Civil Court Case Information - Case History
« Return to search results
Case Information | |||
---|---|---|---|
Case Number: | CV1996-009117 | Judge: | Pineda, Susanna |
File Date: | 5/23/1996 | Location: | Downtown |
Case Type: | Civil |
Party Information | |||
---|---|---|---|
Party Name | Relationship | Sex | Attorney |
Robert L Meythaler | Plaintiff | Male | Jeffrey Kaufman |
Earl J Cline | Plaintiff | Male | Jeffrey Kaufman |
Todd A Jostes | Defendant | Male | Pro Per |
Hayes O Scott | Defendant | Male | Pro Per |
Laura Scott | Defendant | Female | Pro Per |
Tammy Jostes | Defendant | Female | Pro Per |
Case Documents | |||
---|---|---|---|
Filing Date | Description | Docket Date | Filing Party |
11/25/1996 | 049 - ME: Judgment Signed | 12/4/1996 | |
11/22/1996 11:22:00 PM | DJU - Default Judgment | 11/22/1996 11:22:00 PM | |
NOTE: Posted during iCIS Conversion | |||
11/14/1996 | STA - Statement | 12/2/1996 | Plaintiff(1) |
NOTE: OF COSTS AND NOTICE OF TAXATION OF COSTS | |||
11/14/1996 | NDI - Notice Of Dismissal | 12/3/1996 | Plaintiff(1) |
NOTE: WITHOUT PREJ AGAINST DEFS TODD JOSTES AND JANE DOE JOSTES ONLY | |||
11/14/1996 | MOT - Motion | 12/3/1996 | Plaintiff(1) |
NOTE: AND AFF FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT JDG WITHOUT HEARING | |||
10/20/1996 | 311 - ME: 150 Day Minute Entry | 10/20/1996 | |
9/3/1996 | ADE - Application For Default | 9/10/1996 | Plaintiff(1) |
9/3/1996 | EDE - Entry Of Default | 9/10/1996 | Plaintiff(1) |
9/3/1996 | ADE - Application For Default | 9/10/1996 | Plaintiff(1) |
7/30/1996 | ACS - Acceptance Of Service | 7/31/1996 | Plaintiff(1) |
NOTE: P5 7-22-96 | |||
7/30/1996 | ACS - Acceptance Of Service | 7/31/1996 | Plaintiff(1) |
NOTE: P4 7-22-96 | |||
7/30/1996 | SUM - Summons | 8/6/1996 | Plaintiff(1) |
6/18/1996 | SAS - Summons & Affidavit Of Service | 6/19/1996 | Plaintiff(1) |
NOTE: P3,6 6-6-96 | |||
5/23/1996 | CCA - Cert Compulsory Arbitration | 5/28/1996 | Plaintiff(1) |
5/23/1996 | COM - Complaint | 5/28/1996 | Plaintiff(1) |
Case Calendar | ||
---|---|---|
There are no calendar events on file |
Judgments | |||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Date | (F)or / (A)gainst | Amount | Frequency | Type | Status |
F:Robert L Meythaler | $250.50 | One Time | Default Judgment | ||
A: Hayes O Scott III | |||||
F:Robert L Meythaler | $21,572.86 | One Time | Default Judgment | ||
A: Hayes O Scott III | |||||
F:Robert L Meythaler | $114,400.00 | One Time | Default Judgment | ||
A: Hayes O Scott III |