship
Defendant
Sex
Female
Attorney
James Kloss
Party Name
Arbitrator
Relationship
Endorsement Case
Sex
Unknown
Attorney
Denise Blommel
Case Documents
Filing Date
Description
Docket Date
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/9/1999
Description
ODI - Order Of Dismissal
Docket Date
8/11/1999
Filing Party
NOTE:
WITH PREJUDICE
Filing Date
8/3/1999
Description
SFD - Stipulation For Dismissal
Docket Date
8/9/1999
Filing Party
Defendant(2)
NOTE:
WITH PREJUDICE
Filing Date
7/20/1999
Description
NOS - Notice Of Settlement
Docket Date
7/28/1999
Filing Party
Defendant(2)
Filing Date
7/8/1999
Description
078 - ME: Case On Dismissal Calendar
Docket Date
7/16/1999
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/7/1999
Description
NOT - Notice
Docket Date
7/19/1999
Filing Party
NOTE:
OF CANCELATION OF ARBITRATION HEARING
Filing Date
6/8/1999
Description
311 - ME: 150 Day Minute Entry
Docket Date
6/8/1999
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/27/1999
Description
NOT - Notice
Docket Date
6/4/1999
Filing Party
Defendant(2)
NOTE:
OF NON-PARTY AT FAULT
Filing Date
5/18/1999
Description
NOH - Notice Of Hearing
Docket Date
5/27/1999
Filing Party
NOTE:
ARBITRATION
Filing Date
3/17/1999
Description
324 - ME: Notice Of Appointment Of Arbitrator
Docket Date
3/17/1999
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/11/1999
Description
NOT - Notice
Docket Date
3/16/1999
Filing Party
Plaintiff(1)
NOTE:
OF STRIKE OF ARBITRATOR
Filing Date
3/3/1999
Description
324 - ME: Notice Of Appointment Of Arbitrator
Docket Date
3/3/1999
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/26/1999
Description
ANS - Answer
Docket Date
3/2/1999
Filing Party
Defendant(2)
Filing Date
2/26/1999
Description
CCA - Cert Compulsory Arbitration
Docket Date
3/2/1999
Filing Party
Defendant(2)
Filing Date
2/17/1999
Description
AFS - Affidavit Of Service
Docket Date
2/18/1999
Filing Party
NOTE:
P3 SERVED 02-11-99
Filing Date
2/17/1999
Description
SUM - Summons
Docket Date
2/19/1999
Filing Party
Plaintiff(1)
Filing Date
2/5/1999
Description
AFS - Affidavit Of Service
Docket Date
2/8/1999
Filing Party
Plaintiff(1)
NOTE:
P2 SERVED 1-29-99
Filing Date
2/5/1999
Description
AFS - Affidavit Of Service
Docket Date
2/8/1999
Filing Party
Plaintiff(1)
NOTE:
P4 SERVED 1-29-99
Filing Date
2/5/1999
Description
SUM - Summons
Docket Date
2/8/1999
Filing Party
Plaintiff(1)
Filing Date
12/31/1998
Description
COM - Complaint
Docket Date
1/5/1999
Filing Party
Plaintiff(1)
Filing Date
12/31/1998
Description
CCA - Cert Compulsory Arbitration
Docket Date
1/5/1999
Filing Party
Plaintiff(1)
Case Calendar
There are no calendar events on file
Judgments
Date
(F)or / (A)gainst
Amount
Frequency
Type
Status
No records found.