« Return to search results
Case Information
Case Number:
CV1996-001468
Judge:
Blaney, Scott
File Date:
1/25/1996
Location:
Downtown
Case Type:
Civil
Party Information
Party Name
Relationship
Sex
Attorney
Party Name
Samuel R Hemphill
Relationship
Plaintiff
Sex
Male
Attorney
Henry Hester
Party Name
Michael J Giammarino
Relationship
Defendant
Sex
Male
Attorney
F Cannata
Party Name
Valerie Giammarino
Relationship
Defendant
Sex
Female
Attorney
F Cannata
Case Documents
Filing Date
Description
Docket Date
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/23/1997 8:57:00 AM
Description
ARA - Arbitration Award
Docket Date
4/23/1997 8:57:00 AM
Filing Party
NOTE:
Posted during iCIS Conversion
Filing Date
4/18/1997
Description
SJU - Satisfaction Of Judgment
Docket Date
4/23/1997
Filing Party
Defendant(2)
Filing Date
4/18/1997
Description
SJU - Satisfaction Of Judgment
Docket Date
5/12/1997
Filing Party
Defendant(2)
Filing Date
4/18/1997
Description
SJU - Satisfaction Of Judgment
Docket Date
6/20/1997
Filing Party
Defendant(2)
Filing Date
2/20/1997
Description
NDN - Notice Of Decision of Arbitrator
Docket Date
3/10/1997
Filing Party
NOTE:
ARB
Filing Date
2/20/1997
Description
STA - Statement
Docket Date
3/10/1997
Filing Party
Plaintiff(1)
NOTE:
OF COSTS/VERIFIED
Filing Date
2/10/1997
Description
NOH - Notice Of Hearing
Docket Date
3/4/1997
Filing Party
NOTE:
ARBITRATION
Filing Date
11/7/1996
Description
STA - Statement
Docket Date
11/23/1996
Filing Party
Plaintiff(1)
NOTE:
JOINT PRE ARB
Filing Date
9/30/1996
Description
NAA - Naa
Docket Date
10/7/1996
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/24/1996
Description
NAA - Naa
Docket Date
9/26/1996
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/5/1996
Description
NAA - Naa
Docket Date
9/12/1996
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/14/1996
Description
NSD - Notice of Service Re: 26.1 Disclosure
Docket Date
3/15/1996
Filing Party
Defendant(2)
Filing Date
2/26/1996
Description
CAA - Cert Of Agreement/Arbitration
Docket Date
2/29/1996
Filing Party
Defendant(2)
Filing Date
2/26/1996
Description
ANS - Answer
Docket Date
2/27/1996
Filing Party
Defendant(2)
Filing Date
2/16/1996
Description
SAS - Summons & Affidavit Of Service
Docket Date
2/20/1996
Filing Party
Plaintiff(1)
NOTE:
SERVED P2 2/13/96
Filing Date
1/25/1996
Description
CER - Certificate
Docket Date
1/29/1996
Filing Party
Plaintiff(1)
NOTE:
REGARDING ARBITRATION
Filing Date
1/25/1996
Description
COM - Complaint
Docket Date
1/29/1996
Filing Party
Plaintiff(1)
Case Calendar
There are no calendar events on file
Judgments
Date
(F)or / (A)gainst
Amount
Frequency
Type
Status
Date
4/23/1997
(F)or / (A)gainst
F:  Samuel R Hemphill
A: Michael J Giammarino
Amount
$14,852.35
Frequency
One Time
Type
Arbitration Award
Status
Satisfied