« Return to search results
Case Information
Case Number:
CV1995-017844
Judge:
Julian, Melissa
File Date:
10/26/1995
Location:
Northeast
Case Type:
Civil
Party Information
Party Name
Relationship
Sex
Attorney
Party Name
Debra Hendrix
Relationship
Plaintiff
Sex
Female
Attorney
James Hill
Party Name
City Of Glendale
Relationship
Defendant
Sex
None
Attorney
Paul Holloway
Party Name
Kurt Hemphill
Relationship
Defendant
Sex
Male
Attorney
Paul Holloway
Party Name
David Madeya
Relationship
Defendant
Sex
Male
Attorney
Paul Holloway
Party Name
Keely Ann Hemphill
Relationship
Defendant
Sex
Female
Attorney
Paul Holloway
Party Name
Stephanie Madeya
Relationship
Defendant
Sex
Female
Attorney
Paul Holloway
Party Name
Paul W Holloway
Relationship
Endorsement Side 2
Sex
Male
Attorney
Paul Holloway
Case Documents
Filing Date
Description
Docket Date
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/17/1998
Description
ODI - Order Of Dismissal
Docket Date
4/24/1998
Filing Party
Defendant(2)
NOTE:
WITH PREJUDICE
Filing Date
4/10/1998
Description
SFD - Stipulation For Dismissal
Docket Date
4/14/1998
Filing Party
Defendant(2)
NOTE:
WITH PREJUDICE
Filing Date
3/24/1998
Description
MOT - Motion
Docket Date
3/24/1998
Filing Party
Plaintiff(1)
NOTE:
TO ACCELERATE HEARING ON PLA REQUEST FOR STAY OF TRIAL PROCEEDINGS
Filing Date
3/24/1998
Description
REQ - Request
Docket Date
3/24/1998
Filing Party
Plaintiff(1)
NOTE:
FOR STAY OF TRIAL PROCEEDINGS
Filing Date
3/24/1998
Description
005 - ME: Hearing
Docket Date
3/25/1998
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/24/1998
Description
078 - ME: Case On Dismissal Calendar
Docket Date
3/26/1998
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/20/1998
Description
OBJ - Objection/Opposition.
Docket Date
3/23/1998
Filing Party
Plaintiff(1)
NOTE:
TO DEFS MOTION TO CONTINUE TRIAL
Filing Date
3/20/1998
Description
STA - Statement
Docket Date
3/23/1998
Filing Party
Defendant(2)
NOTE:
JOINT PRETRIAL
Filing Date
3/20/1998
Description
MOT - Motion
Docket Date
3/23/1998
Filing Party
Plaintiff(1)
NOTE:
TO STRIKE PLEADINGS AND FOR SANCTIONS
Filing Date
3/20/1998
Description
MOT - Motion
Docket Date
3/23/1998
Filing Party
Plaintiff(1)
NOTE:
TO ACCELERATE HEARING ON PLA OPPOSITION TO DEFS MOTION IN LIMINE AND PLA MOTION; TO STRIKE
Filing Date
3/20/1998
Description
RES - Response
Docket Date
3/23/1998
Filing Party
Plaintiff(1)
NOTE:
IN OPPOSITION TO DEFS MOTION IN LIMINE RE: TRAFFIC CHARGES AGAINST PLA WERE; DISMISSED
Filing Date
3/20/1998
Description
NOS - Notice Of Settlement
Docket Date
3/25/1998
Filing Party
Defendant(2)
Filing Date
3/20/1998
Description
005 - ME: Hearing
Docket Date
3/26/1998
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/18/1998
Description
RES - Response
Docket Date
3/19/1998
Filing Party
Defendant(2)
NOTE:
TO MOTION TO STRIKE AND FOR SANCTIONS
Filing Date
3/18/1998
Description
NOT - Notice
Docket Date
3/19/1998
