« Return to search results Civil Court Case Information - Case History
Case Information
Case Number: CV1996-018304 Judge: Brodman, Roger
File Date: 10/10/1996 Location: Downtown
Case Type: Civil  
Party Information
Party Name Relationship Sex Attorney
Household Finance Corp III   Plaintiff  None  STANLEY HAMMERMAN 
Eugene Steinberg   Defendant  Male  Pro Per 
Case Documents
Filing Date Description Docket Date Filing Party
1/30/1997  LET - Letter  2/12/1997   
1/9/1997  ORD - Order  1/16/1997  Plaintiff(1)  
NOTE: FOR APPEARANCE IN SUPPL PROCEEDINGS 
12/24/1996  PTT - Petition  1/6/1997  Plaintiff(1)  
NOTE: IN SUPPORT OF SUPPL PROCEEDINGS 
10/15/1996  AFF - Affidavit  10/30/1996  Plaintiff(1)  
NOTE: OF MAILING 
10/10/1996 9:01:00 AM  JUD - Judgment  10/10/1996 9:01:00 AM   
NOTE: Posted during iCIS Conversion 
10/10/1996  COM - Complaint  10/15/1996  Plaintiff(1)  
10/10/1996  NFJ - Notice of Filing Foreign Judgment  10/15/1996  Plaintiff(1)  
Case Calendar
There are no calendar events on file
Judgments
Date (F)or / (A)gainst Amount Frequency Type Status
  F:Household Finance Corp III  $4,280.48  One Time  Judgment Only   
  A: Eugene Steinberg         
click here for Law Library Resource Center