« Return to search results
Case Information
Case Number:
CV1998-020884
Judge:
Pineda, Susanna
File Date:
11/17/1998
Location:
Downtown
Case Type:
Civil
Party Information
Party Name
Relationship
Sex
Attorney
Party Name
Eldon Hemphill
Relationship
Plaintiff
Sex
Male
Attorney
Kevin Beckwith
Party Name
Lindco Equipment & Supply Inc
Relationship
Defendant
Sex
None
Attorney
KENDALL STEELE
Party Name
Ralph Lindsay
Relationship
Defendant
Sex
Male
Attorney
John Gemmil
Party Name
Maryann Lindsay
Relationship
Defendant
Sex
Female
Attorney
John Gemmil
Case Documents
Filing Date
Description
Docket Date
Filing Party
Filing Date
12/14/2000
Description
ODI - Order Of Dismissal
Docket Date
1/8/2001
Filing Party
Defendant(2)
NOTE:
WITH PREJUDICE
Filing Date
12/14/2000
Description
SFD - Stipulation For Dismissal
Docket Date
1/8/2001
Filing Party
Defendant(2)
NOTE:
WITH PREJUDICE
Filing Date
11/21/2000
Description
078 - ME: Case On Dismissal Calendar
Docket Date
11/24/2000
Filing Party
Filing Date
11/9/2000
Description
NOS - Notice Of Settlement
Docket Date
11/20/2000
Filing Party
Defendant(2)
Filing Date
5/9/2000
Description
REL - Reply
Docket Date
5/23/2000
Filing Party
Defendant(2)
NOTE:
DEFS/IN SUPPORT OF THEIR MOTION TO DISMISS COUNT FOUR OF PLA COMPLAINT
Filing Date
5/5/2000
Description
063 - ME: Stipulation Of Counsel
Docket Date
5/9/2000
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/5/2000
Description
019 - ME: Ruling
Docket Date
5/9/2000
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/28/2000
Description
027 - ME: Pretrial Conference
Docket Date
5/2/2000
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/28/2000
Description
RES - Response
Docket Date
5/8/2000
Filing Party
Plaintiff(1)
NOTE:
TO DEFS SEVENTH MOTION IN LIMINE
Filing Date
4/25/2000
Description
MOT - Motion
Docket Date
5/6/2000
Filing Party
Plaintiff(1)
NOTE:
SECOND/ IN LIMINE
Filing Date
4/24/2000
Description
019 - ME: Ruling
Docket Date
4/26/2000
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/24/2000
Description
REQ - Request
Docket Date
5/4/2000
Filing Party
Defendant(2)
NOTE:
VOIR DIRE QUESTIONS
Filing Date
4/24/2000
Description
REQ - Request
Docket Date
5/5/2000
Filing Party
Plaintiff(1)
NOTE:
PROPOSED VOIR DIRE QUESTIONS
Filing Date
4/24/2000
Description
MEM - Memorandum
Docket Date
5/5/2000
Filing Party
Plaintiff(1)
NOTE:
TRIAL
Filing Date
4/24/2000
Description
MCO - Motion To Continue
Docket Date
5/5/2000
Filing Party
Plaintiff(1)
NOTE:
TRIAL
Filing Date
4/24/2000
Description
RES - Response
Docket Date
5/5/2000
Filing Party
Plaintiff(1)
NOTE:
TO MOTION TO DISMISS COUNT FOUR OF PLAS COMPLAINT
Filing Date
4/20/2000
Description
RES - Response
Docket Date
5/2/2000
Filing Party
Plaintiff(1)
NOTE:
TO DEF MOTIONS IN LIMINE
Filing Date
4/20/2000
Description
RES - Response
Docket Date
5/3/2000
Filing Party
Defendant(2)
NOTE:
SUPPLEMENTAL - TO PLAS MOTION IN LIMINE RE: EVIDENCE CONCERNING PLAS INCOME TAX; RETURNS AND FINANCIAL RECORDS