Filing Party
Defendant(2)
NOTE:
OF FILING OF AFFIDAVIT
Filing Date
3/18/1998
Description
REL - Reply
Docket Date
3/19/1998
Filing Party
Defendant(2)
NOTE:
MEMORANDUM ON MOTION IN LIMINE RE: DISMISSAL OF CHARGES
Filing Date
3/17/1998
Description
MCO - Motion To Continue
Docket Date
3/18/1998
Filing Party
Defendant(2)
NOTE:
TRIAL
Filing Date
3/16/1998
Description
MOT - Motion
Docket Date
3/17/1998
Filing Party
Defendant(2)
NOTE:
IN LIMINE RE: MALLET VERDICT
Filing Date
3/16/1998
Description
MOT - Motion
Docket Date
3/17/1998
Filing Party
Defendant(2)
NOTE:
IN LIMINE RE: PRECLUDING EVIDENCE THAT THE CIVIL TRAFFIC CHARGES AGAINST PLA; DEBRA HENDRIX WERE DISMISSED
Filing Date
1/16/1998
Description
NSD - Notice of Service Re: 26.1 Disclosure
Docket Date
1/22/1998
Filing Party
Defendant(2)
NOTE:
SUPPLEMENTAL
Filing Date
1/16/1998
Description
NSD - Notice of Service Re: 26.1 Disclosure
Docket Date
1/22/1998
Filing Party
Defendant(2)
NOTE:
SUPPLEMENTAL
Filing Date
10/24/1997
Description
ORD - Order
Docket Date
11/4/1997
Filing Party
Plaintiff(1)
NOTE:
CONTINUING TRIAL
Filing Date
10/22/1997
Description
ORD - Order
Docket Date
11/3/1997
Filing Party
Defendant(2)
NOTE:
FOR SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL FOR CITY OF GLENDALE
Filing Date
10/14/1997
Description
NOT - Notice
Docket Date
10/20/1997
Filing Party
Defendant(2)
NOTE:
OF SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL
Filing Date
10/9/1997
Description
SFC - Stipulation For Continuance
Docket Date
10/14/1997
Filing Party
Plaintiff(1)
NOTE:
TRIAL
Filing Date
10/2/1997
Description
064 - ME: Trial Continued/Reset
Docket Date
10/22/1997
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/9/1997
Description
089 - ME: Trial Setting
Docket Date
7/10/1997
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/11/1997
Description
LWE - List Of Witnesses/Exhibits
Docket Date
6/16/1997
Filing Party
Defendant(2)
Filing Date
6/9/1997
Description
NOT - Notice
Docket Date
6/11/1997
Filing Party
Defendant(2)
NOTE:
OF ASSOCIATION OF COUNSEL
Filing Date
6/9/1997
Description
MSE - Motion To Set & Cert/Readiness
Docket Date
6/11/1997
Filing Party
Plaintiff(1)
Filing Date
5/19/1997
Description
LWE - List Of Witnesses/Exhibits
Docket Date
5/28/1997
Filing Party
Plaintiff(1)
Filing Date
3/6/1997
Description
019 - ME: Ruling
Docket Date
3/11/1997
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/25/1997
Description
005 - ME: Hearing
Docket Date
2/27/1997
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/18/1997
Description
REL - Reply
Docket Date
3/4/1997
Filing Party
Defendant(2)
NOTE:
IN SUPPORT OF MOT FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT
Filing Date
2/18/1997
Description
OBJ - Objection/Opposition.
Docket Date
3/6/1997
Filing Party
Defendant(2)
NOTE:
TO PLAS STATEMENT OF FACTS AND DEFS STATE OF FACTS IN REPLY
Filing Date
2/4/1997
Description
OBJ - Objection/Opposition.
