« Return to search results
Case Information
Case Number:
CV1996-020534
Judge:
Blanchard, John
File Date:
11/14/1996
Location:
Downtown
Case Type:
Civil
Party Information
Party Name
Relationship
Sex
Attorney
Party Name
Anitra Hemphill
Relationship
Plaintiff
Sex
Female
Attorney
GREGORY NOVAK
Party Name
Richard Lloyd Manz
Relationship
Defendant
Sex
Male
Attorney
Lloyd Andrews
Party Name
Oscar Gerardo Guerrero
Relationship
Defendant
Sex
Male
Attorney
Jack Hirsch
Case Documents
Filing Date
Description
Docket Date
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/25/1997
Description
053 - ME: Case Consolidation
Docket Date
2/28/1997
Filing Party
NOTE:
CV96-20534 CONS INTO CV96-16481
Filing Date
12/12/1996
Description
ANS - Answer
Docket Date
12/16/1996
Filing Party
Defendant(2)
Filing Date
12/12/1996
Description
CCA - Cert Compulsory Arbitration
Docket Date
12/27/1996
Filing Party
Defendant(2)
Filing Date
12/12/1996
Description
JUR - Jury
Docket Date
12/27/1996
Filing Party
Defendant(2)
NOTE:
DEMAND FOR TRIAL
Filing Date
12/2/1996
Description
SAS - Summons & Affidavit Of Service
Docket Date
12/4/1996
Filing Party
Plaintiff(1)
NOTE:
P2 11-26-96
Filing Date
11/29/1996
Description
ANS - Answer
Docket Date
12/4/1996
Filing Party
Defendant(3)
Filing Date
11/29/1996
Description
CCA - Cert Compulsory Arbitration
Docket Date
12/16/1996
Filing Party
Defendant(3)
Filing Date
11/25/1996
Description
AFS - Affidavit Of Service
Docket Date
11/29/1996
Filing Party
Plaintiff(1)
NOTE:
P3 11-21-96
Filing Date
11/14/1996
Description
COM - Complaint
Docket Date
11/15/1996
Filing Party
Plaintiff(1)
Filing Date
11/14/1996
Description
CCA - Cert Compulsory Arbitration
Docket Date
11/15/1996
Filing Party
Plaintiff(1)
Case Calendar
There are no calendar events on file
Judgments
Date
(F)or / (A)gainst
Amount
Frequency
Type
Status
No records found.