Filing Date
4/20/2000
Description
AFF - Affidavit
Docket Date
5/3/2000
Filing Party
Plaintiff(1)
NOTE:
PURSUANT TO RULE IV(G) UNIFORM RULES OF PRACTICE
Filing Date
4/20/2000
Description
STA - Statement
Docket Date
5/3/2000
Filing Party
Plaintiff(1)
NOTE:
SEPARATE LOCAL RULE 3.2
Filing Date
4/20/2000
Description
MOT - Motion
Docket Date
5/3/2000
Filing Party
Plaintiff(1)
NOTE:
TO COMPEL
Filing Date
4/20/2000
Description
NOT - Notice
Docket Date
5/3/2000
Filing Party
Defendant(2)
NOTE:
OF WITHDRAWAL OF DEFS 5TH MOTION IN LIMINE RE: ARIZONA RULES OF EVIDENCE RULE; 403
Filing Date
4/20/2000
Description
RES - Response
Docket Date
5/3/2000
Filing Party
Defendant(2)
NOTE:
TO MOTIONS IN LIMINE
Filing Date
4/18/2000
Description
MOT - Motion
Docket Date
4/26/2000
Filing Party
Defendant(2)
NOTE:
5TH - IN LIMINE
Filing Date
4/18/2000
Description
STA - Statement
Docket Date
4/27/2000
Filing Party
Plaintiff(1)
NOTE:
JOINT PRETRIAL
Filing Date
4/14/2000
Description
MOT - Motion
Docket Date
4/27/2000
Filing Party
Defendant(2)
NOTE:
FOURTH - IN LIMINE
Filing Date
4/14/2000
Description
MOT - Motion
Docket Date
4/27/2000
Filing Party
Defendant(2)
NOTE:
2ND - IN LIMINE
Filing Date
4/14/2000
Description
MOT - Motion
Docket Date
4/25/2000
Filing Party
Plaintiff(1)
NOTE:
IN LIMINE
Filing Date
4/14/2000
Description
NSD - Notice of Service Re: 26.1 Disclosure
Docket Date
4/26/2000
Filing Party
Plaintiff(1)
NOTE:
7TH SUPPLEMENT
Filing Date
4/14/2000
Description
MOT - Motion
Docket Date
4/26/2000
Filing Party
Defendant(2)
NOTE:
6TH - IN LIMINE
Filing Date
4/14/2000
Description
MOT - Motion
Docket Date
4/26/2000
Filing Party
Defendant(2)
NOTE:
FIRST - IN LIMINE
Filing Date
4/14/2000
Description
MOT - Motion
Docket Date
4/26/2000
Filing Party
Defendant(2)
NOTE:
7TH - IN LIMINE
Filing Date
4/14/2000
Description
MOT - Motion
Docket Date
4/27/2000
Filing Party
Defendant(2)
NOTE:
THIRD - IN LIMINE
Filing Date
4/13/2000
Description
REL - Reply
Docket Date
4/17/2000
Filing Party
Defendant(2)
NOTE:
IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT RE COUNT III FAILURE TO WARN
Filing Date
4/13/2000
Description
SOF - Statement Of Facts
Docket Date
4/17/2000
Filing Party
Defendant(2)
NOTE:
REPLY/ IN SUPPORT OF DEFS MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT RE COUNT THREE FAILURE TO; WARN
Filing Date
4/11/2000
Description
019 - ME: Ruling
Docket Date
4/17/2000
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/10/2000
Description
LOW - List Of Witnesses/Exhibit/Evidence
Docket Date
4/14/2000
Filing Party
Defendant(2)
NOTE:
FINAL
Filing Date
4/10/2000
Description
MTD - Motion To Dismiss
Docket Date
4/17/2000
Filing Party
Defendant(2)
NOTE:
COUNT FOUR OF PLAS COMPLAINT
Filing Date
4/10/2000
Description
LOW - List Of Witnesses/Exhibit/Evidence
Docket Date
4/17/2000
Filing Party
Plaintiff(1)
NOTE:
FINAL
Filing Date
4/7/2000
Description
REL - Reply
Docket Date
4/17/2000
Filing Party
Defendant(2)
NOTE:
IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO DISMISS COUNT ONE OF PLAS COMPLAINT RE: STRICT LIABILITY
Filing Date
3/29/2000
Description
SOF - Statement Of Facts
Docket Date
4/3/2000
Filing Party
Plaintiff(1)
NOTE:
IN SUPPORT OF ITS RESPONSE TO MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT RE: COUNT 3 FOR FAIL-; URE TO WARN
Filing Date
3/29/2000
Description
RES - Response
Docket Date
4/4/2000
Filing Party
Plaintiff(1)
NOTE:
TO DEFS MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT RE: COUNT THREE FAILURE TO WARN
Filing Date
3/28/2000
Description
RES - Response
Docket Date
4/5/2000
Filing Party
Plaintiff(1)
NOTE:
TO MOTION TO DISMISS COUNT ONE OF PLA COMPLAINT
Filing Date
3/28/2000
Description
ORD - Order
Docket Date
4/6/2000
Filing Party
Plaintiff(1)
NOTE:
EXTENDING TIME FOR PLA TO RESPOND TO DEFS MOTION TO DISMISS
Filing Date
3/21/2000
Description
STP - Stipulation
Docket Date
3/27/2000
Filing Party
Plaintiff(1)
NOTE:
TO EXTEND RESPONSE TO DEFS MOTION TO DISMISS AND MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT
Filing Date
3/20/2000
Description
094 - ME: Oral Argument Set
Docket Date
3/22/2000
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/6/2000
Description
SOF - Statement Of Facts
Docket Date
3/16/2000
Filing Party
Defendant(2)
NOTE:
IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT RE: COUNT THREE FAILURE TO WARN
Filing Date
3/6/2000
Description
MSJ - Motion For Summary Judgment
Docket Date
3/16/2000
Filing Party
Defendant(2)
NOTE:
RE COUNT THREE FAILURE TO WARN
Filing Date
3/6/2000
Description
MTD - Motion To Dismiss
Docket Date
3/17/2000
Filing Party
Defendant(2)
NOTE:
COUNT ONE
Filing Date
3/6/2000
Description
NSD - Notice of Service Re: 26.1 Disclosure
Docket Date
3/18/2000
Filing Party
Plaintiff(1)
NOTE:
6TH SUPPLEMENT
Filing Date
2/15/2000
Description
NSD - Notice of Service Re: 26.1 Disclosure
Docket Date
2/24/2000
Filing Party
Plaintiff(1)
NOTE:
5TH SUPPLEMENT
Filing Date
2/1/2000
Description
ORD - Order
Docket Date
2/3/2000
Filing Party
Defendant(2)
NOTE:
FOR SUBSTITUTION OF LAW FIRMS
Filing Date
1/26/2000
Description
005 - ME: Hearing
Docket Date
1/28/2000
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/24/2000
Description
019 - ME: Ruling
Docket Date
1/27/2000
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/20/2000
Description
NSD - Notice of Service Re: 26.1 Disclosure
Docket Date
2/2/2000
Filing Party
Plaintiff(1)
NOTE:
4TH SUPPLEMENT
Filing Date
1/19/2000
Description
MOT - Motion
Docket Date
1/31/2000
Filing Party
Defendant(2)
NOTE:
FOR SUBSTITUTION OF LAW FIRM
Filing Date
1/10/2000
Description
NSD - Notice of Service Re: 26.1 Disclosure
Docket Date
1/14/2000
Filing Party
Plaintiff(1)
NOTE:
PLAS THIRD SUPPLEMENTAL
Filing Date
1/4/2000
Description
REL - Reply
Docket Date
1/10/2000
Filing Party
Defendant(2)
NOTE:
IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO DISMISS DEFS RALPH AND MARYANN LINDSAY
Filing Date
12/30/1999
Description