Docket Date
2/19/1997
Filing Party
Plaintiff(1)
NOTE:
TO DEF STMT OF FACTS
Filing Date
2/4/1997
Description
MEM - Memorandum
Docket Date
2/19/1997
Filing Party
Plaintiff(1)
NOTE:
& POINTS OF AUTHORITY IN RESPONSE TO DEF MOT FOR SUMM JUDG
Filing Date
2/4/1997
Description
SOF - Statement Of Facts
Docket Date
2/19/1997
Filing Party
Plaintiff(1)
NOTE:
IN OBJ TO DEF MOT FOR SUMM JUDG
Filing Date
1/24/1997
Description
ORD - Order
Docket Date
2/5/1997
Filing Party
Plaintiff(1)
NOTE:
TO EXTEND DEADLINE
Filing Date
1/23/1997
Description
094 - ME: Oral Argument Set
Docket Date
1/28/1997
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/22/1997
Description
STP - Stipulation
Docket Date
1/29/1997
Filing Party
Plaintiff(1)
NOTE:
TO EXTEND DEADLINE
Filing Date
1/17/1997
Description
MOT - Motion
Docket Date
1/28/1997
Filing Party
Defendant(2)
NOTE:
FOR JOINDER OF MR HENDRIX AS PARTY PLA FOR ALL PURPOSES
Filing Date
1/13/1997
Description
094 - ME: Oral Argument Set
Docket Date
1/14/1997
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/9/1997
Description
019 - ME: Ruling
Docket Date
1/13/1997
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/7/1997
Description
MSJ - Motion For Summary Judgment
Docket Date
1/14/1997
Filing Party
Defendant(2)
Filing Date
1/7/1997
Description
SOF - Statement Of Facts
Docket Date
1/14/1997
Filing Party
Defendant(2)
NOTE:
IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR SUM JDG
Filing Date
12/3/1996
Description
MOT - Motion
Docket Date
12/17/1996
Filing Party
Defendant(3)
NOTE:
FOR JOINDER OF MR HENDRIX AS PARTY-PLA FOR RULE 68 PURPOSES
Filing Date
11/13/1996
Description
066 - ME: Case Reassigned
Docket Date
11/15/1996
Filing Party
Filing Date
11/6/1996
Description
NJR - Notice of change of Judge for right
Docket Date
11/18/1996
Filing Party
Defendant(2)
Filing Date
10/25/1996
Description
NSD - Notice of Service Re: 26.1 Disclosure
Docket Date
11/6/1996
Filing Party
Defendant(2)
NOTE:
5TH SUPPLEMENTAL
Filing Date
9/25/1996
Description
NSD - Notice of Service Re: 26.1 Disclosure
Docket Date
9/30/1996
Filing Party
Defendant(2)
NOTE:
STMT/FOURTH SUPPL
Filing Date
9/24/1996
Description
NSD - Notice of Service Re: 26.1 Disclosure
Docket Date
9/30/1996
Filing Party
Defendant(2)
NOTE:
STMT/THIRD SUPPL
Filing Date
9/4/1996
Description
NSD - Notice of Service Re: 26.1 Disclosure
Docket Date
9/11/1996
Filing Party
Defendant(2)
NOTE:
2ND SUPPLEMENTAL
Filing Date
5/24/1996
Description
NSD - Notice of Service Re: 26.1 Disclosure
Docket Date
5/30/1996
Filing Party
Defendant(2)
Filing Date
4/17/1996
Description
NSD - Notice of Service Re: 26.1 Disclosure
Docket Date
4/24/1996
Filing Party
Plaintiff(1)
Filing Date
4/12/1996
Description
NSD - Notice of Service Re: 26.1 Disclosure
Docket Date
4/17/1996
Filing Party
Defendant(2)
Filing Date
3/13/1996
Description
NOT - Notice
Docket Date
3/15/1996
Filing Party
Plaintiff(1)
NOTE:
CHANGE OF ADDRESS
Filing Date
3/6/1996
Description
CCA - Cert Compulsory Arbitration
Docket Date
3/12/1996
Filing Party
Defendant(2)
Filing Date
3/6/1996
Description
ANS - Answer
Docket Date
3/8/1996
Filing Party
Defendant(2)
Filing Date
2/21/1996
Description
SAS - Summons & Affidavit Of Service
Docket Date
2/23/1996
Filing Party
Plaintiff(1)
NOTE:
P4,6 2-15-96
Filing Date
2/21/1996
Description
SAS - Summons & Affidavit Of Service
Docket Date
2/23/1996
Filing Party
Plaintiff(1)
NOTE:
P3,5 2-16-96
Filing Date
2/20/1996
Description
SAS - Summons & Affidavit Of Service
Docket Date
2/23/1996
Filing Party
Plaintiff(1)
NOTE:
P2 2-16-96
Filing Date
10/26/1995
Description
CCA - Cert Compulsory Arbitration
Docket Date
10/31/1995
Filing Party
Plaintiff(1)
Filing Date
10/26/1995
Description
COM - Complaint
Docket Date
10/31/1995
Filing Party
Plaintiff(1)
Case Calendar
There are no calendar events on file
Judgments
Date
(F)or / (A)gainst
Amount
Frequency
Type
Status
No records found.