« Return to search results
Case Information
Case Number:
CV1998-001015
Judge:
Adleman, Jay
File Date:
1/20/1998
Location:
Downtown
Case Type:
Civil
Party Information
Party Name
Relationship
Sex
Attorney
Party Name
Anka Dunatov
Relationship
Plaintiff
Sex
Female
Attorney
R McCauley
Party Name
Trixie J Benjamin
Relationship
Defendant
Sex
Female
Attorney
SALLY ODEGARD
Party Name
Daphnie Moore
Relationship
Defendant
Sex
Female
Attorney
SALLY ODEGARD
Party Name
Arbitrator
Relationship
Endorsement Case
Sex
Unknown
Attorney
Gerald Kriehn
Case Documents
Filing Date
Description
Docket Date
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/27/1999
Description
ODI - Order Of Dismissal
Docket Date
2/1/1999
Filing Party
NOTE:
WITH PREJUDICE
Filing Date
1/13/1999
Description
SFD - Stipulation For Dismissal
Docket Date
1/15/1999
Filing Party
Defendant(2)
NOTE:
W/PREJUDICE
Filing Date
1/13/1999
Description
NOS - Notice Of Settlement
Docket Date
1/15/1999
Filing Party
Defendant(2)
Filing Date
12/21/1998
Description
OCC - Order Continuing on Inactive/Dismissal Calendar
Docket Date
12/22/1998
Filing Party
Filing Date
12/21/1998
Description
084 - ME: Case Continued Inactive Calendar
Docket Date
12/23/1998
Filing Party
Filing Date
12/15/1998
Description
SFC - Stipulation For Continuance
Docket Date
12/16/1998
Filing Party
Plaintiff(1)
NOTE:
ON THE INACTIVE CALENDAR
Filing Date
6/30/1998
Description
311 - ME: 150 Day Minute Entry
Docket Date
6/30/1998
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/17/1998
Description
324 - ME: Notice Of Appointment Of Arbitrator
Docket Date
6/17/1998
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/11/1998
Description
MOT - Motion
Docket Date
6/12/1998
Filing Party
Plaintiff(1)
NOTE:
TO STRIKE ARBITRATOR
Filing Date
6/4/1998
Description
ANS - Answer
Docket Date
6/5/1998
Filing Party
Defendant(2)
Filing Date
6/4/1998
Description
CAA - Cert Of Agreement/Arbitration
Docket Date
6/9/1998
Filing Party
Defendant(2)
Filing Date
6/3/1998
Description
324 - ME: Notice Of Appointment Of Arbitrator
Docket Date
6/3/1998
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/20/1998
Description
AFS - Affidavit Of Service
Docket Date
5/22/1998
Filing Party
Plaintiff(1)
NOTE:
P2 SERVED 5/16/98
Filing Date
5/20/1998
Description
AFS - Affidavit Of Service
Docket Date
5/22/1998
Filing Party
Plaintiff(1)
NOTE:
P3 SERVED 5/16/98
Filing Date
5/20/1998
Description
SUM - Summons
Docket Date
5/22/1998
Filing Party
Plaintiff(1)
Filing Date
5/5/1998
Description
322 - ME: Notice Of Intent To Dismiss
Docket Date
5/5/1998
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/20/1998
Description
COM - Complaint
Docket Date
1/22/1998
Filing Party
Plaintiff(1)
Filing Date
1/20/1998
Description
CCA - Cert Compulsory Arbitration
Docket Date
1/22/1998
Filing Party
Plaintiff(1)
Case Calendar
There are no calendar events on file
Judgments
Date
(F)or / (A)gainst
Amount
Frequency
Type
Status
No records found.