« Return to search results
Case Information
Case Number:
CV1996-010562
Judge:
Whitten, Christopher
File Date:
6/17/1996
Location:
Downtown
Case Type:
Civil
Party Information
Party Name
Relationship
Sex
Attorney
Party Name
Rosa Emma Parra
Relationship
Plaintiff
Sex
Female
Attorney
Augustine Jimenez
Party Name
Jamie Charlene Hemphill
Relationship
Defendant
Sex
Female
Attorney
Benjamin Thomas
Case Documents
Filing Date
Description
Docket Date
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/13/2001
Description
NRD - Notice Of Release Of Deposit
Docket Date
5/2/2001
Filing Party
NOTE:
$75.00; THOMAS & ELARDO
Filing Date
3/1/2001
Description
ORD - Order
Docket Date
3/30/2001
Filing Party
Defendant(2)
NOTE:
TO RELEASE EXONERATE BOND
Filing Date
2/12/2001
Description
MEB - Meb
Docket Date
2/23/2001
Filing Party
Defendant(2)
Filing Date
7/28/1997
Description
042 - ME: Case Dismissed - Full
Docket Date
7/30/1997
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/24/1997
Description
ODI - Order Of Dismissal
Docket Date
7/28/1997
Filing Party
Defendant(2)
NOTE:
WITH PREJUDICE
Filing Date
7/11/1997
Description
NOS - Notice Of Settlement
Docket Date
7/14/1997
Filing Party
Defendant(2)
Filing Date
7/11/1997
Description
SFD - Stipulation For Dismissal
Docket Date
7/16/1997
Filing Party
Defendant(2)
NOTE:
WITH PREJUDICE
Filing Date
6/26/1997
Description
078 - ME: Case On Dismissal Calendar
Docket Date
6/27/1997
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/23/1997
Description
NOS - Notice Of Settlement
Docket Date
6/27/1997
Filing Party
Defendant(2)
Filing Date
6/19/1997
Description
MOT - Motion
Docket Date
6/24/1997
Filing Party
Defendant(2)
NOTE:
FOR TRAIL CONTINUANCE
Filing Date
6/16/1997
Description
REL - Reply
Docket Date
6/20/1997
Filing Party
Plaintiff(1)
NOTE:
TO DEFENDANTS MOTION IN LIMINE
Filing Date
6/3/1997
Description
085 - ME: Conference
Docket Date
6/4/1997
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/29/1997
Description
MOT - Motion
Docket Date
6/4/1997
Filing Party
Defendant(2)
NOTE:
IN LIMINE
Filing Date
5/29/1997
Description
OBJ - Objection/Opposition.
Docket Date
6/4/1997
Filing Party
Defendant(2)
NOTE:
TO PLAINTIFFS EXHIBITS
Filing Date
5/8/1997
Description
NOT - Notice
Docket Date
5/15/1997
Filing Party
Plaintiff(1)
NOTE:
OF CONFLICT & MOTION TO CONTINUE
Filing Date
4/10/1997
Description
NOT - Notice
Docket Date
4/25/1997
Filing Party
Defendant(2)
NOTE:
OF TRIAL CONFLICT
Filing Date
4/4/1997
Description
089 - ME: Trial Setting
Docket Date
4/4/1997
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/5/1997
Description
LWE - List Of Witnesses/Exhibits
Docket Date
3/17/1997
Filing Party
Plaintiff(1)
Filing Date
2/21/1997 5:17:00 PM
Description
JUD - Judgment
Docket Date
2/21/1997 5:17:00 PM
Filing Party
NOTE:
Posted during iCIS Conversion
Filing Date
2/21/1997
Description
STA - Statement
Docket Date
3/11/1997
Filing Party
Plaintiff(1)
NOTE:
OF COSTS
Filing Date
2/21/1997
Description
STA - Statement
Docket Date
3/12/1997
Filing Party
Defendant(2)
NOTE:
PRE ARB HEARING
Filing Date
2/18/1997
Description
LWE - List Of Witnesses/Exhibits
Docket Date
3/7/1997
Filing Party
Defendant(2)
Filing Date
2/18/1997
Description
AFA - Appeal From Arbitration
Docket Date
3/11/1997
Filing Party
Defendant(2)
NOTE:
NOTICE OF/AND MOTION TO SET AND DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL
Filing Date
2/18/1997
Description
NDC - Notice Of Deposit With Court
Docket Date
3/14/1997
Filing Party
NOTE:
AMT $75 FOR ARB APPEAL
Filing Date
2/5/1997
Description
NAA - Naa
Docket Date
3/18/1997
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/4/1997
Description
ORD - Order
Docket Date
2/19/1997
Filing Party
Defendant(2)
NOTE:
CONTINUING ARB HEARING
Filing Date
12/30/1996
Description
LET - Letter
Docket Date
1/8/1997
Filing Party
Filing Date
12/11/1996
Description
ORD - Order
Docket Date
12/27/1996
Filing Party
NOTE:
EXTIENDING TIME TO HOLD ARB HEARING BEYOND 90 DAY PERIOD
Filing Date
12/6/1996
Description
NOH - Notice Of Hearing
Docket Date
12/20/1996
Filing Party
Filing Date
11/20/1996
Description
025 - ME: Case Status Minute Entry
Docket Date
12/3/1996
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/30/1996
Description
NAA - Naa
Docket Date
10/7/1996
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/10/1996
Description
NAA - Naa
Docket Date
9/19/1996
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/20/1996
Description
NAA - Naa
Docket Date
8/21/1996
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/2/1996
Description
CCA - Cert Compulsory Arbitration
Docket Date
7/3/1996
Filing Party
Defendant(2)
Filing Date
7/2/1996
Description
ANS - Answer
Docket Date
7/3/1996
Filing Party
Defendant(2)
Filing Date
6/21/1996
Description
SAS - Summons & Affidavit Of Service
Docket Date
6/25/1996
Filing Party
Plaintiff(1)
NOTE:
P2/SERVED 6-18-96
Filing Date
6/17/1996
Description
CCA - Cert Compulsory Arbitration
Docket Date
6/19/1996
Filing Party
Plaintiff(1)
Filing Date
6/17/1996
Description
COM - Complaint
Docket Date
6/19/1996
Filing Party
Plaintiff(1)
Case Calendar
There are no calendar events on file
Judgments
Date
(F)or / (A)gainst
Amount
Frequency
Type
Status
Date
2/21/1997
(F)or / (A)gainst
F:
Rosa Emma Parra
A: Jamie Charlene Hemphill
A: Jamie Charlene Hemphill
Amount
$407.25
Frequency
One Time
Type
Judgment Only
Status
Date
2/21/1997
(F)or / (A)gainst
F:
Rosa Emma Parra
A: Jamie Charlene Hemphill
A: Jamie Charlene Hemphill
Amount
$8,500.00
Frequency
One Time
Type
Judgment Only
Status