Civil Court Case Information - Case History
« Return to search results
Case Information | |||
---|---|---|---|
Case Number: | CV1995-091729 | Judge: | Driggs, Adam |
File Date: | 8/31/1995 | Location: | Southeast |
Case Type: | Civil |
Party Information | |||
---|---|---|---|
Party Name | Relationship | Sex | Attorney |
Bcw Inc | Plaintiff | None | Rodger Golston |
Creative Concrete Specialists Inc | Defendant | None | Pro Per |
Todd Jostes | Defendant | Male | Pro Per |
Florence Kriske | Defendant | Female | Pro Per |
Kenneth Krikse | Defendant | Male | Pro Per |
Linda S Kriske | Defendant | Female | Pro Per |
Cami Jostes | Defendant | Female | Pro Per |
Scottsdale Memorial Hospital | Garnishee Defendant | None | Brian Devallance |
Case Documents | |||
---|---|---|---|
Filing Date | Description | Docket Date | Filing Party |
4/1/1997 | NOT - Notice | 4/4/1997 | Plaintiff(1) |
NOTE: REL & QUASH OF GARNISHMENT | |||
3/12/1997 | STP - Stipulation | 3/24/1997 | Plaintiff(1) |
3/4/1997 | 002 - ME: Hearing Vacated | 3/10/1997 | |
2/11/1997 | 046 - ME: Hrg Set Objection To Garnishment | 2/12/1997 | |
2/6/1997 | RQH - Request For Hearing | 2/21/1997 | Plaintiff(1) |
NOTE: ON GRN OF EARNINGS | |||
2/4/1997 | ANG - Answer Of Garnishee | 2/11/1997 | Garnishee Defendant(8) |
1/27/1997 | WGS - Writ Of Garnishment and Summons | 2/18/1997 | Plaintiff(1) |
1/22/1997 | AWG - Application For Writ Of Garnishment | 1/30/1997 | Plaintiff(1) |
7/26/1996 | WGS - Writ Of Garnishment and Summons | 8/1/1996 | Plaintiff(1) |
7/9/1996 | AWG - Application For Writ Of Garnishment | 7/11/1996 | Plaintiff(1) |
6/4/1996 | CAW - Civil Arrest Warrant | 6/6/1996 | |
NOTE: QUASHED 5/24/96 | |||
6/4/1996 | CAW - Civil Arrest Warrant | 6/6/1996 | |
NOTE: QUASHED 5/24/96 | |||
6/4/1996 | CAW - Civil Arrest Warrant | 6/6/1996 | |
NOTE: QUASHED 5/24/96 | |||
6/4/1996 | CAW - Civil Arrest Warrant | 6/6/1996 | |
NOTE: QUASHED 5/24/96 | |||
5/31/1996 | ORD - Order | 6/3/1996 | Plaintiff(1) |
NOTE: TO QUASH CIVIL ARREST WARRANTS | |||
5/29/1996 | 019 - ME: Ruling | 5/30/1996 | |
5/24/1996 | MOT - Motion | 5/28/1996 | Plaintiff(1) |
NOTE: TO QUASH CIVIL ARREST WARRANTS | |||
5/20/1996 | 021 - ME: Nunc Pro Tunc Order | 5/21/1996 | |
5/15/1996 | 002 - ME: Hearing Vacated | 5/16/1996 | |
5/8/1996 | ORD - Order | 5/13/1996 | Plaintiff(1) |
NOTE: QUASH WRIT OF GARNISHMENT/SUMMONS SVD ON BEAZER HOMES SALES | |||
5/7/1996 | 005 - ME: Hearing | 5/14/1996 | |
4/25/1996 | MOT - Motion | 4/30/1996 | Plaintiff(1) |
NOTE: TO QUASH WRIT OF GARNISHMENT AND SUMMONS | |||
4/9/1996 | AFS - Affidavit Of Service | 4/12/1996 | Plaintiff(1) |
4/9/1996 | AFS - Affidavit Of Service | 4/12/1996 | Plaintiff(1) |
4/4/1996 | 022 - ME: Order Signed | 4/10/1996 | |
4/4/1996 | AFS - Affidavit Of Service | 4/5/1996 | Plaintiff(1) |
NOTE: SERVER P3/04-02-96 | |||