ORD - Order
Docket Date
1/3/2000
Filing Party
Plaintiff(1)
NOTE:
EXTENDING DISCLOSURE TIME
Filing Date
12/30/1999
Description
NSD - Notice of Service Re: 26.1 Disclosure
Docket Date
1/6/2000
Filing Party
Plaintiff(1)
NOTE:
2ND SUPPLEMENT
Filing Date
12/27/1999
Description
REL - Reply
Docket Date
1/3/2000
Filing Party
Plaintiff(1)
NOTE:
TO MOTION FOR ORDER COMPELLING DISCOVERY AND DISCLOSURE
Filing Date
12/27/1999
Description
RES - Response
Docket Date
1/3/2000
Filing Party
Plaintiff(1)
NOTE:
TO DEFS MOTION TO DISMISS RALPH AND MARYANN LINDSAY
Filing Date
12/17/1999
Description
STP - Stipulation
Docket Date
12/22/1999
Filing Party
Plaintiff(1)
NOTE:
TO EXTEND TIME FOR EXPERT WITNESS DISCLOSURE
Filing Date
12/16/1999
Description
094 - ME: Oral Argument Set
Docket Date
12/27/1999
Filing Party
Filing Date
12/13/1999
Description
RES - Response
Docket Date
12/18/1999
Filing Party
Defendant(2)
NOTE:
TO PLA MOTION TO COMPEL
Filing Date
12/9/1999
Description
MTD - Motion To Dismiss
Docket Date
12/14/1999
Filing Party
Defendant(2)
NOTE:
DEFS RALPH AND MARYANN LINDSAY
Filing Date
11/22/1999
Description
MOT - Motion
Docket Date
11/30/1999
Filing Party
Plaintiff(1)
NOTE:
FOR ORDER COMPELLING DISCOVERY AND DISCLOSURE
Filing Date
11/22/1999
Description
AFF - Affidavit
Docket Date
11/30/1999
Filing Party
Plaintiff(1)
NOTE:
PURSUANT TO RULE IV(G) UNIFORM RULES OF PRACTICE
Filing Date
11/22/1999
Description
STA - Statement
Docket Date
11/30/1999
Filing Party
Plaintiff(1)
NOTE:
RULE 3.2(H)
Filing Date
10/6/1999
Description
089 - ME: Trial Setting
Docket Date
10/13/1999
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/27/1999
Description
MEM - Memorandum
Docket Date
9/28/1999
Filing Party
Plaintiff(1)
NOTE:
JOINT COMPREHENSIVE PRE TRIAL CONFERENCE
Filing Date
9/27/1999
Description
002 - ME: Hearing Vacated
Docket Date
9/30/1999
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/15/1999
Description
RES - Response
Docket Date
9/21/1999
Filing Party
Defendant(2)
NOTE:
TO PLA MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT REGARDING DEFS SUPPLEMENTAL NOTICE OF; NON-PARTIES AT FAULT
Filing Date
9/10/1999
Description
LOW - List Of Witnesses/Exhibit/Evidence
Docket Date
9/16/1999
Filing Party
Plaintiff(1)
NOTE:
RULE V
Filing Date
9/8/1999
Description
NOT - Notice
Docket Date
9/14/1999
Filing Party
Defendant(2)
NOTE:
OF WITHDRAWAL OF NOTICE OF NON-PARTY AT FAULT AND AMENDED NOTICE OF NON-PARTY; AT FAULT
Filing Date
9/7/1999
Description
REL - Reply
Docket Date
9/14/1999
Filing Party
Plaintiff(1)
NOTE:
TO RESPONSE TO MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT RE: DEFS ALLEGED NON PARTY AT FAULT; TAMROCK TOOLS
Filing Date
8/25/1999
Description
MSJ - Motion For Summary Judgment
Docket Date
8/31/1999
Filing Party
Plaintiff(1)
NOTE:
RE: DEFS SUPPLEMENTAL NOTICE OF NON PARTIES AT FAULT
Filing Date
8/24/1999
Description
NSD - Notice of Service Re: 26.1 Disclosure
Docket Date
8/30/1999
Filing Party
