Civil Court Case Information - Case History
« Return to search results
Case Information | |||
---|---|---|---|
Case Number: | CV1998-018290 | Judge: | Sinclair, Joan |
File Date: | 10/9/1998 | Location: | Downtown |
Case Type: | Civil |
Party Information | |||
---|---|---|---|
Party Name | Relationship | Sex | Attorney |
Francine Pacifici | Plaintiff | Female | Christopher Zachar |
Todd Allen Jostes | Defendant | Male | Pro Per |
Diamondback Yard Designs Inc | Defendant | None | Pro Per |
Arbitrator | Endorsement Case | Unknown | Barry Sanders |
Case Documents | |||
---|---|---|---|
Filing Date | Description | Docket Date | Filing Party |
12/1/1999 | 047 - ME: Judgment Of Dismissal | 12/1/1999 | |
9/3/1999 | ORD - Order | 9/8/1999 | Defendant(2) |
NOTE: TO WITHDRAW AS ATTORNEY OF RECORD | |||
8/27/1999 | 023 - ME: Order Entered By Court | 9/7/1999 | |
8/18/1999 | LET - Letter | 8/23/1999 | |
8/9/1999 | NOT - Notice | 8/12/1999 | Plaintiff(1) |
NOTE: OF STIPULATED JUDGMENT | |||
8/5/1999 | MOT - Motion | 8/10/1999 | Defendant(2) |
NOTE: TO WITHDRAW AS ATTORNEY OF RECORD | |||
5/11/1999 | STP - Stipulation | 5/20/1999 | Plaintiff(1) |
4/26/1999 | MOT - Motion | 5/5/1999 | Plaintiff(1) |
NOTE: TO STRIKE DEFS ANSWER; MOTION FOR DIRECTED VERDICT | |||
4/16/1999 | ORD - Order | 4/27/1999 | Plaintiff(1) |
NOTE: UNSIGNED | |||
4/16/1999 | 023 - ME: Order Entered By Court | 5/3/1999 | |
4/1/1999 | NOT - Notice | 4/13/1999 | |
NOTE: OF CONTINUANCE OF ARBITRATION HEARING | |||
3/26/1999 | ORD - Order | 4/7/1999 | |
NOTE: RULING ON MOTION TO CONTINUE ARBITRATION HEARING - DENIED | |||
3/23/1999 | AMC - Amended Complaint | 4/5/1999 | Plaintiff(1) |
NOTE: FIRST | |||
3/23/1999 | 311 - ME: 150 Day Minute Entry | 3/23/1999 | |
3/23/1999 | MOT - Motion | 4/5/1999 | Plaintiff(1) |
NOTE: TO AMEND COMPLAINT | |||
3/19/1999 | MCO - Motion To Continue | 3/24/1999 | Plaintiff(1) |
NOTE: ARBITRATION HEARING | |||
1/22/1999 | NOH - Notice Of Hearing | 1/25/1999 | |
NOTE: ARBITRATION | |||
12/30/1998 | 324 - ME: Notice Of Appointment Of Arbitrator | 12/30/1998 | |
12/14/1998 | ANS - Answer | 12/16/1998 | Defendant(2) |
12/14/1998 | CCA - Cert Compulsory Arbitration | 12/16/1998 | Defendant(2) |
12/3/1998 | AAE - Application/Affidavit And Entry Of Default | 12/7/1998 | Plaintiff(1) |
12/3/1998 | AFF - Affidavit | 12/7/1998 | Plaintiff(1) |
12/3/1998 | AFF - Affidavit | 12/7/1998 | Plaintiff(1) |
NOTE: OF DEFAULT | |||
11/5/1998 | AFS - Affidavit Of Service | 11/6/1998 | Plaintiff(1) |
NOTE: P2 SERVED 10-21-98 | |||
11/5/1998 | AFS - Affidavit Of Service | 11/6/1998 | Plaintiff(1) |
NOTE: P3 SERVED 10-21-98 | |||
11/5/1998 | SUM - Summons | 11/6/1998 | Plaintiff(1) |
11/5/1998 | SUM - Summons | 11/6/1998 | Plaintiff(1) |
10/9/1998 | COM - Complaint | 10/13/1998 | Plaintiff(1) |
10/9/1998 | CCA - Cert Compulsory Arbitration | 10/13/1998 | Plaintiff(1) |
Case Calendar | ||
---|---|---|
There are no calendar events on file |
Judgments | |||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
There are no judgments on file |