« Return to search results
Case Information
Case Number:
CV1997-011182
Judge:
Blaney, Scott
File Date:
6/17/1997
Location:
Downtown
Case Type:
Civil
Party Information
Party Name
Relationship
Sex
Attorney
Party Name
Antoinette Hemphill
Relationship
Plaintiff
Sex
Female
Attorney
Scott Davis
Party Name
Dominique Gray
Relationship
In The Matter Of (IMO)
Sex
Male
Attorney
Pro Per
Party Name
Jamie Hemphill
Relationship
Defendant
Sex
Female
Attorney
Benjamin Thomas
Party Name
Arbitrator
Relationship
Endorsement Case
Sex
Unknown
Attorney
Pamela Covella
Case Documents
Filing Date
Description
Docket Date
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/1/1999
Description
049 - ME: Judgment Signed
Docket Date
3/3/1999
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/25/1999 5:00:00 PM
Description
JUD - Judgment
Docket Date
2/25/1999 5:00:00 PM
Filing Party
NOTE:
Posted during iCIS Conversion
Filing Date
2/25/1999
Description
NOS - Notice Of Settlement
Docket Date
3/10/1999
Filing Party
NOTE:
AGREEMENT AND ASSIGNMENT
Filing Date
2/5/1999
Description
NOT - Notice
Docket Date
2/8/1999
Filing Party
NOTE:
REFERRAL OF CASE TO JUDGE FOR DISMISSAL
Filing Date
10/28/1998
Description
NOH - Notice Of Hearing
Docket Date
10/29/1998
Filing Party
NOTE:
OF ARBITRATOR
Filing Date
10/2/1998
Description
NOT - Notice
Docket Date
10/7/1998
Filing Party
Defendant(3)
NOTE:
OF NON-PARTIES AT FAULT
Filing Date
8/26/1998
Description
324 - ME: Notice Of Appointment Of Arbitrator
Docket Date
8/26/1998
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/18/1998
Description
350 - ME: Transfer To Arbitration
Docket Date
8/21/1998
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/6/1998
Description
026 - ME: Pretrial Conference Set
Docket Date
8/20/1998
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/15/1998
Description
STP - Stipulation
Docket Date
7/16/1998
Filing Party
Plaintiff(1)
NOTE:
MOTION TO SET ASIDE DISMISSAL AND TO REINSTATE ON THE INACTIVE CALENDAR
Filing Date
5/26/1998
Description
047 - ME: Judgment Of Dismissal
Docket Date
5/26/1998
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/19/1998
Description
CAA - Cert Of Agreement/Arbitration
Docket Date
2/20/1998
Filing Party
Defendant(3)
Filing Date
2/19/1998
Description
ANS - Answer
Docket Date
2/23/1998
Filing Party
Defendant(3)
Filing Date
1/30/1998
Description
AAE - Application/Affidavit And Entry Of Default
Docket Date
2/5/1998
Filing Party
Plaintiff(1)
Filing Date
1/30/1998
Description
NOT - Notice
Docket Date
2/5/1998
Filing Party
Plaintiff(1)
NOTE:
AND APPLICATION FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT
Filing Date
11/25/1997
Description
311 - ME: 150 Day Minute Entry
Docket Date
11/25/1997
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/7/1997
Description
SUM - Summons
Docket Date
10/10/1997
Filing Party
Plaintiff(1)
Filing Date
10/7/1997
Description
AFS - Affidavit Of Service
Docket Date
10/10/1997
Filing Party
Plaintiff(1)
NOTE:
SVD P3 100697
Filing Date
9/30/1997
Description
322 - ME: Notice Of Intent To Dismiss
Docket Date
9/30/1997
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/17/1997
Description
COM - Complaint
Docket Date
6/19/1997
Filing Party
Plaintiff(1)
Filing Date
6/17/1997
Description
MOT - Motion
Docket Date
6/19/1997
Filing Party
Plaintiff(1)
NOTE:
FOR ACCELERATED RULING
Filing Date
6/17/1997
Description
MOT - Motion
Docket Date
6/19/1997
Filing Party
Plaintiff(1)
NOTE:
FOR PERMISSIVE JOINDER PURSUANT TO RULE 20A OF THE ARIZ RULE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE
Case Calendar
There are no calendar events on file
Judgments
Date
(F)or / (A)gainst
Amount
Frequency
Type
Status
Date
2/25/1999
(F)or / (A)gainst
F:  Dominique Gray
A: Jamie Hemphill
Amount
$40,000.00
Frequency
One Time
Type
Judgment Only
Status