Civil Court Case Information - Case History
« Return to search results
Case Information | |||
---|---|---|---|
Case Number: | CV1998-010411 | Judge: | Blaney, Scott |
File Date: | 6/9/1998 | Location: | Downtown |
Case Type: | Civil |
Party Information | |||
---|---|---|---|
Party Name | Relationship | Sex | Attorney |
Bradford K Mortz | Plaintiff | Male | Clark Watkin |
Karel A Mortz | Plaintiff | Female | Clark Watkin |
Diamondback Yard Designs Inc | Defendant | None | John Campbell |
Todd A Jostes | Defendant | Male | John Campbell |
Cami L Jostes | Defendant | Female | John Campbell |
Kevin Caldwell | Defendant | Male | Robin Martindale |
Julie Jostes van den Ber | Defendant | Female | John Campbell |
Christopher P van den Ber | Defendant | Male | John Campbell |
Kelly Caldwell | Defendant | Female | Robin Martindale |
Case Documents | |||
---|---|---|---|
Filing Date | Description | Docket Date | Filing Party |
12/15/1999 | 047 - ME: Judgment Of Dismissal | 12/15/1999 | |
3/11/1999 | 079 - ME: Case Dismissed - Partial | 3/17/1999 | |
11/17/1998 | 311 - ME: 150 Day Minute Entry | 11/17/1998 | |
8/3/1998 | ANS - Answer | 8/5/1998 | Defendant(6) |
8/3/1998 | CCA - Cert Compulsory Arbitration | 8/6/1998 | Defendant(6) |
NOTE: CONTROVERTING | |||
7/24/1998 | 079 - ME: Case Dismissed - Partial | 7/30/1998 | |
7/24/1998 | ODI - Order Of Dismissal | 7/31/1998 | Plaintiff(1) |
NOTE: AS TO P7-8 ONLY WITHOUT PREJUDICE | |||
7/21/1998 | ADE - Application For Default | 7/24/1998 | Plaintiff(1) |
NOTE: E | |||
7/21/1998 | AED - Affidavit And Entry Of Default | 7/24/1998 | Plaintiff(1) |
7/2/1998 | MTD - Motion To Dismiss | 7/8/1998 | Plaintiff(1) |
NOTE: STIPULATED | |||
7/1/1998 | AFS - Affidavit Of Service | 7/2/1998 | Plaintiff(1) |
NOTE: P6,9 SERVED 6-18-98 | |||
7/1/1998 | SUM - Summons | 7/7/1998 | Plaintiff(1) |
6/30/1998 | 314 - ME: Bankruptcy | 7/7/1998 | |
6/23/1998 | 056 - ME: Hearing Set | 7/7/1998 | |
6/18/1998 | AFS - Affidavit Of Service | 6/19/1998 | Plaintiff(1) |
NOTE: P7-8 SERVED 6-16-98 | |||
6/18/1998 | ANS - Answer | 6/22/1998 | Defendant(3) |
NOTE: REQUEST FOR HEARING ON PLA APPLICATION FOR PROVISIONAL REMEDY | |||
6/18/1998 | SUM - Summons | 6/22/1998 | Plaintiff(1) |
6/15/1998 | SUM - Summons | 6/18/1998 | Plaintiff(1) |
6/15/1998 | AFS - Affidavit Of Service | 6/18/1998 | Plaintiff(1) |
6/15/1998 | SUM - Summons | 6/18/1998 | Plaintiff(1) |
6/15/1998 | NOT - Notice | 6/17/1998 | Plaintiff(1) |
NOTE: OF APPLICATION FOR PROVISIONAL REMEDY | |||
6/15/1998 | NOT - Notice | 6/17/1998 | Plaintiff(1) |
NOTE: OF APPLICATION FOR PROVISIONAL REMEDY | |||
6/15/1998 | NOT - Notice | 6/17/1998 | Plaintiff(1) |
NOTE: OF APPLICATION FOR PROVISIONAL REMEDY | |||
6/15/1998 | AFS - Affidavit Of Service | 6/18/1998 | Plaintiff(1) |
6/9/1998 | COM - Complaint | 6/11/1998 | Plaintiff(1) |
6/9/1998 | CCA - Cert Compulsory Arbitration | 6/11/1998 | Plaintiff(1) |
NOTE: E | |||
6/9/1998 | APL - Application | 6/11/1998 | Plaintiff(1) |
NOTE: FOR ISSUANCE OF PROVISIONAL REMEDY WITH NOTICE | |||
6/9/1998 | APL - Application | 6/11/1998 | Plaintiff(1) |
NOTE: FOR ISSUANCE OF PROVISIONAL REMEDY WITH NOTICE | |||
6/9/1998 | APL - Application | 6/11/1998 | Plaintiff(1) |
NOTE: FOR ISSUANCE OF PROVISIONAL REMEDY WITH NOTICE |
Case Calendar | ||
---|---|---|
There are no calendar events on file |
Judgments | |||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
There are no judgments on file |