« Return to search results
Case Information
Case Number:
CV1998-015149
Judge:
Gordon, Michael
File Date:
8/20/1998
Location:
Northeast
Case Type:
Civil
Party Information
Party Name
Relationship
Sex
Attorney
Party Name
Us Collections West Inc
Relationship
Plaintiff
Sex
None
Attorney
Dennis Skarecky
Party Name
Lanny W Polston
Relationship
Defendant
Sex
Male
Attorney
Pro Per
Case Documents
Filing Date
Description
Docket Date
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/11/2013
Description
ARJ - Affidavit: Renewal Of Judgment
Docket Date
7/11/2013
Filing Party
NOTE:
Judgment Renewal Affidavit / efile billing $27
Filing Date
7/14/2008
Description
ARJ - Affidavit: Renewal Of Judgment
Docket Date
7/16/2008
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/29/2003
Description
ARJ - Affidavit: Renewal Of Judgment
Docket Date
9/4/2003
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/2/1999
Description
005 - ME: Hearing
Docket Date
3/4/1999
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/10/1999
Description
004 - ME: Hearing Continued
Docket Date
2/12/1999
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/8/1999
Description
MOT - Motion
Docket Date
2/9/1999
Filing Party
Plaintiff(1)
NOTE:
FOR ORDER FOR GARNISHEE TO APPEAR OR FILE AND SERVE COPY OF ANSWER TO GARNISH-; MENT
Filing Date
2/8/1999
Description
AFS - Affidavit Of Service
Docket Date
2/10/1999
Filing Party
Filing Date
12/2/1998
Description
WGS - Writ Of Garnishment and Summons
Docket Date
12/7/1998
Filing Party
Plaintiff(1)
Filing Date
12/2/1998
Description
AFS - Affidavit Of Service
Docket Date
12/7/1998
Filing Party
Plaintiff(1)
Filing Date
11/25/1998
Description
AAS - Affidavit Of Attempted Service
Docket Date
12/2/1998
Filing Party
Plaintiff(1)
Filing Date
11/2/1998
Description
AWG - Application For Writ Of Garnishment
Docket Date
11/4/1998
Filing Party
Plaintiff(1)
Filing Date
10/19/1998
Description
STA - Statement
Docket Date
10/19/1998
Filing Party
Plaintiff(1)
NOTE:
OF COSTS AND NOTICE OF TAXATION OF COSTS
Filing Date
10/16/1998
Description
049 - ME: Judgment Signed
Docket Date
10/21/1998
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/14/1998 8:35:00 AM
Description
JUD - Judgment
Docket Date
10/14/1998 8:35:00 AM
Filing Party
NOTE:
Posted during iCIS Conversion
Filing Date
9/15/1998
Description
AAE - Application/Affidavit And Entry Of Default
Docket Date
9/21/1998
Filing Party
Plaintiff(1)
Filing Date
8/27/1998
Description
AFS - Affidavit Of Service
Docket Date
8/28/1998
Filing Party
Plaintiff(1)
NOTE:
P2 SERVED 8/22/98
Filing Date
8/27/1998
Description
SUM - Summons
Docket Date
8/31/1998
Filing Party
Plaintiff(1)
Filing Date
8/20/1998
Description
COM - Complaint
Docket Date
8/24/1998
Filing Party
Plaintiff(1)
Filing Date
8/20/1998
Description
CCA - Cert Compulsory Arbitration
Docket Date
8/24/1998
Filing Party
Plaintiff(1)
Case Calendar
There are no calendar events on file
Judgments
Date
(F)or / (A)gainst
Amount
Frequency
Type
Status
Date
10/14/1998
(F)or / (A)gainst
F:
Us Collections West Inc
A: Lanny W Polston Sr.
A: Lanny W Polston Sr.
Amount
$39,748.42
Frequency
One Time
Type
Affidavit of Renewal of Judgment
Status
Modified
Date
10/14/1998
(F)or / (A)gainst
F:
Us Collections West Inc
A: Lanny W Polston Sr.
A: Lanny W Polston Sr.
Amount
$30,457.93
Frequency
One Time
Type
Affidavit of Renewal of Judgment
Status
Modified
Date
10/14/1998
(F)or / (A)gainst
F:
Us Collections West Inc
A: Lanny W Polston Sr.
A: Lanny W Polston Sr.
Amount
$21,147.90
Frequency
One Time
Type
Affidavit of Renewal of Judgment
Status
Modified
Date
10/14/1998
(F)or / (A)gainst
F:
Us Collections West Inc
A: Lanny W Polston Sr.
A: Lanny W Polston Sr.
Amount
$600.00
Frequency
One Time
Type
Judgment Only
Status
Modified
Date
10/14/1998
(F)or / (A)gainst
F:
Us Collections West Inc
A: Lanny W Polston Sr.
A: Lanny W Polston Sr.
Amount
$200.00
Frequency
One Time
Type
Judgment Only
Status
Modified
Date
10/14/1998
(F)or / (A)gainst
F:
Us Collections West Inc
A: Lanny W Polston Sr.
A: Lanny W Polston Sr.
Amount
$20,770.72
Frequency
One Time
Type
Judgment Only
Status
Modified