Plaintiff(1)
NOTE:
FIRST SUPPLEMENTAL
Filing Date
8/23/1999
Description
AFF - Affidavit
Docket Date
8/26/1999
Filing Party
Defendant(2)
NOTE:
IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR RULE 56(F) CONTINUANCE
Filing Date
8/23/1999
Description
RES - Response
Docket Date
8/26/1999
Filing Party
Defendant(2)
NOTE:
TO MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT RE: NON-PARTY NOTICE AND REQUEST FOR RULE 56(F); RELIEF
Filing Date
8/23/1999
Description
NOT - Notice
Docket Date
8/26/1999
Filing Party
Plaintiff(1)
NOTE:
SUPPLEMENTAL-OF NON-PARTY AT FAULT
Filing Date
8/12/1999
Description
021 - ME: Nunc Pro Tunc Order
Docket Date
8/18/1999
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/9/1999
Description
STP - Stipulation
Docket Date
8/12/1999
Filing Party
Defendant(2)
NOTE:
TO EXTEND TIME OF RESPONSE TO PLA'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT RE ALLEGED; NON-PARTY AT FAULT, TAMROCK TOOLS
Filing Date
8/5/1999
Description
026 - ME: Pretrial Conference Set
Docket Date
8/13/1999
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/26/1999
Description
MSJ - Motion For Summary Judgment
Docket Date
8/3/1999
Filing Party
Plaintiff(1)
NOTE:
RE: DEFS ALLEGED NON PARTY AT FAULT TAMROCK TOOLS
Filing Date
7/26/1999
Description
SOF - Statement Of Facts
Docket Date
8/3/1999
Filing Party
Plaintiff(1)
NOTE:
IN SUPPORT OF PLAS MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT
Filing Date
7/14/1999
Description
NSD - Notice of Service Re: 26.1 Disclosure
Docket Date
7/26/1999
Filing Party
Plaintiff(1)
Filing Date
6/24/1999
Description
REQ - Request
Docket Date
7/9/1999
Filing Party
Plaintiff(1)
NOTE:
FOR COMPREHENSIVE PRETRIAL CONFERENCE
Filing Date
5/25/1999
Description
NOT - Notice
Docket Date
6/2/1999
Filing Party
Defendant(2)
NOTE:
OF NON-PARTY AT FAULT
Filing Date
4/27/1999
Description
311 - ME: 150 Day Minute Entry
Docket Date
4/27/1999
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/22/1999
Description
JUR - Jury
Docket Date
2/24/1999
Filing Party
Defendant(2)
NOTE:
DEMAND FOR - TRIAL
Filing Date
2/22/1999
Description
CAA - Cert Of Agreement/Arbitration
Docket Date
2/24/1999
Filing Party
Defendant(2)
Filing Date
2/22/1999
Description
ANS - Answer
Docket Date
2/24/1999
Filing Party
Defendant(2)
Filing Date
2/16/1999
Description
SUM - Summons
Docket Date
2/17/1999
Filing Party
Plaintiff(1)
Filing Date
2/16/1999
Description
AFS - Affidavit Of Service
Docket Date
2/18/1999
Filing Party
NOTE:
P3 SERVED 01-29-99
Filing Date
2/16/1999
Description
AFS - Affidavit Of Service
Docket Date
2/18/1999
Filing Party
NOTE:
P2 SERVED 01-29-99
Filing Date
11/17/1998
Description
COM - Complaint
Docket Date
11/19/1998
Filing Party
Plaintiff(1)
Filing Date
11/17/1998
Description
CCA - Cert Compulsory Arbitration
Docket Date
11/19/1998
Filing Party
Plaintiff(1)
Case Calendar
There are no calendar events on file
Judgments
Date
(F)or / (A)gainst
Amount
Frequency
Type
Status
No records found.