4/4/1996 | AFS - Affidavit Of Service | 4/5/1996 | Plaintiff(1) |
NOTE: SERVED P7/04-02-96 | |||
4/3/1996 | ACS - Acceptance Of Service | 4/9/1996 | Plaintiff(1) |
4/1/1996 | ORD - Order | 4/5/1996 | Plaintiff(1) |
NOTE: QUASHED WRIT OF GARNISHMENT & SUMMONS | |||
3/28/1996 | MOT - Motion | 4/4/1996 | Plaintiff(1) |
NOTE: TO QUASH WRIT OF GARNISHMENT & SUMMONS | |||
3/28/1996 | PTT - Petition | 4/4/1996 | Plaintiff(1) |
NOTE: IN SUPP OF SUPPLEMENTAL PROCEEDINGS | |||
3/28/1996 | WGS - Writ Of Garnishment and Summons | 4/4/1996 | Plaintiff(1) |
3/28/1996 | PTT - Petition | 4/3/1996 | Plaintiff(1) |
NOTE: IN SUPP OF SUPPLEMENTAL PROCEEDINGS | |||
3/26/1996 | APL - Application | 3/29/1996 | Plaintiff(1) |
NOTE: FOR WGS | |||
2/28/1996 | WGS - Writ Of Garnishment and Summons | 3/2/1996 | Plaintiff(1) |
2/26/1996 | AWG - Application For Writ Of Garnishment | 3/1/1996 | Plaintiff(1) |
1/2/1996 | 049 - ME: Judgment Signed | 1/3/1996 | |
1/2/1996 | 049 - ME: Judgment Signed | 1/3/1996 | |
12/19/1995 4:00:00 PM | JUD - Judgment | 12/19/1995 4:00:00 PM | |
NOTE: Posted during iCIS Conversion | |||
11/15/1995 | MOT - Motion | 11/18/1995 | Plaintiff(1) |
NOTE: & AFFIDAVIT FOR ENTRY OF JUDGMENT BY DEFAULT WITHOUT HEARING | |||
11/15/1995 | STA - Statement | 11/18/1995 | Plaintiff(1) |
NOTE: OF COSTS & NOT OF TAXATION OF COSTS | |||
11/15/1995 | AFF - Affidavit | 11/18/1995 | Plaintiff(1) |
NOTE: IN SUPPORT OF REASONABLENESS OF ATTYS FEES | |||
10/31/1995 | AAE - Application/Affidavit And Entry Of Default | 11/2/1995 | Plaintiff(1) |
10/20/1995 | ANS - Answer | 10/23/1995 | Defendant(4) |
10/4/1995 | SAS - Summons & Affidavit Of Service | 10/5/1995 | Plaintiff(1) |
NOTE: SERVED P4/10-01-95 | |||
10/3/1995 | AFS - Affidavit Of Service | 10/6/1995 | Plaintiff(1) |
NOTE: SVD P7 100195 | |||
10/2/1995 | ADE - Application For Default | 10/3/1995 | Plaintiff(1) |
NOTE: AND ENTRY OF DEFAULT | |||
9/7/1995 | SAS - Summons & Affidavit Of Service | 9/8/1995 | Plaintiff(1) |
NOTE: P5-6 9-3-95 | |||
9/7/1995 | SAS - Summons & Affidavit Of Service | 9/8/1995 | Plaintiff(1) |
NOTE: P3 9-5-95 | |||
9/7/1995 | SAS - Summons & Affidavit Of Service | 9/8/1995 | Plaintiff(1) |
NOTE: P2 9-1-95 | |||
8/31/1995 | CCA - Cert Compulsory Arbitration | 9/5/1995 | Plaintiff(1) |
8/31/1995 | COM - Complaint | 9/5/1995 | Plaintiff(1) |
Case Calendar | ||
---|---|---|
There are no calendar events on file |
Judgments | |||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Date | (F)or / (A)gainst | Amount | Frequency | Type | Status |
F:Bcw Inc | $600.00 | One Time | Judgment Only | ||
A: Creative Concrete Specialists Inc | |||||
F:Bcw Inc | $382.05 | One Time | Judgment Only | ||
A: Creative Concrete Specialists Inc | |||||
F:Bcw Inc | $17,416.72 | One Time | Judgment Only | ||
A: Creative Concrete Specialists Inc |